Wyoming District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00013
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 09, 2024 1:07 AM MST
Defendant
Deangela Jordawn Picek (2)
Represented By
Tracy Racicot Hucke
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Andrew Francisco
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Chad Nathan Stewart (1)
Represented By
Ryan A Semerad
The Fuller Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Stephanie Sprecher
Us Attorneys Office
contact info
Timothy J Forwood
United States Attorney
contact info
Ava Covert
Natrona County District Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/09/2024 2:22 AM MST
Friday, December 15, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Chad Nathan Stewart (1), Deangela Jordawn Picek (2). (Court Staff, sal) [2:23-mj-00094-SWS]
Related: [-]
2 2 Warrant Issued as to Chad Nathan Stewart. (Court Staff, sal) [2:23-mj-00094-SWS]
Related: [-]
3 3 Warrant Issued as to Deangela Jordawn Picek. (Court Staff, sal) [2:23-mj-00094-SWS]
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION for Detention Hearing by USA as to Defendant(s) Chad Nathan Stewart, Deangela Jordawn Picek. (Court Staff, sal) [2:23-mj-00094-SWS]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ryan A Semerad appearing for defendant Chad Nathan Stewart (Semerad, Ryan) [2:23-mj-00094-SWS]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephanie Sprecher appearing for USA (Sprecher, Stephanie) [2:23-mj-00094-SWS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
7 7 (TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE OF HEARING as to Deangela Jordawn Picek, VIA ZOOM - NOTE: 1. This proceeding will be held via Zoom Video/Web Conferencing with all participants appearing remotely;the Zoom ID and Passcode will be provided separately to the participants email address of record. 2. Participants should connect to the proceeding 15 minutes prior to its scheduled start time to allow for troubleshooting of any connectivity issues. 3. To ensure the record is of the best quality, participants are encouraged to utilize a headset to reduce static and background noise. If not using a headset, participants must ensure the audio feed at their location is muted when not speaking. ***REMINDER: Recording or broadcasting of this hearing is prohibited. *** Initial Appearance set for 12/20/2023 02:15 PM before Honorable R Michael Shickich. (Court Staff, stbd) [2:23-mj-00094-SWS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ava B. Covert appearing for USA (Covert, Ava) [2:23-mj-00094-SWS]
Related: [-]
9 9 Minute Entry: Initial Appearance as to Deangela Jordawn Picek held on 12/20/2023. ***Location start as to Deangela Jordawn Picek ***Procedural Interval start as to Deangela Jordawn Picek; Proceedings held before Honorable R Michael Shickich. (Court Reporter FTR.) (Court Staff, stbd) [2:23-mj-00094-SWS]
Related: [-]
10 10 WRITTEN CONSENT TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE by defendant Deangela Jordawn Picek (Court Staff, stbd) [2:23-mj-00094-SWS]
Related: [-]
11 11 NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Deangela Jordawn Picek. (Court Staff, stbd) [2:23-mj-00094-SWS]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION PENDING HEARING PURSUANT TO BAIL REFORM ACT as to Deangela Jordawn Picek by the Honorable R Michael Shickich.(Court Staff, stbd) [2:23-mj-00094-SWS]
Related: [-]
13 13 (TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE OF HEARING as to Deangela Jordawn Picek, IN-PERSON Detention Hearing set for 12/22/2023 01:15 PM in Casper Courtroom No. 1 (Room No. 106) before Honorable R Michael Shickich. Preliminary Examination set for 12/22/2023 01:15 PM in Casper Courtroom No. 1 (Room No. 106) before Honorable R Michael Shickich. (Court Staff, stbd) [2:23-mj-00094-SWS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
14 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew Francisco appearing for defendant Deangela Jordawn Picek (Francisco, Andrew) [2:23-mj-00094-SWS]
Related: [-]
15 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Tracy Racicot Hucke appearing for defendant Deangela Jordawn Picek (Hucke, Tracy) [2:23-mj-00094-SWS]
Related: [-]
16 16 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Andrew Francisco by Defendant(s) Deangela Jordawn Picek.(Francisco, Andrew) [2:23-mj-00094-SWS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
17 17 SEALED DOCUMENT - PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND REPORT as to Deangela Jordawn Picek. Access granted to: Stephanie Sprecher, Ava Covert, Andrew Francisco, Tracy Racicot Hucke. (svenegas) [2:23-mj-00094-SWS]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl granting16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Andrew Francisco withdrawn from case as to Deangela Jordawn Picek (2). (Court Staff, semt) [2:23-mj-00094-SWS]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
19 19 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by defendant Deangela Jordawn Picek (Court Staff, scat) [2:23-mj-00094-SWS]
Related: [-]
20 20 Minute Entry: Detention Hearing as to Deangela Jordawn Picek held on 12/22/2023. Defendant detained., Minute Entry: Preliminary Examination as to Deangela Jordawn Picek held on 12/22/2023 Proceedings held before Honorable R Michael Shickich. (Court Reporter Megan Strawn.) (Court Staff, scat) [2:23-mj-00094-SWS]
Related: [-]
21 21 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Deangela Jordawn Picek by the Honorable R Michael Shickich.(Court Staff, scat) [2:23-mj-00094-SWS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
22 22 Warrant Returned Executed on 12/16/2023 in case as to Deangela Jordawn Picek (Court Staff, sbh) [2:23-mj-00094-SWS]
Related: [-]
23 23 Warrant Returned Executed on 12/16/2023 in case as to Chad Nathan Stewart (Court Staff, sbh) [2:23-mj-00094-SWS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
24 24 2 pgs INDICTMENT as to Chad Nathan Stewart (1) count(s) 1, Deangela Jordawn Picek (2) count(s) 1. (Court Staff, sjlg)
Related: [-]
25 25 Praecipe for Warrant by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant(s) Chad Nathan Stewart a/k/a Bradley Stewart and Deangela Jordawn Picek. (Court Staff, sjlg)
Related: [-]
26 26 MOTION for Detention Hearing by USA as to Defendant(s) Chad Nathan Stewart. (Court Staff, sjlg)
Related: [-]