California Northern District Court
Judge:James Donato
Case #: 5:24-cv-00807
Nature of Suit130 Contract - Miller Act
Cause40:270 Miller Act
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2024
Terminated:May 16, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 08, 2024 2:20 AM PDT
Plaintiff
Bayview Industrial Services, Inc.
Represented By
Alan Robert Rosin
Leonidou & Rosin
contact info
Tony John Stavjanik
Clapp Moroney Bellagamba Vucinich
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Heffler Contracting Group
Terminated: 05/16/2024
Represented By
Lindsey Carter Herzik
Finch Thornton And Baird LLP
contact info
Andrea Lynn Petray
Finch Thornton And Baird LLP
contact info
Defendant
Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Terminated: 05/16/2024
Represented By
Andrea Lynn Petray
Finch Thornton And Baird LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 02, 2024
15 15 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/02 8:59 AM
CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT ZOOM HEARING AND NOTICE OF REQUIRED REGISTRATION. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2024 is RESET to 5/28/2024 01:30 PM in San Jose - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2024. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vkd] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails specifying main speaker(s) must be sent to the CRD at VKDcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 5/23/2024 at 2:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
14 14 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 04/23 4:30 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Heffler Contracting Group (Herzik, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR Tue 04/23 4:18 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Heffler Contracting Group and Stay Action pending Arbitration filed by Heffler Contracting Group. (Herzik, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
12 12 service Affidavit of Service Fri 04/19 11:15 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet and Orders served on Rebecca Vang, Authorized to Accept Service on March 28, 2024, filed by Bayview Industrial Services, Inc.. (Rosin, Alan)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Affidavit of Service Fri 04/19 11:10 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet and Orders served on Cheryl Roston, HR, Authorized to Accept Service on April 2, 2024, filed by Bayview Industrial Services, Inc.. (Rosin, Alan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Wed 04/17 2:41 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Consent/Declination due by 5/1/2024. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
9 9 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 04/16 4:34 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company's Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading to Bayview Industrial Services, Inc.'s Complaint filed by Heffler Contracting Group, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Petray, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 02/26 5:27 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bayview Industrial Services, Inc... (Rosin, Alan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 02/22 4:13 PM
Summons Issued as to Heffler Contracting Group, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 02/22 4:10 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2024 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
5 5 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 02/21 3:48 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Bayview Industrial Services, Inc. . (Rosin, Alan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
4 4 cmp Complaint Tue 02/20 2:34 PM
COMPLAINT FOR RECOVERY ON MILLER ACT PAYMENT BOND, BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT, COMMON COUNT, AND ACCOUNT STATED against Heffler Contracting Group, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Filed by Bayview Industrial Services, Inc..(Rosin, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Electronic Filing Error Tue 02/20 1:19 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Tony Stavjanik. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document. Please update your personal profile on ECF. Re:1 Complaint, filed by Bayview Industrial Services, Inc. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Tue 02/20 1:31 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Proposed Summons: This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file the document as a separate entry on the docket. Re:1 Complaint, filed by Bayview Industrial Services, Inc. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 02/16 5:02 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Bayview Industrial Services, Inc. . (Rosin, Alan)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 02/16 11:19 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Please refile Civil Cover Sheet with Signatures of Attorney of Record and Date. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re:1 Complaint, filed by Bayview Industrial Services, Inc. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 02/12 11:20 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/26/2024. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/09 4:50 PM
COMPLAINT FOR RECOVERY ON MILLER ACT PAYMENT BOND, BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT, COMMON COUNT, AND ACCOUNT STATED against Heffler Contracting Group, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19112839.). Filed by Bayview Industrial Services, Inc..(Rosin, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons