Massachusetts District Court
Judge:William G Young
Case #: 1:24-cv-10345
Nature of Suit120 Contract - Marine
Cause46:3132(4) In Rem Action to Foreclose Ship's Mortgage
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2024
Terminated:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 5:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Captains Marine Service Yacht Management, LLC
Plaintiff
Marc Jaude
Represented By
Christopher John McNally
Sayer Regan & Thayer, LLP
contact info
Samuel P. Blatchley
Eckland & Blando LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, March 03, 2025
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 03/03 9:41 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (ALL CLAIMS) by Marc Jaude, Captains Marine Service Yacht Management, LLC. (Blatchley, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Scheduling Conference Fri 02/28 10:52 AM
NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 3/24/2025 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 (In person only) before Judge William G. Young. (KB)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Fri 02/28 7:45 AM
Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Justin S. Fiorilli. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected. Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm] . A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/27 3:02 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Justin S. Fiorilli Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10862890 by Captains Marine Service Yacht Management, LLC.(McNally, Christopher)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Thu 02/27 2:48 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Marc Jaude by Captains Marine Service Yacht Management, LLC.(McNally, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 02/18 9:13 AM
Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to February 27, 2025 to File Answer to Plantiff's Complaint. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
12 12 motion Extension of Time Mon 02/17 5:48 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to February 27, 2025 to File Answer to Plantiff's Complaint by Marc Jaude.(Blatchley, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/13 12:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher John McNally on behalf of Captains Marine Service Yacht Management, LLC (McNally, Christopher)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Thu 02/13 12:40 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Christopher John McNally (McNally, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/25 10:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher John McNally on behalf of Marc Jaude (McNally, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
8 8 1 pgs misc Letter/request - non-motion Wed 06/26 12:54 PM
Letter from the Commonwealth of Massachusetts - William Francis Galvin Secretary of State - Corporations Division. (Paine, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
7 7 1 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Tue 06/25 3:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Captains Marine Service Yacht Management, LLC served on 6/20/2024, answer due 7/11/2024. (Blatchley, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
6 6 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 06/06 2:27 PM
Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting4 MOTION for Extension of Time to July 10, 2024 to Serve Summons and Complaint. (Paine, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
5 5 4 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 06/05 12:07 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re4 MOTION for Extension of Time to July 10, 2024 to Serve Summons and Complaint filed by Marc Jaude. (Blatchley, Samuel)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs motion Extension of Time Wed 06/05 12:06 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to July 10, 2024 to Serve Summons and Complaint by Marc Jaude.(Blatchley, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
3 3 2 pgs service Summons Issued Tue 02/13 12:49 PM
Summons Issued as to Captains Marine Service Yacht Management, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 02/13 10:22 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Cowan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 02/12 5:30 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Other Relief against Captains Marine Service Yacht Management, LLC Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10266200 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Marc Jaude.(Blatchley, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Category Form