Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:20-bk-70854

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Louis A Scarcella
Case #: 8:24-ap-08013
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2024
Terminated:Nov 07, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ramnarine Persaud
Represented By
Ramnarine Persaud
contact info
Plaintiff
Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus
Represented By
Matthew V Spero
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Friday, January 31, 2025
34 34 court Abstract of Judgment Fri 01/31 4:49 PM
Abstract of Judgment: Judgment entered on 10/09/2025, against Ramnarine Persaud represented by Matthew V Spero Rivkin Radler LLP 926 RXR Plaza Uniondale, NY 11556 in favor of Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus c/o Rivkin Radler LLP 926 RXR Plaza Uniondale, NY 11556 represented by Hector M Roman, Jr Law Office of Hector M. Roman, P.C. 108-14 Jamaica Avenue Richmond Hill, NY 11418 in the amount of $ 225000.00 (las)
Related: [-]
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Mon 02/03 9:25 AM
Receipt Number 10335225; Fee Amount $ 30.00 Related [+] (dld)
Related: [-] 34 Abstract of Judgment
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Wed 01/29 10:01 AM
Receipt Number 10335204; Fee Amount $ 24.00 for Certification Fee (srm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Thu 11/07 11:03 AM
Adversary Case 8:24-ap-8013 Closed (dhc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Fri 10/18 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 10/17/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Sat 10/12 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 10/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
31 31 order Judgment (Signed by Judge) (1/1/11) Wed 10/09 4:05 PM
Judgment Determining Debt to be Nondischargeable. Judgment be and is hereby entered against Ramnarine Persaud in favor of Strategic Funding Source Inc. d/b/a Kapitus in the amount of $225,000.00, plus interest at the New York statutory judgment rate per annum during the Repayment Period, as defined in the Settlement Agreement, plus the attorneys fees and costs of enforcing same. As to Ramnarine Persaud, the debt set forth in this Judgment is nondischargeable pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 523(a)(2)(A), (a)(2)(B), (a)(3)(A), (a)(3)(B), (a)(4), and (a)(6). Related [+]. Signed on 10/9/2024 (dhc)
Related: [-] 30 Generic Order
30 30 order Generic Order Wed 10/09 4:00 PM
Order Approving Settlement Agreement (dkt no. 25), a copy of which is attached to this Order. Pursuant to the Settlement Agreement and a confession of judgment of defendant Ramnarine Persaud dated 9/16/2024 [dkt. no. 28], judgment in favor of the plaintiff Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus shall be entered against defendant Ramnarine Persaud in the amount fo $225,000.00, plus interest at the New York statutory judgment rate per annum, attorneys fees and costs (Judgment) and such Judgment shall be nondischarageable Related [+]. Signed on 10/9/2024 (dhc)
Related: [-] 25 Notice of Proposed Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
29 29 misc Exhibit Wed 10/02 11:20 AM
Exhibit B. Proposed Judgment Determining Debt to be Nondischargeable Filed by Matthew V Spero on behalf of Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus Related [+] (Spero, Matthew)
Related: [-] 25 Notice of Proposed Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus
28 28 misc Exhibit Wed 10/02 11:18 AM
Exhibit A. Proposed Stipulation for Consent to Nondischargeable Debt Filed by Matthew V Spero on behalf of Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus Related [+] (Spero, Matthew)
Related: [-] 25 Notice of Proposed Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus
Monday, September 30, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Submission of Proposed Order Mon 09/30 2:03 PM
[ATTORNEY ADVISED TO REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT]Notice of Submission of Proposed Order - Exhibit B Filed by Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus Related [+]. (Spero, Matthew) Modified to include remark and Exhibit B on 10/1/2024 (caf)
Related: [-] 25 ,26
26 26 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Mon 09/30 1:28 PM
[ATTORNEY ADVISED TO REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT] Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Consent to Nondischargeable Debt " Exhibit A" Filed by Matthew V Spero on behalf of Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus (Spero, Matthew) Modified to include remark on 10/1/2024 (caf)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Mon 09/30 1:25 PM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Settlement and Order Filed by Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus. (Spero, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned BK) Tue 08/13 12:17 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/19/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (DianeCorsini)
Related: [-] 20 Order Appointing Mediator
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
24 24 misc Mediator's Report Wed 07/31 9:55 AM
Mediator's Report . Filed by Sean C Southard on behalf of Sean C. Southard (Southard, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
23 23 misc Declaration Thu 07/18 11:02 AM
Declaration Filed by Sean C Southard on behalf of Sean C. Southard Related [+] (Southard, Sean)
Related: [-] 20 Order Appointing Mediator, Order Assigning Matter to Mediation
Friday, June 14, 2024
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Sun 06/16 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 06/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
21 21 court Court's Certificate of Mailing Wed 06/12 12:07 PM
Court's Service Lis Related [+] (dhc)
Related: [-] 20 Order Appointing Mediator, Order Assigning Matter to Mediation
20 20 order Appointing Mediator Wed 06/12 12:06 PM
Order Assigning Matter to Mediation. Sean C. Southard c/o Klestadt Winters Jureller Southard & Stevens, LLP, is hereby designated as mediator. Thomas R. Slome, Esq. c/o Cullen and Dykman LLP, is hereby designated as alternate mediator in the event that Sean C Southard, Esq., has a conflict or is otherwise unable to serve as Mediator. The mediation shall be concluded, whether by separate or joint sessions, by 7/31/2024. By 8/6/2024, the Mediator shall file a status letter as to whether the mediation resulted in a settlement. In the event that this matter is not resolved through mediation or otherwise, the Mediation Parties are directed to appear before the Court at a status conference on 8/13/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. Related [+]. Signed on 6/12/2024 (dhc)
Related: [-] 17 Order Assigning Matter to Mediation,19 Letter filed by Plaintiff Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus
Friday, May 31, 2024
19 19 misc Letter Fri 05/31 3:46 PM
Letter Filed by Matthew V Spero on behalf of Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus Related [+] (Spero, Matthew)
Related: [-] 17 Order Assigning Matter to Mediation
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Sched/Resched (Case Owned BK) Tue 05/28 8:32 AM
Hearing Rescheduled. Post Discovery Conference to be held on 11/19/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. Related [+] (dng)
Related: [-] 12 Scheduling Order
Sunday, May 26, 2024
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Mon 05/27 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 05/26/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
17 17 order Assigning Matter to Mediation Fri 05/24 11:55 AM
Order Concerning Mediation. The Parties shall file a joint letter identifying two (2) proposed mediators in order of preference with the names and addresses of such Mediators within 10 days of the date of this Order is entered. Mediator Selection Deadline due by June 3, 2024. That if the parties cannot agree upon the proposed Mediators within the time set forth in the immediately preceding paragraph, or if the Court determines that selection of a mediator by the Court is appropriate, then the Court shall appoint a Mediator. Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2024 (dng)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Extend Time filed by Defendant Ramnarine Persaud, Plaintiff Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus
16 16 order Scheduling Order Fri 05/24 11:45 AM
Order Extending Discovery Deadlines. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than September 6, 2024. All discovery shall be completed by no later than October 21, 2024. A joint letter be filed by no later than November 12, 2024. The post-discovery conference in this adversary proceeding shall be rescheduled from August 6, 2024 to November 19, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. The remainder of the Scheduling Order dated April 22, 2024 shall remain unchanged. Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2024 (dng)
Related: [-] 12 Scheduling Order
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
15 15 motion Extend Time Wed 05/15 3:39 PM
Joint Motion to Extend Time AND request that the Court direct this matter to mediation pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 9019-1 and extend all deadlines in the Courts Scheduling Order (ECF no. 12) by 90 days. Filed by Matthew V Spero, Hector M Roman Jr on behalf of Ramnarine Persaud, Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus. (Roman, Hector)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Thu 04/25 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 04/24/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
13 13 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Tue 04/23 9:53 AM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Matthew V Spero on behalf of Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus Related [+] (Spero, Matthew)
Related: [-] 12 Scheduling Order
Monday, April 22, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/22 3:12 PM
Scheduling Order. Post Discovery Conference set for 8/6/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. All discovery due by 7/22/2024. Related [+]. Signed on 4/22/2024 (dhc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) Tue 04/16 12:09 PM
Hearing Held; Appearances Homdat K. Misra and Matthew Spero. Court to Issue Scheduling Order Related [+] (caf)
Related: [-] 4 Scheduling Order
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/10 11:15 AM
Amended Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint Filed by Hector M Roman Jr on behalf of Ramnarine Persaud (Roman, Hector)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
10 10 misc Letter Tue 04/09 4:11 PM
Letter Joint Letter in Response to 2/13/24 Order Setting Pretrial Conference Filed by Matthew V Spero on behalf of Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus (Spero, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/19 3:37 PM
First Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint Filed by Hector M Roman Jr on behalf of Ramnarine Persaud (Roman, Hector)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
8 8 misc Letter Mon 02/26 4:35 PM
Letter Filed by Matthew V Spero on behalf of Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus Related [+] (Spero, Matthew)
Related: [-] 4 Scheduling Order
7 7 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Mon 02/26 4:33 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Matthew V Spero on behalf of Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus Related [+] (Spero, Matthew)
Related: [-] 4 Scheduling Order
Thursday, February 15, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Fri 02/16 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 02/15/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
5 5 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Tue 02/13 3:43 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Matthew V Spero on behalf of Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus Related [+] (Spero, Matthew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus,3 Summons In An Adversary Proceeding (Judge Trust and Judge Scarcella) (Auto)
4 4 order Scheduling Order Tue 02/13 3:19 PM
Order Setting Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. The parties are directed to submit via ECF a joint letter no later than 4/9/2024. Related [+]. Signed on 2/13/2024 (dhc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus
3 3 cmp Summons In An Adversary Proceeding (Judge Trust and Judge Scarcella) (Auto) Tue 02/13 8:30 AM
Summons In An Adversary Proceeding Issued by Clerk's Office against Ramnarine Persaud Answer Due: 3/14/2024 (hrm)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Mon 02/12 11:33 AM
Adversary Cover Sheet Filed by Matthew V Spero on behalf of Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus Related [+] (Spero, Matthew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus
Friday, February 09, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/09 1:31 PM
Adversary case 8 24-08013 Complaint by Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus against Ramnarine Persaud. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)). (Spero, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Revenue Based Factoring Agreement
Att: 2 Exhibit B. Judgment
Att: 3 Exhibit C. Merchant Statement
Att: 4 Exhibit D. New York Judgment