California Northern District Court
Judge:Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Case #: 3:24-cv-00729
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2024
Terminated:Jun 25, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 1:28 AM PDT
Defendant
Solar Mosaic LLC
Represented By
Robert James Guite
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Teresa Morin
Sheppard Mullin
contact info
Abigail Marie Miles
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Shannon Z. Petersen
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ross Hightower
Represented By
Adam J. McNeile
Kemnitzer, Barron & Krieg LLP
contact info
Kristin A. Kemnitzer
Kemnitzer Barron & Krieg
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
37 37 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 06/25 7:59 AM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting 36 Stipulation for Dismissal of Entire Action with Prejudice. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
36 36 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 06/24 2:40 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Entire Action With Prejudice filed by Ross Hightower. (McNeile, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
35 35 order Order on Stipulation Wed 06/12 5:27 PM
ORDER re 34 : The parties notified the Court that they have reached a settlement. The parties shall file their dismissal on or before July 2, 2024. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on June 12, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amolc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 06/12 3:43 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT filed by Ross Hightower. (McNeile, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
33 33 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Continuing Motion Hearing 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Thu 06/06 8:51 AM
Clerk's Notice Continuing Motion Hearing.21 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings Hearing set for 10/24/2024 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
32 32 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Fri 05/03 9:53 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re31 Order. Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jlg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
31 31 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 05/03 9:49 AM
ORDER GRANTING 29 Stipulation an Order for Limited Arbitration Discovery and to Vacate the Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on May 3, 2024.(jlg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
30 30 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 05/02 5:00 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (JOINT) . (Kemnitzer, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
29 29 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 04/29 4:59 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Limited Arbitration Discovery and to Vacate the Case Management Conference filed by Solar Mosaic LLC. (Petersen, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
28 28 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 04/18 11:58 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (McNeile, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 04/10 9:39 AM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting 25 Stipulation Extending Briefing Schedule. Opposition due by 6/14/2024. Reply due by 6/27/2024. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
26 26 14 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 04/10 9:36 AM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting 24 Stipulation for Protective Order. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
25 25 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 04/09 4:16 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Ross Hightower. (Kemnitzer, Kristin)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 04/09 10:35 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order filed by Solar Mosaic LLC.(Petersen, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Shannon Z. Petersen in Support of Proposed Stipulation for Protective Order
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
23 23 oth_sup Declaration in Support Wed 03/27 11:24 AM
Declaration of Devon Treece in Support of21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed bySolar Mosaic LLC. Related [+] (Petersen, Shannon)
Related: [-] 21
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
22 22 oth_sup Declaration in Support Wed 03/27 11:20 AM
Declaration of Shannon Z. Petersen in Support of21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed bySolar Mosaic LLC. Related [+] (Petersen, Shannon)
Related: [-] 21
21 21 motion Compel Wed 03/27 11:18 AM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Solar Mosaic LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. Responses due by 4/10/2024. Replies due by 4/17/2024.(Petersen, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Defendant Solar Mosaic LLC's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Its Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
20 20 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Wed 03/13 6:13 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT. You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Martinez-Olguin's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/martinez-olguin-araceli-amo/] . Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jlg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/13 9:43 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 3/13/2024.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
18 18 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Wed 03/13 9:08 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
17 17 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 03/12 12:35 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Solar Mosaic LLC.. (Petersen, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
16 16 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Mon 03/04 5:18 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 3/18/2024 . (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 03/04 3:02 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Solar Mosaic LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mosaic Sustainable Finance Corporation, Other Affiliate Freedom Forever, LLC, Other Affiliate Concord Servicing Corporation for Solar Mosaic LLC. (Petersen, Shannon)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 03/04 2:49 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Solar Mosaic LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mosaic Sustainable Finance Corporation for Solar Mosaic LLC. (Petersen, Shannon)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/04 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail Marie Miles Appearance of Counsel (Miles, Abigail)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/04 9:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert James Guite Appearance of Counsel (Guite, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/01 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Teresa Morin (Morin, Teresa)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 03/01 2:25 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Ross Hightower. Solar Mosaic LLC served on 2/14/24, answer due 3/6/24. (McNeile, Adam) Modified on 3/1/2024 (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Fri 03/01 10:13 AM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint to Extend time to Respond to Complaint filed by Solar Mosaic LLC. (Petersen, Shannon)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 03/01 3:08 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. The correct event is SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:10 Certificate of Service filed by Ross Hightower. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 02/20 4:10 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ross Hightower.. (McNeile, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 02/08 10:49 AM
Summons Issued as to Solar Mosaic LLC. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 02/08 10:43 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2024 11:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 02/08 9:41 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/22/2024. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
4 4 Proposed Summons. (McNeile, Adam)
Related: [-]
3 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ross Hightower (McNeile, Adam)
Related: [-]
2 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Ross Hightower . (McNeile, Adam)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Solar Mosaic LLC ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19103083.). Filed by Ross Hightower. (McNeile, Adam)
Related: [-]