Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-00031
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2024
Terminated:Jan 17, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 11, 2024 1:20 AM CST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Marissa Aulbaugh-DOJ
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
John Christopher Esparza (1)
Terminated: 01/17/2024
Represented By
Federal Public Defender
Federal Public Defender - Dallas
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/11/2024 1:50 AM CST
Friday, January 12, 2024
1 1 Rule 32 Arrest as to John Christopher Esparza (1). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (mcrd)
Related: [-]