Ohio Southern District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-00021
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 11, 2024 2:23 AM EST
Defendant
Becky Gillespie (1)
Represented By
Crysta Renee Pierson
Crysta Pennington Attorney At Law, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Emily Czerniejewski
Doj-Usao
contact info
Jennifer M Rausch
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/20/2024 5:59 PM EDT
Friday, January 12, 2024
Arrest of Becky Gillespie (agm)
Related: [-]
CJA 20 as to Becky Gillespie: Appointment of Attorney Crysta Pierson by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/12/2024. (agm)
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Pretrial Detention Hearing by USA as to Becky Gillespie. (agm)
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER granting Oral Motion for Pretrial Detention Hearing as to Becky Gillespie (1). By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/12/2024. (agm)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Becky Gillespie: Preliminary Hearing set for 1/26/2024 01:30 PM in Courtroom 183 - Columbus before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs COMPLAINT as to Becky Gillespie (1). (agm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura:Initial Appearance as to Becky Gillespie held on 1/12/2024 (agm)
Related: [-]
5 5 Due Process Protections Act Order as to Becky Gillespie. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/12/2024. (agm)
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Becky Gillespie. (agm)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Becky Gillespie. Detention Hearing set for 1/17/2024 01:45 PM in Courtroom 183 - Columbus before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/12/2024. (agm)
Related: [-]