Build-A-Bear Workshop, Inc. v. Kelly Toys Holdings, LLC et al
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Matthew T Schelp |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00211 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Feb 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 28, 2024 5:54 AM CDT |
Defendant
Jazplus, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jazwares, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kelly Amusement Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kelly Toys Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Build-A-Bear Workshop, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 03/28 2:18 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Jazplus, LLC, Jazwares, LLC, Kelly Amusement Holdings, LLC, Kelly Toys Holdings, LLC. (Kraushaar, Corey) |
|
33 | 33
misc
Entry of Appearance
Thu 03/28 1:04 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Zachary Dean Ludens for Defendants Jazplus, LLC, Jazwares, LLC, Kelly Amusement Holdings, LLC, Kelly Toys Holdings, LLC. (Ludens, Zachary) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/25 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Defendants' Amended Pleading in Later-Filed, Bad Faith Lawsuit: by Plaintiff Build-A-Bear Workshop, Inc.(Hickey, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - California Lawsuit Amended Complaint | ||
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
16
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Mon 03/18 3:54 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Build-A-Bear Workshop, Inc..(Hickey, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Build-A-Bear's Motion to Stay (Broward County, Florida case), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - USDC Central District of California Civil Minutes - ECF 32, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' First Requests for Production (Broward County, Florida case) | ||
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 03/14 4:36 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re11 MOTION for Leave to Enjoin Defendants from Proceeding With Bad Faith, Later-Filed Lawsuit filed by Plaintiff Build-A-Bear Workshop, Inc.. (Hickey, Michael) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/11 3:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sourabh Mishra. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10487447) by Defendants Jazplus, LLC, Jazwares, LLC, Kelly Amusement Holdings, LLC, Kelly Toys Holdings, LLC. (Mishra, Sourabh) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/11 3:11 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Moez M. Kaba. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10487418) by Defendants Jazplus, LLC, Jazwares, LLC, Kelly Amusement Holdings, LLC, Kelly Toys Holdings, LLC. (Kaba, Moez) |
|
order
A Docket Text Order
Mon 03/11 4:16 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Moez M. Kaba and28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sourabh Mishra filed by Jazplus, LLC, Kelly Amusement Holdings, LLC, Kelly Toys Holdings, LLC, Jazwares, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 3/11/2024. (KXS) |
||
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests)
Wed 03/06 5:08 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jazplus, LLC, Alleghany Capital Corporation, Alleghany Corporation, Berkshire Hathaway, Inc... (Kraushaar, Corey) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests)
Wed 03/06 5:06 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jazwares, LLC, Alleghany Capital Corporation, Alleghany Corporation, Berkshire Hathaway, Inc... (Kraushaar, Corey) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests)
Wed 03/06 5:04 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kelly Toys Holdings, LLC, Jazwares, LLC, Jazwares Soft Creations, LLC, Alleghany Capital Corporation, Alleghany Corporation, Berkshire Hathaway, Inc... (Kraushaar, Corey) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests)
Wed 03/06 5:00 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kelly Amusement Holdings, LLC, Alleghany Capital Corporation, Alleghany Corporation, Berkshire Hathaway, Inc... (Kraushaar, Corey) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
21
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Mon 03/04 6:54 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Jazplus, LLC, Jazwares, LLC, Kelly Amusement Holdings, LLC, Kelly Toys Holdings, LLC.(Kraushaar, Corey) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Declaration of Nelson Rodriguez, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment Declaration of Sourabh Mishra, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A- C.D. California Petition | ||
21 | 21
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 03/04 6:52 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Jazplus, LLC, Jazwares, LLC, Kelly Amusement Holdings, LLC, Kelly Toys Holdings, LLC. (Kraushaar, Corey) |
|
20 | 20
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 03/04 6:38 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION for Leave to Enjoin Defendants from Proceeding With Bad Faith, Later-Filed Lawsuit filed by Defendants Jazplus, LLC, Jazwares, LLC, Kelly Amusement Holdings, LLC, Kelly Toys Holdings, LLC. (Kraushaar, Corey) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Entry of Appearance
Mon 03/04 6:23 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Corey L. Kraushaar for Defendants Jazplus, LLC, Jazwares, LLC, Kelly Amusement Holdings, LLC, Kelly Toys Holdings, LLC. (Kraushaar, Corey) |
|
18 | 18
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Mon 03/04 6:18 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Jazplus, LLC, Jazwares, LLC, Kelly Amusement Holdings, LLC, Kelly Toys Holdings, LLC.(Kraushaar, Corey) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Declaration of Nelson Rodriguez, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment Declaration of Sourabh Mishra, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A- C.D. California Petition | ||
17 | 17
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 03/04 5:47 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Jazplus, LLC, Jazwares, LLC, Kelly Amusement Holdings, LLC, Kelly Toys Holdings, LLC. (Kraushaar, Corey) |
|
Monday, February 19, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Affidavit
Mon 02/19 1:56 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Process Server served JAZPLUS, LLC by Plaintiff Build-A-Bear Workshop, Inc.. (Knopp, Allison) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Affidavit
Mon 02/19 1:56 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Process Server served JAZWARES, LLC by Plaintiff Build-A-Bear Workshop, Inc.. (Knopp, Allison) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Affidavit
Mon 02/19 1:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Process Server served Kelly Amusement Holdings, LLC by Plaintiff Build-A-Bear Workshop, Inc.. (Knopp, Allison) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Affidavit
Mon 02/19 1:52 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Process Server served Kelly Toys Holdings, LLC by Plaintiff Build-A-Bear Workshop, Inc.. (Knopp, Allison) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
12
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Fri 02/16 3:01 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re11 MOTION for Leave to Enjoin Defendants from Proceeding With Bad Faith, Later-Filed Lawsuit filed by Plaintiff Build-A-Bear Workshop, Inc..(Hickey, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Leave to
Fri 02/16 2:55 PM
MOTION for Leave to Enjoin Defendants from Proceeding With Bad Faith, Later-Filed Lawsuit by Plaintiff Build-A-Bear Workshop, Inc.. (Hickey, Michael) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 02/12 3:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Build-A-Bear Workshop, Inc.. Jazplus, LLC served on 2/12/2024, answer due 3/4/2024. (Hickey, Michael) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 02/12 3:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Build-A-Bear Workshop, Inc.. Jazwares, LLC served on 2/12/2024, answer due 3/4/2024. (Hickey, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 02/12 3:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Build-A-Bear Workshop, Inc.. Kelly Amusement Holdings, LLC served on 2/12/2024, answer due 3/4/2024. (Hickey, Michael) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 02/12 3:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Build-A-Bear Workshop, Inc.. Kelly Toys Holdings, LLC served on 2/12/2024, answer due 3/4/2024. (Hickey, Michael) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Report re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright
Mon 02/12 12:47 PM
REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding trademark. (JWD) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Entry of Appearance
Mon 02/12 10:24 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Philip J. Mackey for Plaintiff Build-A-Bear Workshop, Inc.. (Mackey, Philip) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Entry of Appearance
Mon 02/12 10:17 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Allison Knopp for Plaintiff Build-A-Bear Workshop, Inc.. (Knopp, Allison) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests)
Mon 02/12 10:10 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Build-A-Bear Workshop, Inc.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Hickey, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
service
Notice of Process Server
Mon 02/12 10:03 AM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Build-A-Bear Workshop, Inc. Process Server: Brandywine Process Servers, LTD. (Hickey, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
39
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 02/12 9:59 AM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-10433040, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by Build-A-Bear Workshop, Inc..(Hickey, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Original Filing Form, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Kelly Toys Holdings, LLC, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Kelly Amusement Holdings, LLC, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Jazwares, LLC, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Jazplus, LLC | ||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Mon 02/12 12:49 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Matthew T. Schelp. 4 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorneys Allison Knopp, Philip J. Mackey, and Michael J. Hickey. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JWD) |