New Mexico District Court
Judge:David H Urias
Referred: Damian L Martinez
Case #: 2:24-cv-00138
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1391 Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 08, 2024 4:40 AM MDT
Defendant
DS Xpress Incorporated
Represented By
Abigail Reinard Wolberg
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Kate Jones
contact info
Defendant
Rainier Fruit Company
Represented By
Brendan V. Monahan
Slvms
contact info
Dalva L Moellenberg
Gallagher & Kennedy
contact info
Samantha Hope Catalano
Montgomery & Andrews, P.A.
contact info
Marthy Hernandez
Stokes Lawrence Velikanje Moore & Shore
contact info
Valerie Walker
Stokes Lawrence, P.S.
contact info
Defendant
Sage Fruit Company, LLC
Represented By
Darci A Carroll
Priest & Miller, LLP
contact info
Donna L Chapman
Chapman And Priest, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Vladimir Shakhnazaryan
Represented By
Abigail Reinard Wolberg
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Kate Jones
contact info
Defendant
Albertson's LLC
Represented By
Amanda Kaye Nelson
Mayer LLP
contact info
Brian J. Fisher
Mayer LLP
contact info
Defendant
Albertsons Companies Inc.
Represented By
Amanda Kaye Nelson
Mayer LLP
contact info
Brian J. Fisher
Mayer LLP
contact info
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance
Plaintiff
Deborah Steen
901 E. University Ave. Ste. 965-L
Las Cruces, NM 88001
Represented By
Manuel E. Lopez, III
Scherr Legate, PLLC
contact info
Oscar A Lara
Scherr Legate PLLC
contact info
Joseph Cervantes
Cervantes Law Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
98 98 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez: Status Conference held on 4/29/2025. (ma)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
97 97 1 pgs ORDER by Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez. The Telephonic Status Conference previously set for 4/29/2025 at 1:00 PM is hereby VACATED and RESET to Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/29/2025 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez. Counsel shall call (855) 244-8681 and enter access code 2317 194 3997 to be connected to the conference. (ma)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
96 96 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution: Jari Lynn Rubio substituted for Amanda K. Nelson (Rubio, Jari)
Related: [-]