Magna Service Agency, Inc.
Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Gregory L Taddonio |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-20318 |
Case Filed: | Feb 09, 2024 |
Dismissed: | Mar 17, 2025 |
Terminated: | Apr 01, 2025 |
Plan Confirmed: | Aug 05, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Magna Service Agency, Inc.
141 Southpointe Dr
Bridgeville, PA 15017-1235 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
1000 Liberty Avenue Suite 1316
Pittsburgh, PA 15222 |
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 6:06 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 01, 2025 | ||
151 | 151
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 04/01 3:31 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (dpas) |