California Central District Court
Judge:Otis D Wright, II
Referred: Michael B Kaufman
Case #: 2:24-cv-01120
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 08, 2024 1:45 AM PDT
Defendant
Fenix Ammunition LLC
Represented By
Sean D Flaherty
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Patrick Mendoza
Represented By
Daniel Boris Lifschitz
Johnson And Johnson LLP
contact info
Douglas L Johnson
Johnson And Johnson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
45 45 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/21 11:21 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II; he Court, having considered the parties stipulation41 , and finding good cause, ORDERS that the following dates and deadlines shall supersede those previously set in this matter: Close of Expert Discovery: July 21, 2025; Close of Fact Discovery: June 18, 2025. This Order does not alter any other deadlines, including those set forth in the Court's Scheduling & Case Management Order. (ECF No. 31.) (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
44 44 minutes Discovery Hearing Fri 04/11 3:05 PM
MINUTES OF INFORMAL DISCOVER CONFERENCE (Video) held before Magistrate Judge Michael B. Kaufman. An informal discovery conference was held on April 11, 2025. The Court orders Defendants to produce all records responsive to the Category I RFPs by April 15, 2025. The parties are ordered to meet and confer further on the Category II and III RFPs by April 18, 2025. If the parties are unable to resolve their disputes, they may send a joint email to the Court summarizing the remaining disputes and proposing dates and times for a follow up discovery conference. Court Recorder: CS 04/11/25. (san)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
43 43 motion Discovery Thu 04/10 8:05 AM
AMENDED MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE: Video - Zoom Conference set for 4/11/2025 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael B. Kaufman. (jm)
Related: [-]
42 42 1 pgs motion Order re Discovery Matter Wed 04/09 3:48 PM
MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE: Video - Zoom Conference set for 4/4/2025 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael B. Kaufman. (san)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
41 41 stip Continue Tue 04/08 3:05 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Schedule Re: Scheduling Order,, Terminate Hearings,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,31 filed by Plaintiff Patrick Mendoza.(Trechsel, Frank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Frank R. Trechsel,
Att: 2 Declaration of Quyen Thi Le,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order
40 40 notice Appearance Tue 04/08 10:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Quyen Thi Le on behalf of Defendant Fenix Ammunition LLC (Attorney Quyen Thi Le added to party Fenix Ammunition LLC(pty:dft))(Le, Quyen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
39 39 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 03/13 10:19 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sean D Flaherty counsel for Defendant Fenix Ammunition LLC. Sean Flaherty is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Fenix Ammunition. (Flaherty, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
38 38 order Protective Order Thu 03/06 10:30 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael B. Kaufman: granting36 Joint Application for Stipulated Protective Order. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) (hr)
Related: [-]
37 37 notice Appearance Wed 03/05 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Reid E. Dammann on behalf of Defendant Fenix Ammunition LLC (Attorney Reid E. Dammann added to party Fenix Ammunition LLC(pty:dft))(Dammann, Reid)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
36 36 motion Protective Order Tue 03/04 4:47 PM
Joint APPLICATION for Protective Order for Discovery filed by Plaintiff Patrick Mendoza. (Johnson, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
35 35 transfer Reassignment of Case Due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer (MJ) (G-74) - optional html form Fri 02/28 5:51 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael B. Kaufman for any discovery and/or post-judgment matters that may be referred. Case number will now read as 2:24-cv-01120-ODW(MBKx). (rolm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
34 34 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Thu 10/24 9:22 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Gail M Title has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
33 33 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2) Tue 10/22 11:48 AM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Gail Title may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Patrick Mendoza(Trechsel, Frank)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
32 32 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Tue 10/01 2:27 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. (lc)
Related: [-]
31 31 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 10/01 2:26 PM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (JURY TRIAL) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS VACATED Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2025 01:30 PM; Jury Trial set for 11/4/2025 09:00 AM ; Motion in Limine set for hearing on 10/27/2025 at 01:30 PM (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ALL SPECIFIED DEADLINES). (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
30 30 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 09/30 1:43 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Patrick Mendoza.. (Trechsel, Frank)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 09/06 1:40 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Frank Trechsel counsel for Plaintiff Patrick Mendoza. Adding Frank R. Trechsel as counsel of record for Plaintiff Patrick Mendoza for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Patrick Mendoza. (Attorney Frank Trechsel added to party Patrick Mendoza(pty:pla))(Trechsel, Frank)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 08/26 4:37 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel Boris Lifschitz counsel for Plaintiff Patrick Mendoza. Daniel Boris Lifschitz is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Patrick Mendoza. (Lifschitz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
27 27 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 08/05 5:20 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Fenix Ammunition LLC, (Flaherty, Sean)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
26 26 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 08/02 4:39 PM
ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for October 7, 2024 at 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II. (lc)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 08/02 10:04 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Defendant Fenix Ammunition LLC's Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
24 24 6 pgs answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 08/01 5:37 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Fenix Ammunition LLC.(Flaherty, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
23 23 order Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 07/18 3:26 PM
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS14 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC DISCUSSION AND REASONS HEREIN). Accordingly, in totality, the balance of the Jones Factors weighs against transfer.As Mendoza has carried his burden of showing that venue is proper, the motion to dismiss for improper venue is DENIED. Further, because Fenix has failed to carry its burden of showing that transfer is in the interest of justice, the Court DENIES Fenix's request to transfer the case to the Eastern District of Michigan. For the reasons discussed above, the Court DENIES Defendants Motion to Dismiss. (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
22 22 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 06/05 7:11 AM
The hearing on the MOTION to Dismiss14 , scheduled for June 10, 2024 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
21 21 2 pgs misc Miscellaneous Document Tue 05/28 4:31 PM
Certification of Word Count Compliance re: Objection/Opposition (Motion related),18 (Lifschitz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs misc Miscellaneous Document Tue 05/28 3:51 PM
Certification of Word Count Compliance filed by Defendant Fenix Ammunition LLC Certification of Word Count Compliance re: Reply (Motion related)19 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Defective Venue, or in the Alternative, to Transfer 14 (Flaherty, Sean)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
19 19 11 pgs respm Reply (Motion related) Fri 05/24 6:03 PM
REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Defective Venue, or in the Alternative, to Transfer 14 filed by Defendant Fenix Ammunition LLC. (Flaherty, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
18 18 28 pgs respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Thu 05/16 11:47 AM
Opposition in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Defective Venue, or in the Alternative, to Transfer 14 filed by Plaintiff Patrick Mendoza.(Lifschitz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 20 pgs Declaration of Patrick Mendoza,
Att: 2 5 pgs Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 3 18 pgs Declaration of Daniel B. Lifschitz
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/30 12:29 PM
ORDER DENYING JOINT MOTION AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING AND AMEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PENDING MOTION TO DISMISS16 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
16 16 3 pgs stip Order Mon 04/29 4:09 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Order to continue hearing date and amend briefing schedule filed by Defendant Fenix Ammunition LLC.(Flaherty, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
15 15 3 pgs stip Order Mon 04/29 4:06 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Order to continue hearing date and amend briefing schedule filed by Defendant Fenix Ammunition LLC.(Flaherty, Sean)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
14 14 2 pgs motion Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 04/12 5:29 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Defective Venue, or in the Alternative, to Transfer filed by Defendant Fenix Ammunition LLC. Motion set for hearing on 6/10/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attorney Sean D Flaherty added to party Fenix Ammunition LLC(pty:dft)) (Flaherty, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 26 pgs Memorandum in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 6 pgs Declaration of Justin Nazaroff,
Att: 3 3 pgs Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 4 Declaration of Sean D. Flaherty,
Att: 5 1 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 6 Exhibit 2,
Att: 7 1 pgs Exhibit 3,
Att: 8 Exhibit 4,
Att: 9 7 pgs Exhibit 5,
Att: 10 Exhibit 6,
Att: 11 Exhibit 7,
Att: 12 1 pgs Exhibit 8,
Att: 13 Exhibit 9,
Att: 14 2 pgs Exhibit 10,
Att: 15 Exhibit 11,
Att: 16 Exhibit 12,
Att: 17 Exhibit 13,
Att: 18 Exhibit 14,
Att: 19 Exhibit 15,
Att: 20 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
13 13 4 pgs stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 03/26 1:43 PM
Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Fenix Ammunition LLC answer now due 4/12/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Patrick Mendoza.(Lifschitz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
12 12 4 pgs stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 03/06 2:30 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Fenix Ammunition LLC answer now due 3/27/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Patrick Mendoza.(Johnson, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 03/05 11:17 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Patrick Mendoza, upon Defendant Fenix Ammunition LLC served on 2/21/2024, answer due 3/13/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Brett Lambert, who is designated by law to accept service of process on behalf of Fenix Ammunition LLC in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service (Lifschitz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Tue 02/13 11:02 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY- No mandatory chambers copies required, EXCEPT FOR Motions for summary judgment and any other evidence-heavy motions. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
9 9 1 pgs service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 02/12 9:00 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Fenix Ammunition LLC. (lh)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 02/12 8:46 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 02/12 8:46 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 02/12 8:45 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (lh)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
5 5 notice Summons Request Fri 02/09 10:47 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Patrick Mendoza. (Lifschitz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Fri 02/09 10:46 AM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Patrick Mendoza. (Lifschitz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 02/09 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Patrick Mendoza, (Lifschitz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 02/09 10:44 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Patrick Mendoza. (Lifschitz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 02/09 10:41 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36888915 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Patrick Mendoza. (Attorney Daniel Boris Lifschitz added to party Patrick Mendoza(pty:pla))(Lifschitz, Daniel)
Related: [-]