Charles Jr v. Monsanto Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00735 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 07, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 08, 2025 |
Case in other court: | Missouri Eastern, 4:24-cv-00085 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 1:28 AM PDT |
Defendant
Monsanto Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Charles Jr
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 09, 2025 | ||
utility
MDL Member Case Closed
Wed 04/09 3:32 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE CLOSED: Pursuant to the Court's order13 granting stipulation of dismissal, civil case no. 24-cv-00735 VC is terminated. cc: JPMDL (msr, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, April 08, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 20463 Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice. Associated case: 3:24-cv-00735-VC. (vclc4, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
13 | 13
![]() STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Monsanto Company.(Martinez, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, March 28, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() MOTION for Summary Judgment on Causation Grounds filed by Monsanto Company. Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 5/15/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 4/11/2025. Replies due by 4/18/2025.(White, Jed) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, May 30, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Peter Charles, Jr.] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Peter Charles, Jr.] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Defendant Monsanto Company ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff Peter Charles Jr.] by Monsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Peter Charles Jr. Service waived by Monsanto Company waiver sent on 4/5/2024, answer due 6/4/2024. (Kassan, Randi) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:24-cv-00085. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Thu 02/08 9:19 AM
MDL 2741 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Eastern District of Missouri, 4:24-cv-00085-JAR, Peter Charles Jr v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:24-cv-00735-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 440 cc: JPMDL (wsn, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, February 07, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Friday, January 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 FINAL NOTICE of Filing Deficiency. The filing deficiency previously identified has not been corrected by the filing attorney. Case to proceed to judge assignment and further review by the Clerks Office Exec. Team. (JBH) | |
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. 1 Waiver(s) of Service issued. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JBH) | ||
Wednesday, January 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Completed Summons or Request for Waiver of Service not completed. This deficiency must be filed in the case record immediately. (JBH) | |
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |