Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Edmund A Sargus
Referred: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Case #: 2:24-cv-00601
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2024
Terminated:Apr 29, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 5:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Primeritus Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By
Boyd William Gentry
Law Office Of Boyd W. Gentry
contact info
Plaintiff
Elizabeth A. Rodawalt
Represented By
Chad William Eisenback
Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.
contact info
Mohammed O. Badwan
Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, April 29, 2024
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 04/29 1:02 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (er)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 04/26 12:55 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Elizabeth A. Rodawalt (Eisenback, Chad)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
14 14 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 04/05 3:36 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) by Defendant Primeritus Financial Services, Inc.. (Gentry, Boyd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Kathleen Thornton
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
13 13 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/26 9:43 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mohammed O. Badwan. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 3/26/2024. (er)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/25 5:45 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Elizabeth A. Rodawalt re8 Notice of Deficiency (Clerk's Notice), (Eisenback, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Admission To the Bar of Illinois,
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of Electronic Filing that reflects payment of the fee for the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
notice Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/25 10:27 AM
NOTICE : The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2024 11:00 AM is VACATED. (See ECF No.9 .) (sln)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
11 11 order Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order Wed 03/20 4:00 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Initial Disclosures due by 4/15/2024. Motion to amend due by 6/1/2024. Discovery due by 9/16/2024. (If the parties are unable to reach an agreement on any matter related to discovery, they are directed to arrange a conference with the Court). Dispositive motions due by 10/16/2024. Primary Expert due by 9/2/2024. Rebuttal Expert due by 9/30/2024. Settlement Demand due by 4/1/2024. Response to Settlement Demand due by 8/16/2024. Mediation Deadline: 5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 3/20/2024. (vb)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Stipulation Wed 03/20 10:44 AM
STIPULATION of Extension of time to file answer/motion by Defendant Primeritus Financial Services, Inc.. (Gentry, Boyd)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 03/20 11:57 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Primeritus Financial Services, Inc. answer due 4/5/2024. (er)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
9 9 misc Rule 26(f) Report Tue 03/19 5:50 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Primeritus Financial Services, Inc.. (Gentry, Boyd)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Deficiency (Clerk's Notice) Mon 03/11 2:01 PM
Notice of Deficiency re: The submitted certificate is not from the highest court of a State. Related Document:6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9840723) of Mohammed O. Badwan filed by Elizabeth A. Rodawalt. Deficiency Deadline by 3/25/2024. (er)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/07 2:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Primeritus Financial Services, Inc.. Primeritus Financial Services, Inc. served on 3/1/2024, answer due 3/22/2024. (Eisenback, Chad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
6 6 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/28 3:31 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9840723) of Mohammed O. Badwan by Plaintiff Elizabeth A. Rodawalt. (Eisenback, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit MOB Cert of Good Standing
5 5 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 02/28 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2024 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/27 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Boyd William Gentry for Defendant Primeritus Financial Services, Inc. (Gentry, Boyd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 02/13 8:33 AM
Summons Issued as to Primeritus Financial Services, Inc.. (sem)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/12 2:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chad William Eisenback for Plaintiff Elizabeth A. Rodawalt (Eisenback, Chad)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/12 2:10 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Primeritus Financial Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9815345), filed by Elizabeth A. Rodawalt. (Eisenback, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Form