Florida Southern District Court
Judge:James Lawrence King
Referred: Lisette M Reid
Case #: 1:24-cv-20524
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:0201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2024
Terminated:Nov 27, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 08, 2024 6:23 AM EDT
Defendant
Nielsen Beaumont Marine, Inc.
Represented By
Robert Stuart Turk
Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff & Sitterson
contact info
Pablo Luis Crucet, Jr.
Stearns Weaver Miller
contact info
Mediator
Lori Adelson 33301
Plaintiff
George Zarcadoolas
Represented By
Nhu Quynh Cao
Law Offices Of Charles Eiss, P.L.
contact info
Charles Merrill Eiss
Eiss Massillon, P.L.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Wed 11/27 3:27 PM
ORDER Approving Settlement and Dismissing Case/Closing Case (With Prejudice) Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 11/27/2024. See attached document for full details. (jp00)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
12 12 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 11/20 2:18 PM
ORDER re11 Settlement Agreement filed by Nielsen Beaumont Marine, Inc. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 11/20/2024. See attached document for full details. (jp00)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
11 11 misc Settlement Agreement - aty Tue 10/22 4:35 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal with Prejudice by Nielsen Beaumont Marine, Inc.(Crucet, Pablo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, July 08, 2024
10 10 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Mon 07/08 10:39 AM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Lori Adelson as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 08/27/2024. (Adelson, Lori)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
9 9 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 04/08 3:26 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: (Discovery due by 12/11/2024., Motions due by 12/16/2024., Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/14/2025., Jury Trial set for 4/21/2025 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Calendar Call set for 4/17/2025 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2025 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid for Pretrial Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 4/8/2024. See attached document for full details. (jlo)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/05 12:16 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Nielsen Beaumont Marine, Inc.. (Crucet, Pablo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 03/12 10:59 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Stuart Turk on behalf of Nielsen Beaumont Marine, Inc.. Attorney Robert Stuart Turk added to party Nielsen Beaumont Marine, Inc.(pty:dft). (Turk, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 03/13 1:58 PM
ORDER on Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Response due by 4/5/2024. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 3/11/2024. See attached document for full details. (jcy)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 03/08 8:28 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Nielsen Beaumont Marine, Inc.. Attorney Pablo Luis Crucet, Jr added to party Nielsen Beaumont Marine, Inc.(pty:dft). (Crucet, Pablo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
4 4 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 02/29 3:35 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by George Zarcadoolas. Nielsen Beaumont Marine, Inc. served on 2/23/2024, response/answer due 3/15/2024. (Eiss, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 02/09 3:21 PM
Summons Issued as to Nielsen Beaumont Marine, Inc. (pcs)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 02/09 3:19 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pcs)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/09 2:11 PM
COMPLAINT against Nielsen Beaumont Marine, Inc.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17282385, filed by George Zarcadoolas.(Eiss, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)