Montana District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00019
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 10, 2024 12:20 AM MST
Defendant
Isaac Michael Price (1)
Represented By
Gillian E. Gosch
Federal Defenders Of Montana
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Thomas Godfrey
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Billings
contact info

GPO Aug 07 2024
JUDGMENT as to Isaac Michael Price (1), Count(s) 1, DFT IS SENTENCED ON COUNT 1 IN THE INDICTMENT TO 3 YEARS PROBATION with standard and special conditions apply. Fine waived. Special assessment of 100.00, restitution in the amount of 13,934.98.; Count(s) 2, DISMISSED ON GOV'T MOTION. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/7/2024. (AMC)

Docket last updated: 02/10/2024 2:16 AM MST
Friday, January 19, 2024
SET HEARING as to Isaac Michael Price. Initial Appearance set for 1/22/2024 at 09:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. (JDH) [1:24-mj-00019-TJC]
Related: [-]
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Isaac Michael Price (1). (JDH) [1:24-mj-00019-TJC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Monday, January 22, 2024
FTR CERTIFICATION: A clear and complete recording of this proceeding exists re Minute Entry document number (3) Initial Appearance as to Isaac Michael Price. (JDH) [1:24-mj-00019-TJC]
Related: [-]
SET HEARING as to Isaac Michael Price. Detention Hearing set for 1/25/2024 at 10:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. (JDH) [1:24-mj-00019-TJC]
Related: [-]
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan: Initial Appearance as to Isaac Michael Price held on 1/22/2024. Defendant is present and in custody appearing with FD Evangelo Arvanetes; AUSA Lori Harper Suek appearing for the government. Defendant acknowledges his true name; is advised of rights; qualifies and the Court appoints FD Gillian Gosch. Defendant has reviewed the Complaint with counsel. Defendant waives a preliminary hearing. The government moves for detention. Deft requests and a detention heart is set for 1/25/2024 at 10:00 a.m. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the USMS pending further proceedings. The Court orders the government to comply with Rule 5(f). A written order will follow. Hearing commenced at 9:03 a.m. and concluded at 9:07 a.m. (Court Reporter FTR Gold) (USPO: Cyisa Weidman), (Law Clerk: D. Boyd), (Hearing held in Billings - BHC) (JDH) [1:24-mj-00019-TJC]
Related: [-]
4 4 TEXT ORDER as to Isaac Michael Price - Under Criminal Rule 5(f), the government is ordered to comply with its disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland and related cases as set forth in the attachment to this Order. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 1/22/2024. (JDH) [1:24-mj-00019-TJC]
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Isaac Michael Price (JDH) [1:24-mj-00019-TJC]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Isaac Michael Price. Gillian E. Gosch for Isaac Michael Price appointed. Reimbursement information: Defendant is not required to reimburse the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 1/22/2024. (JDH) [1:24-mj-00019-TJC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
FTR CERTIFICATION: A clear and complete recording of this proceeding exists re Minute Entry document number 8 as to Isaac Michael Price. (JLE) [1:24-mj-00019-TJC]
Related: [-]
8 8 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan: Detention Hearing as to Isaac Michael Price held on 1/25/2024. Defendant is present, in custody, and appearing with FD Russell Hart; AUSA Zeno Baucus appearing for the government. The govt has no objection to proposed conditions of release. No objection by deft. Deft agrees to abide by conditions. Deft released subject to standard and special conditions. Hearing commenced at 10:13 AM and concluded at 10:20 AM (Court Reporter FTR Gold) (USPO: Cyisa Weidman), (Law Clerk: D. Boyd), (Hearing held in Billings - Big Horn Courtroom) (JLE) [1:24-mj-00019-TJC]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Isaac Michael Price. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 1/25/2024. (JDH) [1:24-mj-00019-TJC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
10 10 MOTION to Quash Warrant by USA as to Isaac Michael Price. (Godfrey, Thomas) [1:24-mj-00019-TJC]
Related: [-]
11 11 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Isaac Michael Price (1) count(s) 1, 2. (EMH)
Related: [-]
12 12 Redacted Indictment as to Isaac Michael Price. (EMH)
Related: [-]
13 13 Criminal Cover Sheet filed by USA regarding the11 Indictment (Sealed) as to Isaac Michael Price. (EMH)
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER granting10 Motion to Quash Warrant as to Isaac Michael Price (1). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Arrest Warrant is QUASHED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 2/8/2024. (JDH)
Related: [-]