New Hampshire District Court
Judge:Samantha D Elliott
Referred: Talesha L Saint-Marc
Case #: 1:24-cv-00039
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2024
Terminated:May 09, 2025
Petitioner
Vincent Trowell
Respondent
FCI Berlin, Warden

GPO Feb 21 2025
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 6 Motion for Summary Judgment. For the following reasons, the district judge should deny the Warden's motion for summary judgment without prejudice. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 3/7/2025. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc.(vln)
GPO Mar 26 2025
ORDER approving 19 Report and Recommendation; denying without prejudice 6 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Samantha D. Elliott.(lw)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
25 25 order Judgment Fri 05/09 2:25 PM
JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Tracy A. Uhrin, Clerk of Court. (Case Closed) (lw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 05/08 4:22 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 24 Motion to Dismiss for Mootness. Text of Order: There being no objection from the petitioner and for the reasons stated in the warden's motion, the motion is granted. So Ordered by Judge Samantha D. Elliott.(lw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
24 24 motion Dismiss Thu 04/10 3:51 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Mootness filed by FCI Berlin, Warden.Follow up on Objection on 4/24/2025. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Katz, Raphael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
23 23 notice Notice - Mail Returned Tue 04/08 1:38 PM
NOTICE of Mail Returned - "Return to Sender, Attempted - Not Known, Unable to Forward" re:22 Order on Report and Recommendation.(lw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendation Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Thu 03/27 2:00 PM
ORDER approving 19 Report and Recommendation; denying without prejudice 6 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Samantha D. Elliott.(lw)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
21 21 notice Substitute Attorney Fri 03/07 3:41 PM
Notice to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Raphael Katz. Attorney Terry L. Ollila terminated. Attorney Raphael Katz added to party FCI Berlin, Warden(pty:res).(Katz, Raphael)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
order Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond Mon 02/24 10:28 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 20 Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc. Follow up on Objection on 3/21/2025. (lw)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
20 20 motion Extend Time to Object/Respond Fri 02/21 12:23 PM
MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re6 Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,, recommending For the following reasons, the district judge should deny the Wardens motion for summary judgment (Doc. No. 6) without prejudice.. to March 21, 2025 filed by FCI Berlin, Warden.Follow up on Objection on 3/7/2025. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Ollila, Terry)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Report and Recommendation Fri 02/21 9:48 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 6 Motion for Summary Judgment. For the following reasons, the district judge should deny the Warden's motion for summary judgment without prejudice. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 3/7/2025. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc.(vln)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Expedite Fri 02/21 9:55 AM
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 14 Motion to Expedite. Text of Order: Denied as moot. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc.(vln)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
18 18 misc Addendum Thu 02/13 11:32 AM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241 AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Vincent Trowell. (vln)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
17 17 misc Addendum Tue 12/03 11:49 AM
Addendum to9 Objection to Motion,1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241 by Vincent Trowell.(jwb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachments
16 16 misc Miscellaneous Filing Tue 12/03 11:46 AM
Request for Status Update by Vincent Trowell.(jwb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
15 15 notice Change of Address Tue 10/29 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Vincent Trowell.(jwb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
14 14 motion Expedite Wed 10/09 2:27 PM
MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Petitioner's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Vincent Trowell.Follow up on Objection on 10/23/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(jwb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
13 13 respm Response to Motion Mon 07/29 4:46 PM
PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S OBJECTION TO RESPONDENT'S6 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Vincent Trowell. (jwb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
utility Motion Referred & Submitted - Dispositive Thu 07/25 2:36 PM
Notice regarding6 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this motion has been referred to Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc for proposed findings of fact and a recommendation as to its disposition. Any such findings and recommendations shall be filed with the Court and a copy shall forthwith be served on all parties. (jwb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
12 12 misc Brief/Memorandum Fri 07/19 2:23 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Petitioner's Motion for Summary Judgment, by Vincent Trowell(vln)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
11 11 respm Response - not to Motion Thu 07/18 10:30 AM
RESPONSE re10 Objection to Motion, filed by FCI Berlin, Warden.(Ollila, Terry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) A - Declaration of Stacy Fanello,
Att: 2 Attachment to Exhibit A1 - Barden Letter to Court,
Att: 3 Attachment to Exhibit A2 - Barden Factors Worksheet
Friday, July 12, 2024
10 10 respm Objection to Motion Fri 07/12 11:11 AM
PETITIONER'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY TO RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE6 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Vincent Trowell. Follow up on Reply on 7/19/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (jwb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
9 9 respm Objection to Motion Wed 07/03 10:51 AM
RESPONSE to6 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Vincent Trowell. Follow up on Reply on 7/10/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(jwb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
order Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond Wed 06/05 7:58 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 8 Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond to 6 Motion for Summary Judgment. Text of Order: Granted. Plaintiff shall file any objection to the defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before July 5, 2024. So Ordered by Judge Samantha D. Elliott.Follow up on Objection on 7/5/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(jwb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
8 8 motion Extend Time to Object/Respond Mon 05/20 3:27 PM
MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to6 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Vincent Trowell.Follow up on Objection on 6/3/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(jwb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
7 7 notice Notice Regarding Summary Judgment Thu 05/09 2:53 PM
NOTICE Regarding Summary Judgment.(jwb)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Summary Judgment Thu 05/09 1:50 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FCI Berlin, Warden.Follow up on Objection on 6/10/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Ollila, Terry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law Memo of Law in Support of MFSJ,
Att: 2 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration of Stacy Fanello,
Att: 3 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment 1 - Inmate Data,
Att: 4 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment 2 - Sentence Computation,
Att: 5 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment 3 - Booking History,
Att: 6 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment 4 - Supervised Release Violation,
Att: 7 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment 5 - Designation & Sentence Computation,
Att: 8 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment 6 - Convictions,
Att: 9 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment 7 - Booking Sheet,
Att: 10 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment 8 - NJ Municipal Court Documents,
Att: 11 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment 9 - NJ Municipal Court Records,
Att: 12 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment 10 - NJ v. Trowell,
Att: 13 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment 11 - US v. Trowell,
Att: 14 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment 12 - Custody/Detention Report,
Att: 15 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment 13 - J & C,
Att: 16 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment 14 - Pennsylvania v. Trowell,
Att: 17 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment 15 - Pennsylvania v. Trowell,
Att: 18 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment 16 - Sentencing Order,
Att: 19 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment 17 - Designation & Sentence Computation,
Att: 20 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment 18 - J & C Supervised Release Revocation,
Att: 21 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment 19 - Designation and Sentence Computation,
Att: 22 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment 20 - Public Information Inmate Data,
Att: 23 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment 21 - Program Statement 5880.28,
Att: 24 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment 22 - Program Statement 5880.28 - Writ,
Att: 25 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment 23 - BOP Administrative Remedy History,
Att: 26 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment 24 - Administrative Remedy - Trowell
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
order Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer Tue 04/09 4:34 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 5 MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to May 10, 2024. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc. Answer Follow Up on 5/10/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(jwb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
5 5 motion Extend Time to Answer Mon 04/08 1:49 PM
MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to May 10, 2024 filed by FCI Berlin, Warden. Attorney Terry L. Ollila added to party FCI Berlin, Warden(pty:res).Follow up on Objection on 4/22/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Ollila, Terry)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
misc Fee Paid Mon 03/04 11:07 AM
Filing Fee paid: $ 5 (Check), receipt number 1275 by Vincent Trowell re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241. (mc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
4 4 service Certificate of Service Mon 03/04 9:26 AM
CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT for US Attorney General re: Clerk Service. (jwb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
3 3 service Certificate of Service Wed 02/21 1:12 PM
CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT re: Clerk Service on FCI Berlin, Warden.(jwb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
2 2 2 pgs order Order Directing Service Mon 02/12 2:05 PM
ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc.(jwb)
Related: [-]
service Clerk Service Mon 02/12 2:07 PM
SERVICE BY CLERK: Copies mailed via certified mail, return receipt requested to FCI Berlin, Warden per2 Order Directing Service.(jwb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
notice Notice - ECF Fri 02/09 4:16 PM
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] . (mc)
Related: [-]
notice Filing Fee Omitted Notice Fri 02/09 4:16 PM
NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the $5.00 filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs, Certificate of Custodial Institution. Compliance Deadline set for 4/9/2024.(mc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus-2241 Fri 02/09 4:14 PM
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 USC 2241 filed by Vincent Trowell.(mc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Document
utility Case Assigned Fri 02/09 4:15 PM
Case assigned to Judge Samantha D. Elliott and US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc. The case designation is: 1:24-cv-39-SE-TSM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
Related: [-]