Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Hala Y Jarbou
Referred: Sally J Berens
Case #: 1:24-cv-00142
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2024
Terminated:Jun 04, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 5:19 AM EDT
defendant
600 Group Incorporated
Represented By
Peter Corcoran Brown
The Gallagher Law Firm
contact info
defendant
Control Micro Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Peter Corcoran Brown
The Gallagher Law Firm
contact info
defendant
Tykma, Inc.
Represented By
Peter Corcoran Brown
The Gallagher Law Firm
contact info
plaintiff
Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By
Peter D. Cronk, Jr.
Plunkett Cooney (lansing)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
defendant
Campro USA, LLC
Terminated: 02/20/2024
defendant
The Huntington National Bank
Terminated: 02/20/2024


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
33 33 2 pgs order Order Tue 06/04 1:48 PM
ORDER administratively closing case; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
Related: [-]
32 32 order Stipulation and Order Tue 06/04 1:46 PM
STIPULATED ORDER for administrative closing due to bankruptcy stay as to all defendants; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
Related: [-]
31 31 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver Tue 06/04 1:40 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice3 motion to appoint receiver and cancelling 6/11/2024 motion hearing; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Tue 06/04 9:33 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Administrative Closing Due to Bankruptcy by plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. (Cronk, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
29 29 1 pgs notice Notice Rescheduling Motion Hearing Tue 04/30 3:43 PM
NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING regarding document number3 that was previously set for 5/9/2024; motion hearing is reset for 6/11/2024 at 9:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; (bgs)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Stipulation and Order Tue 04/30 3:41 PM
STIPULATED ORDER extending motion hearing; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Tue 04/30 10:06 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Adjourn Motion to Appoint Receiver 30 Days by plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. (Cronk, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
26 26 8 pgs order Case Management Order Fri 04/19 2:35 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 8/1/2024; dispositive motions due by 9/3/2024; settlement conference set for 3/3/2025 at 9:15 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; final pretrial conference set for 4/3/2025 at 10:30 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; bench trial set for 4/28/2025 at 8:30 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
Related: [-]
25 25 9 pgs misc Joint Status Report (Rule 16) Fri 04/19 12:16 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT (Cronk, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
24 24 1 pgs notice Notice Rescheduling Motion Hearing Mon 04/08 4:44 PM
NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING regarding document number3 that was previously set for 4/11/2024; motion hearing is reset for 5/9/2024 at 9:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; (bgs)
Related: [-]
23 23 2 pgs order Stipulation and Order Mon 04/08 4:43 PM
STIPULATED ORDER adjourning motion hearing; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
Related: [-]
22 22 2 pgs motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Mon 04/08 1:39 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Adjourn Verified Motion to Appoint Receiver 30 Days by plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. (Cronk, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
21 21 7 pgs respm Response to Motion Fri 04/05 3:28 PM
RESPONSE TO MOTION to appoint receiver 3 filed by 600 Group Incorporated, Control Micro Systems, Inc., Tykma, Inc. (Brown, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Motion Hearing Fri 03/22 5:11 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding document number3 : motion hearing is set for 4/11/2024 at 9:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; (bgs)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order Regarding Response to Motion Fri 03/22 4:50 PM
ORDER regarding response to Motion to Appoint Receiver3 ; responses due by 4/5/2024; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
Related: [-]
18 18 5 pgs order Order Regarding Preparation of Joint Status Report Fri 03/22 3:28 PM
ORDER regarding preparation of joint status report: status report due by 4/19/2024; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
17 17 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/21 3:46 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Control Micro Systems, Inc. (Brown, Peter)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/21 3:46 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tykma, Inc. (Brown, Peter)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/21 3:43 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 600 Group Incorporated (Brown, Peter)
Related: [-]
14 14 10 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/21 3:08 PM
ANSWER to complaint,1 with affirmative defenses by 600 Group Incorporated, Control Micro Systems, Inc., Tykma, Inc. (Brown, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/04 8:20 AM
SUMMONS returned executed; Tykma, Inc. served on 2/29/2024, answer due 3/21/2024 (Cronk, Peter) Modified text on 3/4/2024 (ems)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/04 8:19 AM
SUMMONS returned executed; Control Micro Systems, Inc. served on 2/29/2024, answer due 3/21/2024 (Cronk, Peter) Modified text on 3/4/2024 (ems)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/04 8:17 AM
SUMMONS returned executed; 600 Group Incorporated served on 3/1/2024, answer due 3/22/2024 (Cronk, Peter) Modified text on 3/4/2024 (ems)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Tue 02/20 5:10 PM
ORDER dismissing7 show cause; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party Tue 02/20 11:10 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re The Huntington National Bank filed by plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. (Cronk, Peter)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party Tue 02/20 11:09 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re Campro USA, LLC filed by plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. (Cronk, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
7 7 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause (Deadline) Tue 02/13 4:15 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff to show cause by 2/20/2024 why the Court should not dismiss the case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/13 9:31 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation for Bank of America, N.A. (Cronk, Peter)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 02/13 9:28 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants 600 Group Incorporated, Campro USA, LLC, Control Micro Systems, Inc., The Huntington National Bank, Tykma, Inc. (ems)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Tue 02/13 9:21 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Hala Y. Jarbou ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ems)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
3 3 motion Appoint Receiver Mon 02/12 5:18 PM
MOTION to appoint receiver by plaintiff Bank of America, National Association; (Cronk, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Exhibit I
2 2 service Proposed Summons (to be issued) Mon 02/12 5:08 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Cronk, Peter)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 02/12 5:01 PM
COMPLAINT against 600 Group Incorporated, Campro USA, LLC, Control Micro Systems, Inc., The Huntington National Bank, Tykma, Inc. filed by Bank of America, National Association (Cronk, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index to Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Exhibit I,
Att: 11 Exhibit J,
Att: 12 Exhibit K
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Mon 02/12 5:05 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Bank of America, National Association in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7291567 (Cronk, Peter)
Related: [-]