Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Joseph F Saporito, Jr
Case #: 3:24-cv-00245
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2024
Terminated:Jul 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 08, 2024 5:48 AM EDT
Defendant
New Jersey Manufacturers Insurance Company
Represented By
John R. Nealon
Marshall Dennehey, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Ginger Kernaghan
Represented By
James D. Famiglio
Law Offices James D. Famiglio PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Tue 07/09 1:36 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The above captioned matter is administratively dismissed. All future filings on the case should be made to Abdulah Muratovic v. New Jersey Manufacturers Insurance Company (3:24-CV-00116-JFS). Signed by Chief MJ Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 7/9/2024. (jkc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
13 13 motion Consolidate Cases Wed 07/03 12:31 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by New Jersey Manufacturers Insurance Company.(Nealon, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Concurrence
Friday, June 21, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order Fri 06/21 12:09 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 7/3/2024 11:00 AM before Chief MJ Joseph F. Saporito Jr.. Signed by Chief MJ Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 6/21/24. (ms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order - Consent to Proceed before U.S. Magistrate Judge Approved Tue 04/16 12:46 PM
CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Approved. Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr. assigned. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 4/16/2024. (gg) Modified on 4/16/2024 (gg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
order 1 - Terminate Hearings Mon 04/15 11:43 AM
Case Management Conference scheduled on 4/25/2024 at 1:30 p.m. is CANCELED. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 4/15/2024. (gg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
9 9 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/10 9:51 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: TELEPHONIC Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2024 01:30 PM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 4/10/2024. (gg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
8 8 discov Disclosure Report Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)3 - Pretrial Disclosures Wed 04/03 4:13 PM
DISCLOSURE REPORT. (Nealon, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement Pursuant To FRCP 7.1 (Parent Corporations) Wed 04/03 4:12 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by New Jersey Manufacturers Insurance Company. (Nealon, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/21 3:03 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by New Jersey Manufacturers Insurance Company.(Nealon, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/19 4:01 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by New Jersey Manufacturers Insurance Company a/k/a NJM Insurance Group. New Jersey Manufacturers Insurance Company a/k/a NJM Insurance Group waiver sent on 3/4/2024, answer due 5/3/2024. (Nealon, John)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Jury Demand Tue 03/19 4:00 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by New Jersey Manufacturers Insurance Company a/k/a NJM Insurance Group. (Nealon, John)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Tue 03/19 3:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Nealon on behalf of New Jersey Manufacturers Insurance Company a/k/a NJM Insurance Group. (Nealon, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 02/09 12:41 PM
Summons Issued as to New Jersey Manufacturers Insurance Company and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (ep)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
1 1 4 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/09 12:40 PM
COMPLAINT against New Jersey Manufacturers Insurance Company ( Filing fee $405, Receipt Number APAMDC-6541996), filed by Ginger Kernaghan.(ep)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - NJM Insurance Policy and Declarations,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet