Washington Western District Court
Judge:Tana Lin
Case #: 2:24-cv-00191
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 2:36 AM PDT
Consol Plaintiff
Laura Barbu
Represented By
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens PLLC
contact info
Lori G Feldman
George Feldman Mcdonald PLLC
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Mackenzie Brown
Represented By
John M Rushing
Rushing Mccarl Llp (ca)
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens PLLC
contact info
Davit Avagyan
Rushing Mccarl Llp (ca)
contact info
Ryan P McCarl
Rushing Mccarl Llp (ca)
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Robin Krohn
Represented By
David A Goodwin
Gustafson Gluek PLLC
contact info
Daniel E Gustafson
Gustafson Gluek PLLC
contact info
Mary M Nikolai
Gustafson Gluek PLLC
contact info
Catherine Anne Peterson
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens PLLC
contact info
Krista K Freier
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Rebecca A Peterson
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Brendan Wesley Donckers
Breskin Johnson & Townsend PLLC
contact info
Robert K Shelquist
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Shea Ritchie
Represented By
John M Rushing
Rushing Mccarl Llp (ca)
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens PLLC
contact info
Davit Avagyan
Rushing Mccarl Llp (ca)
contact info
Ryan P McCarl
Rushing Mccarl Llp (ca)
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Meiling Robinson
Represented By
John M Rushing
Rushing Mccarl Llp (ca)
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens PLLC
contact info
Davit Avagyan
Rushing Mccarl Llp (ca)
contact info
Ryan P McCarl
Rushing Mccarl Llp (ca)
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Holly Rydman
Represented By
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Does 1-10
Defendant
Pacific Market International LLC
Represented By
Elie Salamon
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer Llp (ny)
contact info
Ashley EM Gammell
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Pallavi Mehta Wahi
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Steven Rich
Shook Hardy & Bacon Llp (wa)
contact info
E Alex Beroukhim
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer Llp (los Angeles)
contact info
Shelby Renee Stoner
Galanda Broadman, PLLC
contact info
James F Speyer
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer Llp (los Angeles)
contact info
Tyler K Lichter
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Mariana Franzetti
Represented By
Alan M Mansfield
Whatley Kallas LLP
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens PLLC
contact info
William J Doyle, II
Doyle Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
78 78 order 1 - Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Noting Date Tue 04/15 4:10 PM
AMENDED ORDER granting Parties'75 Stipulated Motion to Modify Briefing Schedules on Defendant's74 Motion to Strike and73 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 5/21/2025, Replies due by 6/25/2025. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
77 77 misc Praecipe-Other Mon 04/14 2:59 PM
PRAECIPE re76 Order on Stipulated Motion, Util - Set/Reset Motion Noting Date, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings by All Plaintiffs(Donckers, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
76 76 2 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Noting Date ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/14 9:29 AM
ORDER granting Parties'75 Stipulated Motion to Modify Briefing Schedules on Defendant's74 Motion to Strike and73 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 5/21/2025, Replies due by 6/18/2025. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
75 75 motion Stipulated Motion Fri 04/11 3:32 PM
Stipulated MOTION TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULES ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE AND MOTION TO DISMISS , filed by All Parties. Noting Date 4/11/2025, (Donckers, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order