New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lorna G Schofield
Case #: 1:24-cv-00991
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332ed Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2024
Terminated:Jul 10, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 08, 2024 4:58 AM EDT
Defendant
Robin Standefer
Represented By
Darrell Spencer Gay
Arent Fox Llp (nyc)
contact info
Nicholas Lydell Collins
Arent Fox LLP
contact info
Defendant
Center For Goods, LLC
Represented By
Darrell Spencer Gay
Arent Fox Llp (nyc)
contact info
Nicholas Lydell Collins
Arent Fox LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Stella Cicarone
Represented By
Christian John Jensen
Jensen Law Firm LLC
contact info
Jason Louis Solotaroff
Giskan Solotaroff & Anderson, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, September 20, 2024
28 28 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 09/20 10:21 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Robin Standefer, Center For Goods, LLC and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Robin Standefer, Center For Goods, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Collins, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Wed 09/18 10:03 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Nicholas Collins. RE-FILE Document No. 27 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): individual parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against were not selected; the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed (ink/wet signatures) by all parties who have appeared;. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) PDF. (nd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
27 27 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 09/17 10:28 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Parties and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Robin Standefer, Center For Goods, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Collins, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 07/10 4:17 PM
ORDER The Court has been informed that the parties have reached a settlement in principle in this case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to the Courts calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days of this Order. Any application to reopen filed after thirty (30) days from the date of this Order may be denied solely on that basis. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot, and all conferences are CANCELED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/10/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
25 25 misc Status Report Tue 07/09 10:36 PM
STATUS REPORT. Regarding Participation In Mediation And Request To Adjourn Pending Deadlines Document filed by Center For Goods, LLC, Robin Standefer..(Collins, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
24 24 misc Letter Fri 06/28 4:50 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Nicholas L. Collins dated June 28, 2024 re: Mediation Status. Document filed by Center For Goods, LLC, Robin Standefer..(Collins, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
adr Mediation Conference Not Held Thu 06/20 1:58 PM
MEDIATION CONFERENCE NOT HELD Mediation Conference scheduled for 07/01/2024 will not be held. Mediation Status due by 7/8/2024.(sni)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Fri 06/07 4:07 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 7/8/2024.(sge)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Fri 06/07 4:12 PM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 7/1/2024 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(sge)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
22 22 order Mediation Referral Order Tue 05/28 4:59 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program to take place by June 28, 2022. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in good faith. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. To the extent possible, the Mediation Program is directed to appoint a mediator with expertise in employment discrimination matters. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 6/11/2024. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/28/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
21 21 misc Letter Fri 05/24 4:05 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jason Solotaroff dated May 24, 2024 re: status report and request for referral to mediation. Document filed by Stella Cicarone..(Solotaroff, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/30 7:27 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Center For Goods, LLC, Robin Standefer..(Gay, Darrell)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/30 7:22 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Darrell Spencer Gay on behalf of Center For Goods, LLC, Robin Standefer..(Gay, Darrell)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
18 18 5 pgs order Scheduling Order Thu 03/28 3:23 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties should note that the Court does not ordinarily stay the case or extend discovery for mediation or other settlement discussions. So Ordered. All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. See 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 5 days. Amended Pleadings due by 5/27/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 5/27/2024. Deposition due by 7/25/2024. Fact Discovery due by 7/25/2024. Expert Discovery due by 9/9/2024. Pre-Motion Conference set for 9/25/2024 at 04:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The motion will be discussed at the conference. To join the conference, the parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and use Access Code 558-3333. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed at that time. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter the dates under paragraphs 5, 6, 8(a), 9(b)-(c) and 13(a)-(c) into the Court's calendar, and to schedule the conference under paragraph 13(c) as a Pre-Motion Conference, even though the conference will be held by telephone. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/28/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 03/26 4:39 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the March 27, 2024, initial pretrial conference is CANCELED. If the parties believe that a conference would nevertheless be useful, they should inform the Court immediately so the conference can be reinstated. The case management plan and scheduling order will issue in a separate order. The parties' attention is particularly directed to the provisions for periodic status letters, and the need for a pre-motion letter to avoid cancellation of the final conference and setting of a trial date. It is further ORDERED that if Defendant(s) seek to file a motion to dismiss, they shall file a pre-motion letter pursuant to Individual Rules III.A.1 and III.C.2. It is further ORDERED, regarding settlement discussions, if and when the parties are ready to proceed with a settlement conference with the assigned Magistrate Judge or mediation in the Court's mediation program, they shall file a joint letter on ECF requesting a referral. The parties should be aware that the Court does not extend the deadlines for fact and expert discovery absent compelling circumstances. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/26/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
16 16 3 pgs misc Proposed Case Management Plan Mon 03/25 9:49 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Stella Cicarone..(Jensen, Christian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Case Management Plan
15 15 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/25 9:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christian John Jensen on behalf of Stella Cicarone..(Jensen, Christian)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Mon 03/25 9:11 AM
ORDER denying13 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application DENIED. The initial pretrial conference will proceed as scheduled. The parties shall jointly submit the materials described in the Order at Dkt. 10 by March 25, 2024. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/22/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
13 13 2 pgs motion Adjourn Conference Wed 03/20 6:52 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Nicholas L. Collins dated 3/20/2024. Document filed by Center For Goods, LLC, Robin Standefer..(Collins, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/20 6:47 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Lydell Collins on behalf of Center For Goods, LLC, Robin Standefer..(Collins, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/20 6:43 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Darrell Spencer Gay on behalf of Center For Goods, LLC, Robin Standefer..(Gay, Darrell)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
10 10 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 02/13 3:48 PM
ORDER: The telephonic conference is public, and the time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties shall ensure they are all dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time, as further set forth. Initial Conference set for 3/27/2024 at 04:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/14/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs service Summons Issued Tue 02/13 3:20 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Center For Goods, LLC..(pc)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs service Summons Issued Tue 02/13 3:19 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robin Standefer..(pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
7 7 1 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 02/12 1:33 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ROBIN STANDEFER, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Stella Cicarone..(Solotaroff, Jason)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 02/12 1:31 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CENTER FOR GOODS, LLC d/b/a ROMAN AND WILLIAMS; ROMAN AND WILLIAMS GUILD; LA MERCERIE AND GUILD GALLERY, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Stella Cicarone..(Solotaroff, Jason)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 02/12 1:26 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Solotaroff, Jason)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Mon 02/12 12:46 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jason Louis Solotaroff to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; all of the party names must be listed on the PDF case caption. If all of the party names do not fit, include 'et al'; the incorrect Citizenship Defendant code was selected under Citizenship of Principal Parties;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 02/12 12:47 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jason Louis Solotaroff. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 02/12 12:48 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 02/12 12:49 PM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 02/12 12:50 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 02/12 12:51 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jason Louis Solotaroff to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons, 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; all of the party names must be listed on the PDF case caption. If all of the party names do not fit, include 'et al';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
4 4 1 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 02/09 3:58 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ROBIN STANDEFER, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Stella Cicarone..(Solotaroff, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 02/09 3:57 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CENTER FOR GOODS, LLC d/b/a ROMAN AND WILLIAMS GUILD, LA MERCERIE AND GUILD GALLERY, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Stella Cicarone..(Solotaroff, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 02/09 3:54 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Solotaroff, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/09 3:52 PM
COMPLAINT against Center For Goods, LLC d/b/a Roman and Williams; Roman and Williams Guild; La Mercerie; and Guild Gallery, Robin Standefer. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28930168)Document filed by Stella Cicarone..(Solotaroff, Jason)
Related: [-]