Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-00016
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 10, 2024 1:43 AM CST
Defendant
Arthur Hector Fernandez, III (1)
Represented By
Darryl Emmanuel Austin
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Houston
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kimberly Ann Bulger Leo
Us Attorneys Office
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/02/2025 10:35 AM CST
Thursday, December 14, 2023
Judge update in case as to Arthur Hector Fernandez, III. Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon added. (AntonioBanda, 4) [4:23-mj-02084]
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs COMPLAINT as to Arthur Hector Fernandez, III (1), filed. (AntonioBanda, 4) [4:23-mj-02084]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Seal Criminal Complaint and Arrest Warrant by USA as to Arthur Hector Fernandez, III, filed. (AntonioBanda, 4) [4:23-mj-02084]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal as to Arthur Hector Fernandez III (1).(Signed by Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon.) Parties notified.(AntonioBanda, 4) [4:23-mj-02084]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
Arrest of Arthur Hector Fernandez, III, filed. (AntonioBanda, 4) [4:23-mj-02084]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
***Set Hearing as to Arthur Hector Fernandez, III: Initial Appearance set for 12/19/2023 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8B before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison (AntonioBanda, 4) [4:23-mj-02084]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Arthur Hector Fernandez, III, filed. (RubenCastro, 3) [4:23-mj-02084]
Related: [-]
INITIAL APPEARANCE Minute Entry for proceedings held on 12/19/2023 before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison as to Arthur Hector Fernandez, III. Defendant first appearance on Complaint. (Defendant informed of rights). Defendant requests appointed counsel, Financial affidavit executed, Defendant appeared with counsel. Order appointing FPD to be entered, Order of Temporary Detention to be entered. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 12/21/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8B before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison Rule 5(f) order orally given. Rule 5(f) written order to be entered. Parties orally consented to appear by video on the record. Appearances: AUSA Lauren Valenti for USA; AFPD Amr Ahmed for Defendant.(ERO:Yes) (Interpreter: No) Defendant remanded to custody, filed. (RubenCastro, 3) [4:23-mj-02084]
Related: [-]
4 4 Arrest Warrant issued 12/14/2023; Returned Executed on 12/18/2023 as to Arthur Hector Fernandez, III. Defendant was arrested in Kingwood, TX. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy., filed. (AntonioBanda, 4) [4:23-mj-02084]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified. (RubenCastro, 3) [4:23-mj-02084]
Related: [-]
6 6 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Arthur Hector Fernandez, III. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified. (RubenCastro, 3) [4:23-mj-02084]
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Arthur Hector Fernandez, III Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 12/21/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8B before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified. (RubenCastro, 3) [4:23-mj-02084]
Related: [-]
8 8 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Arthur Hector Fernandez, III, filed. [4:23-mj-02084]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Darryl Emmanuel Austin, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Arthur Hector Fernandez, III, filed.(Austin, Darryl) [4:23-mj-02084]
Related: [-]
9 9 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Arthur Hector Fernandez, III, filed. [4:23-mj-02084]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
DETENTION HEARING Minute Entry for proceedings held on 12/21/2023 before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison as to Arthur Hector Fernandez, III Defendant appeared with counsel. Court finds probable cause, Order of Detention Pending Trial to be entered. Court took proffered testimony of agent; Courts exhibit 1 (PTR) & 2 (addendum PTR) admitted. Appearances: Lauren Valenti AUSA, Agent Briana Reece. Appearances: AUSA Kimberly Leo for USA; AFPD Darryl Austin for Defendant.(Court Reporter: Tiffani Dabney) (Interpreter: No) Defendant remanded to custody, filed. (RubenCastro, 3) [4:23-mj-02084]
Related: [-]
10 10 3 pgs Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Arthur Hector Fernandez, III ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified. (RubenCastro, 3) [4:23-mj-02084]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
11 11 Addendum to9 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Arthur Hector Fernandez, III, filed. (RochelleHorton, 4) [4:23-mj-02084]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
12 12 Arrest Warrant issued 12/14/2023; Returned Executed on 12/18/2023 as to Arthur Hector Fernandez, III. Defendant was arrested in Kingwood, Texas. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy, filed. (GlendaHassan, 4) [4:23-mj-02084]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
13 13 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Arthur Hector Fernandez, III (1) count(s) 1-2, filed. (ChrisKrus, 4)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
14 14 1 pgs US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Arthur Hector Fernandez, III, filed.(ChrisKrus, 4)
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER for Issuance of Notice of Indictment as to Arthur Hector Fernandez, III ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (ChrisKrus, 4)
Related: [-]