Colorado District Court
Judge:Nina Y Wang
Referred: Susan Prose
Case #: 1:24-cv-00409
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 08, 2024 2:47 AM MDT
Defendant
Owners Insurance Company
Represented By
Kira Noelle Adams
Zupkus & Angell PC
contact info
Erica Olson Payne
Zupkus & Angell PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Julie King
Represented By
Clarence Edwin Gamble
Ramos Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, April 18, 2025
39 39 10 pgs order Order Fri 04/18 2:42 PM
TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/18/2025. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
38 38 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 04/17 8:26 AM
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Telephonic Status Conference held before Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/16/2025. Five-day Jury Trial set to commence 2/2/2026 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge Nina Y. Wang. Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation Conference set for 11/21/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge Nina Y. Wang. Court Reporter: Mary George. (ebuch)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
37 37 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 04/10 5:05 PM
REPLY to Response to32 MOTION for Order to Limit Plaintiff's Treating Providers' Testimony filed by Defendant Owners Insurance Company. (Adams, Kira)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
36 36 respm Response to Motion Thu 04/03 4:33 PM
RESPONSE to32 MOTION for Order to Limit Plaintiff's Treating Providers' Testimony Opposition filed by Plaintiff Julie King.(Gamble, Clarence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - TAR (bates 000001 - 000003),
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Swedish ER Excerpt,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Gessman Excerpt,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Dr. Aschberger Independant Medical Exam Report - Julie King
Monday, March 31, 2025
35 35 order Order on Motion for Hearing/Conference Mon 03/31 5:47 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The34 Joint Motion to Request Telephonic Status Conference is GRANTED . A telephonic status conference is SET for 4/16/2025 at 2:30 PM before Judge Nina Y. Wang for purposes of setting a Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation Conference and trial in this matter. Counsel for the Parties shall participate using the following dial-in information: 571-353-2301; Access Code: 783456374 . By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/31/2025. Text Only Entry(nywlc8, )
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Hearing/Conference Mon 03/31 2:15 PM
Joint MOTION for Hearing/Conference Telephonic Status Conference by Defendant Owners Insurance Company. (Khan, Muliha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
33 33 order Memorandum Wed 03/26 1:55 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding32 MOTION for Order to Limit Plaintiff's Treating Providers' Testimony filed by Owners Insurance Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/26/2025. Text Only Entry (nywlc8, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
32 32 15 pgs motion Order Mon 03/24 4:37 PM
MOTION for Order to Limit Plaintiff's Treating Providers' Testimony by Defendant Owners Insurance Company.(Khan, Muliha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's First Supplemental Expert Disclosures,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Minute Order Doc. 47 Geist v. Kniss,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Order Doc. 67 Vanderlaan v. Ameriprise
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
31 31 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify Wed 11/13 9:13 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 11/13/2024, granting29 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order.Designation of Affirmative Experts due 12/30/2024. Designation of Rebuttal Experts due 1/27/2025. Discovery due by 2/24/2025. Dispositive and Rule 702 Motions due by 3/24/2025. Text Only Entry (sbplc1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
30 30 order Memorandum Minute Order Tue 11/12 2:36 PM
MINUTE ORDER regarding29 Second MOTION to Amend. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/12/2024. (nywlc8, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
29 29 motion Amend/Correct/Modify Mon 11/11 3:53 PM
Second MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify 28 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify, Scheduling Order by Defendant Owners Insurance Company. (Adams, Kira)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
28 28 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify Tue 09/17 8:01 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 9/17/2024, granting26 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Designation of Affirmative Experts due 11/14/2024. Designation of Rebuttal Experts due 12/12/2024. Discovery due by 1/13/2025. Dispositive and Rule 702 Motions due by 2/12/2025. Text Only Entry (sbplc1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
27 27 order Memorandum Wed 09/11 9:40 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding26 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify21 Scheduling Order filed by Owners Insurance Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 09/11/2024. Text Only Entry (nywlc5, )
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Amend/Correct/Modify Wed 09/11 5:48 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify21 Scheduling Order by Defendant Owners Insurance Company. (Adams, Kira)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
25 25 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 08/23 4:57 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The24 Motion for Leave to Withdraw for Attorney Erica O. Payne is GRANTED for good cause shown. Attorney Erica Payne is hereby terminated from her representation of Defendant in this case. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 08/23/2024. Text Only Entry (nywlc5, )
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 08/23 10:29 AM
MOTION for Leave to Withdraw for Attorney Erica O. Payne by Defendant Owners Insurance Company. (Payne, Erica)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 08/23 8:25 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Muliha Khan by Muliha Alia Khan on behalf of Owners Insurance CompanyAttorney Muliha Alia Khan added to party Owners Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Khan, Muliha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information Tue 04/23 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information Zupkus & Angell, P.C. by Erica Olson Payne (Payne, Erica)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
21 21 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/01 3:11 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 4/1/2024. Discovery due by 11/15/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 12/15/2024. (trvo, )
Related: [-]
20 20 minutes Scheduling Conference Mon 04/01 3:10 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 4/1/2024. FTR: C205. (trvo, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
19 19 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 03/25 3:04 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Owners Insurance Company. (Payne, Erica)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Tue 03/19 8:24 AM
STIPULATED RULE 502(D) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 3/19/2024. (sbplc3)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
17 17 order Memorandum Mon 03/18 1:56 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding16 STIPULATION Order Regarding to Fed. R. Evidence 502(d) filed by Owners Insurance Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 03/18/2024. Text Only Entry (nywlc5, )
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs motion Order Mon 03/18 10:33 AM
STIPULATION Order Regarding to Fed. R. Evidence 502(d) by Defendant Owners Insurance Company. (Payne, Erica) Modified on 3/18/2024 at the request of Chambers (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
15 15 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Wed 03/06 8:40 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Owners Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Payne, Erica)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
14 14 misc Statement Fri 02/23 10:06 AM
STATEMENT Julie King Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Julie King. (Gamble, Clarence)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order Thu 02/22 2:27 PM
ORDER SETTING CONSENT DEADLINE AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 2/22/2024. Consent Form due by 3/18/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/25/2024. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/1/2024, at 11:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. The parties shall attend by calling 571-353-2301, Guest meeting ID- 868150043. All attendees shall please mute their phone when not speaking and not use speaker phone. (trvo, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
12 12 order Minute Order Tue 02/20 10:19 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Defendant removed this case on February 9, 2024, invoking this Court's diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. § 1332. [Doc.1 at 1]. Under Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, "[i]n an action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity under 28 U.S.C. § 1332(a), a party... must, unless the court orders otherwise, file a disclosure statement" that "name[s]--and identif[ies] the citizenship of--every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor." Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2). This disclosure statement is to be filed "when the action is filed in... federal court," Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2)(A), or at the time of the party's "first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court," Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(b)(1). Defendant filed its Corporate Disclosure Statement alongside its Notice of Removal. See [Doc.2 ]. Plaintiff has appeared in this action, [Doc.11 ], but has not filed her disclosure statement. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that, on or before February 27, 2024 , Plaintiff SHALL FILE a Rule 7.1 disclosure statement identifying her state citizenship. The Court notes that an individual's citizenship is based on domicile, not residence. Whitelock v. Leatherman , 460 F.2d 507, 514 (10th Cir. 1972). By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 02/20/2024. Text Only Entry (nywlc5, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 02/16 10:15 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Clarence Edwin Gamble on behalf of Julie KingAttorney Clarence Edwin Gamble added to party Julie King(pty:pla) (Gamble, Clarence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 02/14 11:19 AM
ANSWER to5 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Owners Insurance Company.(Payne, Erica)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
9 9 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 02/12 9:29 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose for non-dispositive matters . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, and (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the parties by motion, this Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 02/12/2024. Text Only Entry (nywlc5, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
8 8 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Mon 02/12 8:56 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (efoga, )
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Case Assigned to Judge Mon 02/12 8:56 AM
Case assigned to Judge Nina Y. Wang and drawn to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Mon 02/12 8:54 AM
AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Amended Complaint, and Amended Civic Case Cover Sheet upon Owners Insurance Company on 2/1/2024 (efoga, )
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 02/12 8:53 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Owners Insurance Company, filed by Julie King.(efoga, )
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint Mon 02/12 8:51 AM
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Owners Insurance Company, filed by Julie King.(efoga, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases Mon 02/12 8:51 AM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/09 6:14 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, a Michigan corporation for Owners Insurance Company. (Adams, Kira)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 02/09 6:09 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Owners Insurance Company from Arapahoe County Court, Case Number 2024CV30067. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9535630), filed by Owners Insurance Company.(Payne, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Exhibit F,
Att: 9 Exhibit G,
Att: 10 Exhibit H,
Att: 11 Exhibit I,
Att: 12 Exhibit J