Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-00096
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2024
Terminated:Jan 23, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 10, 2024 12:55 AM MST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph G Rieu
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Arnulfo Cruz-Garcia (1)
Terminated: 01/23/2024
Represented By
Walter Ivan Goncalves, Jr
Federal Public Defenders Office - Tucson
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/10/2024 3:21 AM MST
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
Arrest of Arnulfo Cruz-Garcia on 1/10/2024. (JAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Arnulfo Cruz-Garcia. (JAM)
Related: [-]