Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Susan Paradise Baxter
Case #: 1:24-cv-00033
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2024
Terminated:Aug 26, 2024
Defendant
ALEXANDER
Defendant
DEAL
Defendant
DEPT' OF CORR.
Defendant
I. GUSTAFSON
Defendant
J. WALKER
Defendant
JOSEPH SILVA
Defendant
LAUREL HARRY
Defendant
LOWE
Defendant
M. BLICHA
Defendant
MANUFACTURE OF CHARM-TEX. TOOTHPASTE DIRECTOR
Defendant
MOWRY
Defendant
PRISON COMMISSARY INDUSTRIES DIRECTOR
Defendant
R. IRWIN
Defendant
R. MARSH
Defendant
WEILAND
Plaintiff
BRIAN NELSON
Plaintiff
RAHEIN SHERMAN
Plaintiff
RONALD STOCKTON
Plaintiff
SHAWN THOMAS JR
Plaintiff
THOMAS W. MCCUNE JR.

GPO Nov 26 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION respectfully recommending that Ronald Stockton be prohibited from proceeding in forma pauperis in his filings in this Court absent a showing of imminent danger of serious physical injury, as set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). As more fully stated herein. Objections to R&R due by 12/13/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/26/2023. Copies mailed to Plaintiffs at their addresses of record, except for BRIAN NELSON, for whom no address has been provided. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Stockton v. McGinley No. 22-902 (M.D. Pa.) ECF No. 89, # (2) Appendix Stockton v. McGinley No. 22-902 (M.D. Pa.) ECF No. 118) (dad)
GPO Jan 08 2025
MEMORANDUM ORDER: AND NOW, this 8th day of January 2025; IT IS ORDERED that the report and recommendation of Magistrate Judge Kelly, issued on November 26, 2024, ECF No. 16, is adopted as the opinion of the court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, henceforth, because of his history of abuse of the privilege of proceeding in forma pauperis, Ronald Stockton shall be prohibited from proceed in forma pauperis in his filings in this Court absent a showing of imminent danger of serious physical injury, as set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 1/8/2025. (snc)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
29 29 appeal USCA Order - (Does Not Terminate Appeal) Thu 05/01 12:50 PM
ORDER of USCA as to24 Notice of Appeal, Granting application by RONALD STOCKTON to proceed in forma pauperis and assessing fees. (gch3)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
28 28 respoth Response in Opposition Fri 04/25 11:17 AM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to17 Motion for TRO, filed by ALEXANDER, M. BLICHA, DEAL, DEPT' OF CORR., I. GUSTAFSON, LAUREL HARRY, R. IRWIN, LOWE, R. MARSH, MOWRY, JOSEPH SILVA, J. WALKER, WEILAND. (Flowers, Meghan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/25 11:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan A. Flowers on behalf of ALEXANDER, M. BLICHA, DEAL, DEPT' OF CORR., I. GUSTAFSON, LAUREL HARRY, R. IRWIN, LOWE, R. MARSH, MOWRY, JOSEPH SILVA, J. WALKER, WEILAND. (Flowers, Meghan)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
26 26 appeal USCA Notice of Docketing (Case Number & Case Manager Assigned) Fri 01/31 11:55 AM
USCA Case Number 25-1164 for24 Notice of Appeal, filed by RONALD STOCKTON. USCA Case Manager James (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (jk3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
25 25 appeal Letter to pay appeal filing fee Tue 01/28 9:59 AM
LETTER from Clerk to RONALD STOCKTON re24 Notice of Appeal, to pay appeal filing fee or submit a motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis. (bjr)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
24 24 appeal Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Required) Mon 01/27 1:11 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to23 Order on Report and Recommendations,, by RONALD STOCKTON. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. The Transcript Purchase Order form will NOT be mailed to the parties. The form is available on the Court's internet site. (bjr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Envelope
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
23 23 4 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Wed 01/08 7:20 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: AND NOW, this 8th day of January 2025; IT IS ORDERED that the report and recommendation of Magistrate Judge Kelly, issued on November 26, 2024, ECF No.16 , is adopted as the opinion of the court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, henceforth, because of his history of abuse of the privilege of proceeding in forma pauperis, Ronald Stockton shall be prohibited from proceed in forma pauperis in his filings in this Court absent a showing of imminent danger of serious physical injury, as set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 1/8/2025. (snc)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
22 22 order Order on Motion to Extend Time Fri 12/20 2:43 PM
ORDER denying21 Motion to Extend Time for Affidavit of Imminent Harm. The Court has not set a deadline for Plaintiff to file an Affidavit of imminent harm. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED this 20th day of December 2024 that Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/20/24. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ndf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
21 21 motion Extend Time Wed 12/18 8:46 AM
MOTION to Extend Time. Show of Imminent Danger. by RONALD STOCKTON. Motion(s) referred to Maureen P. Kelly. (bjr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, December 13, 2024
20 20 respoth Objections to Report and Recommendation Sun 12/15 12:46 PM
OBJECTIONS to16 Report and Recommendation and 18 Order, filed by RONALD STOCKTON. (sms)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Envelope
19 19 appeal Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Required) Fri 12/13 1:40 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 18 Order,16 Report and Recommendation, by RONALD STOCKTON. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. The Transcript Purchase Order form will NOT be mailed to the parties. The form is available on the Court's internet site. (bjr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Envelope
Friday, December 06, 2024
18 18 order Order Fri 12/06 10:01 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff Stockton is prohibited from filing documents with this Court that contain more than one case number in the heading. This is due to Plaintiff Stockton's numerous, voluminous filings captioned for multiple cases, which arise from different alleged transactions or occurrences, in this Court and in other courts as well. See, e.g., Stockton v. Wetzel, No. 16-cv-613 (M.D. Pa.), ECF No. 337. The Clerk of Court is directed to return any documents with multiple case numbers in the heading to Plaintiff Stockton. This Order is applicable to any case that Plaintiff Stockton has filed, or will file, in this Court. In accordance with the Magistrate Judges Act, 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1), and Rule 72.C.2 of the Local Rules of Court, the parties are allowed fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to file an appeal to the District Judge which includes the basis for objection to this Order. Any appeal is to be submitted to the Clerk of Court, United States District Court, 700 Grant Street, Room 3110, Pittsburgh, PA 15219. Failure to file a timely appeal will constitute a waiver of any appellate rights. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/6/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. Copies mailed to Plaintiffs at their addresses of record, except for BRIAN NELSON, for whom no address has been provided. (dad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
17 17 motion Temporary Restraining Order Tue 12/03 11:47 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by RONALD STOCKTON. Motion(s) referred to Maureen P. Kelly. (bjr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
16 16 motion Report and Recommendation Tue 11/26 2:17 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION respectfully recommending that Ronald Stockton be prohibited from proceeding in forma pauperis in his filings in this Court absent a showing of imminent danger of serious physical injury, as set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). As more fully stated herein. Objections to R&R due by 12/13/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/26/2023. Copies mailed to Plaintiffs at their addresses of record, except for BRIAN NELSON, for whom no address has been provided. (dad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Stockton v. McGinley No. 22-902 (M.D. Pa.) ECF No. 89,
Att: 2 Appendix Stockton v. McGinley No. 22-902 (M.D. Pa.) ECF No. 118
Monday, November 25, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 11/25 10:54 AM
Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly no longer presiding in case. (sms)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 11/25 10:55 AM
Judge Susan Paradise Baxter presiding and Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly referred. (sms)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
15 15 motion Dismiss Reopen Case Mon 11/18 10:35 AM
MOTION to Terminate Additional Plaintiffs and Reinstate Case by RONALD STOCKTON. (sms)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Change of Address / NEF (COURT USERS) Thu 11/14 8:20 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by RONALD STOCKTON. FILER advised that the change of address has been made on above captioned matter only. FILER address has been updated to SCI Fayette. If you wish to have address changed on other matters before this court, it is your responsibility to file such a notice at each case number. This NEF has been mailed to RONALD STOCKTON. (bjr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, October 25, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 10/25 9:41 AM
Pursuant to Administrative Order 2024-12, Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly presiding. Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo no longer assigned to case. (cww)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
13 13 utility Remark for lodged amended complaint Tue 09/24 9:42 AM
Remark: Amended Complaint lodged without Motion for In Forma Pauperis or payment of filing fee (bjr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Envelope
Monday, August 26, 2024
12 12 4 pgs order Order for Administrative Case Closing Mon 08/26 12:36 PM
ORDER FOR ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING. To proceed with this action jointly, Plaintiffs must either prepay the filing fee or each Plaintiff must submit the required paperwork to comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court. The IFP motion filed by Plaintiff Stockton [ECF No. 1] will be held in abeyance while the remaining Plaintiffs determine how they wish to proceed. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 8/26/2024. (dlh)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
11 11 utility Remark for lodged amended complaint Thu 08/01 8:41 AM
Remark: Amended Complaint lodged pending Motion for In Forma Pauperis or payment of filing fee (bjr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Envelope
Monday, July 08, 2024
10 10 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Thu 07/11 8:35 AM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by RONALD STOCKTON. (bjr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
9 9 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 07/11 8:32 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RONALD STOCKTON. (bjr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, June 27, 2024
8 8 notice Notice (Other) - Do Not Use for ADR Documents Thu 06/27 1:44 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE re1 Lodged Complaint (dlh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Change of Address / NEF (COURT USERS) Tue 05/28 2:37 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by THOMAS W. MCCUNE, JR. FILER advised that the change of address has been made on above captioned matter only. FILER address has been updated to 132 Harris Rd. Butler, PA 16002. If you wish to have address changed on other matters before this court, it is your responsibility to file such a notice at each case number. This NEF has been mailed to THOMAS W. MCCUNE, JR. (bjr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, April 15, 2024
6 6 notice Notice (Other) - Do Not Use for ADR Documents Tue 04/16 9:53 AM
NOTICE to the Court of Institution Returning Mail to Court by RONALD STOCKTON (bjr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Envelope
Friday, April 05, 2024
5 5 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 04/05 1:48 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RONALD STOCKTON. (bjr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
4 4 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Fri 04/05 1:46 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by RONALD STOCKTON. (bjr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
2 2 order Standing Practice Order for Pro Se Civil Rights Cases Wed 03/06 1:34 PM
STANDING PRACTICE ORDER FOR PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS CASES. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 3/6/2024. (dlh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
3 3 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Wed 04/03 11:17 AM
Affidavit and Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by RONALD STOCKTON. (dlh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 02/09 3:57 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by THOMAS W. MCCUNE, BRIAN NELSON, RONALD STOCKTON. (bjr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion,
Att: 2 Envelope