Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Roberta A Colton
Case #: 8:24-bk-00676
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
The Center for Special Needs Trust Administration, Inc.
12425 28th St N
Saint Petersburg, FL 33716-1844
Represented By
Scott A. Stichter
Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Postler, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602


Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
536 536 notice Notice of Hearing (BK) Fri 05/16 5:00 PM
Notice of Preliminary Hearing on CHAPTER 11 TRUSTEES AGREED EMERGENCY MOTION TO APPROVE SALE OF REAL PROPERTY OWNED BY BIG STORM REAL ESTATE LLC AND RELATED RELIEF (610 CHARLOTTE ST PUNTA GORDA, FL 33950) (Doc. 534) Filed by Steven R Wirth on behalf of Trustee Michael Goldberg Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2025 at 11:00 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . (Wirth, Steven)
Related: [-] 534
535 535 misc Certificate of Necessity (BK) Fri 05/16 12:22 PM
Certificate of Necessity Filed by Steven R Wirth on behalf of Trustee Michael Goldberg Related [+]. (Wirth, Steven)
Related: [-] 534
534 534 motion Motion for Approval (including Approval of Mortgage Modification Agreement) Fri 05/16 12:21 PM
Emergency Motion for Approval of Sale of Real Property Owned by Big Storm Real Estate LLC and Related Relief (610 Charlotte St., Punta Gorda, FL 33950)
Related: [-]
533 533 notice Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings) Fri 05/16 10:39 AM
Notice of Zoom Call to Discuss Important Infomation and Deadlines for All Beneficiaries Filed by Megan Wilson Murray on behalf of Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee. (Murray, Megan)
Related: [-]
misc Emergency Matters Submission Notification Fri 05/16 12:29 PM
Emergency Matters Submission Notification Re: Chapter 11 Trustee's Agreed Emergency Motion to Approve Sale of Real Property Owned by Big Storm Real Estate and Related Relief (610 Charlotte St., Punta Gorda, FL 33950) to be heard on or before May 22, 2025 Filed by Steven R Wirth on behalf of Trustee Michael Goldberg Related [+]. (Wirth, Steven)
Related: [-] 535 ,534
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only Fri 05/16 2:19 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 05/21/2025 11:00 AM Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Re: Agreed Emergency Motion for Approval of Sale of Real Property Owned by Big Storm Real Estate LLC and Related Relief (610 Charlotte St., Punta Gorda, FL 33950) Doc534 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Steven R Wirth to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. Related [+]. (Bill)
Related: [-] 534
Thursday, May 15, 2025
532 532 order Extend Time Thu 05/15 1:04 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to /for Filing Proofs of Claim for Beneficiaries to July 15, 2025 and to Establish Amount of Beneficiaries Claim Related [+]. Service Instructions: Steven Wirth is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Anel)
Related: [-] 529
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
531 531 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/14 3:25 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jay B Verona on behalf of The Catholic Diocese of Youngstown, Diocese of Toledo, Diocese of Steubenville, Diocese of Columbus, Catholic Diocese of Cleveland, Archdiocese of Cincinnati. (Verona, Jay)
Related: [-]
530 530 misc Certificate Of Service (BK) Wed 05/14 4:25 AM
Certificate of Service Re: Chapter 11 Trustees Fifth Motion to Further Extend Time for Beneficiaries to File Proofs of Claim to July 31, 2025 and to Establish Amount of Beneficiaries Claims Filed by Other Prof. Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC (SJG) Related [+]. (Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC (SJG))
Related: [-] 529
Friday, May 09, 2025
529 529 motion Motion to Extend Time (BK) Fri 05/09 4:25 PM
Fifth Motion to Extend Time to for Beneficiaries to File Proofs of Claim to July 31, 2025 and to Establish Amount of Beneficiaries' Claims. Filed by Steven R Wirth on behalf of Trustee Michael Goldberg Related [+]
Related: [-] 177 ,147 ,479 ,378 ,381 ,478 ,286 ,271