Arizona District Court
Judge:Roslyn O Silver
Case #: 2:24-cv-00286
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 08, 2024 3:13 AM MST
Defendant
Benjamin Heydari
Represented By
Michael J Harris
Sacks Tierney PA
contact info
Plaintiff
MicroVention Incorporated
Represented By
Ryan Bykerk
Greenberg Traurig Llp - Irvine - Jamboree Rd.
contact info
Karin Leann Bohmholdt
Greenberg Traurig Llp - Los Angeles, Ca
contact info
Nicole Maroulakos Goodwin
Greenberg Traurig Llp - Phoenix
contact info
Derek Ryan Graffious
Jones Skelton & Hochuli PLC
contact info
Jessica Kemper
Greenberg Traurig Llp - Phoenix
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM MST
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
39 39 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 04/02 10:26 AM
ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall enter a judgment of dismissal with prejudice without further notice on July 1, 2025, unless prior thereto a Stipulation to Dismiss, along with a form of order, or request for reinstatement on the Court's trial calendar is filed herein. See attached document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 4/1/2025. (RMV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
38 38 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 04/01 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Settlement in Principle and Stipulated Motion to Stay All Deadlines by MicroVention Incorporated.(Bohmholdt, Karin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, February 13, 2025
37 37 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Thu 02/13 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Benjamin Heydari. (Harris, Michael)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Thu 02/13 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Benjamin Heydari. (Harris, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
35 35 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 02/04 9:35 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Benjamin Heydari. (Harris, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
34 34 13 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 12/17 5:03 PM
ORDER granting in part33 Stipulated Motion for Entry of Protective Order. See attached document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 12/17/2024. (RMV)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
33 33 2 pgs motion Protective Order Mon 12/16 4:21 PM
MOTION for Protective Order (Stipulated) by MicroVention Incorporated.(Bohmholdt, Karin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 13 pgs Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order
Monday, December 09, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Mon 12/09 12:52 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Benjamin Heydari. (Harris, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 12/03 9:26 AM
ORDER pursuant to30 Stipulation, the deemed admissions of Defendant Benjamin Heydari to Plaintiff MicroVention, Inc.s First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant (RFAs), dated October 16, 2024, are hereby withdrawn. FURTHER ORDERED26 Defendant's Motion to Withdraw Deemed Admissions pursuant to Rule 36(b) is DENIED AS MOOT. See attached document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 12/2/2024. (RMV)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
30 30 misc Stipulation Mon 12/02 3:27 PM
STIPULATION TO ENTER ORDER TO (1) WITHDRAW DEEMED ADMISSIONS PURSUANT TO RULE 36(B), (2) REQUIRE RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTION, AND (3) WITHDRAW DEFENDANTS MOTION TO WITHDRAW DEEMED ADMISSIONS by Benjamin Heydari.(Harris, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 11/26 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Benjamin Heydari. (Harris, Michael)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 11/26 3:04 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Benjamin Heydari. (Harris, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Wed 11/20 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Benjamin Heydari. (Harris, Michael)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Withdraw Wed 11/20 3:18 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Admissions by Benjamin Heydari.(Harris, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order to Withdraw Motion to Withdraw Admissions
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Wed 10/16 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by MicroVention Incorporated. (Hill, Robert)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel Wed 10/16 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A Hill on behalf of MicroVention Incorporated. (Hill, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Mon 07/29 10:24 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Karin Leann Bohmholdt on behalf of Plaintiff MicroVention Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 07/19 5:33 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by MicroVention Incorporated. (Kemper, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Thu 07/18 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Benjamin Heydari. (Harris, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
20 20 order Time Change Only - Hearing Mon 07/08 9:34 AM
IT IS ORDERED the Interim Status Conference presently set for July 9, 2025, has been updated AS TO TIME ONLY!! Status Conference set for July 9, 2025, will be held at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 604, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver. Ordered by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver. (RMC)( This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
19 19 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings Wed 07/03 5:23 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/24/2025. Dispositive motions due by 7/29/2025. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order and Motions in Limine due by 10/14/2025. An Interim Rule 16 Status Conference is scheduled for 7/9/2025. Prior to the Interim Conference, counsel are to prepare and file a Joint Status Report by 7/2/2025. See attached for additional information. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O. Silver on 7/3/2024. (RMW)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Wed 07/03 4:05 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by MicroVention Incorporated.(Kemper, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Rule 16 Scheduling Order
Thursday, June 20, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Attorney Substitution (Within Firm Only) Thu 06/20 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Jessica Kemper. (Kemper, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
16 16 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 06/11 1:29 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE for 7/10/2024 at 10:00 AM , in Courtroom 604, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Roslyn O. Silver. The parties shall jointly file a Case Management Report with the Clerk not less than seven days before the Case Management Conference. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O. Silver on 6/10/2024. (RMW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
15 15 3 pgs misc Statement Thu 05/30 9:42 AM
STATEMENT of Diversity Disclosure Statement re:14 Answer to Amended Complaint by Defendant Benjamin Heydari. (Harris, Michael)
Related: [-]
14 14 11 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 05/30 9:36 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint by Benjamin Heydari.(Harris, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 04/25 11:13 AM
ORDER: The Stipulation to Extend Deadline12 is GRANTED. Defendant shall have through May 31, 2024, to Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 4/25/2024. (REK)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
12 12 misc Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint Fri 04/19 4:05 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re:11 Amended Complaint by Benjamin Heydari.(Harris, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 21, 2024
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 03/21 2:39 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Benjamin Heydari filed by MicroVention Incorporated.(Bykerk, Ryan)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Service Executed Thu 03/21 2:38 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by MicroVention Incorporated: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge, Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement, Order/Notice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.4(m), Order upon Benjamin Heydari on March 15, 2024. (Bykerk, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Mon 03/04 7:37 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Ryan Bykerk on behalf of Plaintiff MicroVention Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order re Rule 12(b) Motions Mon 02/26 1:05 PM
ORDER that preliminary motions aimed at the pleadings are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 2/26/24. (EJA)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order Mon 02/26 1:02 PM
ORDER: No later than May 10, 2024, Plaintiff shall file proof of service for every defendant located in a judicial district of the United States. FURTHER ORDERED no later than May 10, 2024, Plaintiff shall file a statement setting forth how and when service on any foreign defendant will be accomplished. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 2/26/24. (EJA)
Related: [-]
7 7 minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges Mon 02/26 7:34 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Roslyn O Silver. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 24-00286 PHX-ROS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/23 3:58 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MicroVention Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Terumo Americas Holding, Inc. for MicroVention Incorporated. (Graffious, Derek)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 02/12 10:07 AM
Summons Issued as to Benjamin Heydari. (REK)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
3 3 misc New Case Opened Mon 02/12 10:06 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22744475. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-00286 PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached.(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
2 2 service Summons Submitted Mon 02/12 10:05 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by MicroVention Incorporated. (submitted by Nicole Goodwin) (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 02/12 10:04 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22744475 filed by MicroVention Incorporated. (submitted by Nicole Goodwin)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet