Missouri Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brian T Fenimore
Case #: 4:24-bk-40175
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2024
Dismissed:Jul 22, 2024
Terminated:Oct 02, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
CS Midtown, LLC
6924 SE Moreland School Rd.
Blue Springs, MO 64014
Represented By
Andrea M. Chase
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 6:07 PM CDT
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
105 105 court Clerk's Entry Discharging Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee Wed 10/02 2:12 PM
Clerks Entry re: Chapter 11, Subchapter V Trustee Discharge due to dismissal. The Trustee is discharged and relieved of any further duties. Related [+] (Smith, Mindy)
Related: [-] 104 Ch. 11 Subch V Trustee's Report of No Distribution C-case dism or conv, fee award not recd filed by Robbin Messerli
court Close Bankruptcy Case - Ch 9/11/12/13 Wed 10/02 2:36 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Smith, Mindy)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
104 104 trustee Ch. 11 Subch V Trustee's Report of No Distribution C-case dism or conv, fee award not recd Mon 09/30 1:30 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustees Report of No Distribution. Funds Collected: $0.00. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 8 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): Not Applicable, Assets Exempt: Not Applicable, Claims Scheduled: $2640606.00, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): Not Applicable. Filed by Robbin Messerli. (Messerli, Robbin)
Related: [-]