New York Northern District Court
Judge:David N Hurd
Referred: Miroslav Lovric
Case #: 5:24-cv-00196
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2024
Terminated:Sep 12, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 4:36 AM EDT
Defendant
Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By
Jeffrey A. Beer, Jr.
Riker Danzig LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pemco Group, Inc.
Represented By
Martin A. Lynn
Lynn Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Kelsey W. Shannon
Lynn Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pemco Montgomery St LLC
Represented By
Martin A. Lynn
Lynn Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Kelsey W. Shannon
Lynn Law Firm, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Mediator (Mandatory Program)
Terrence O'Connor
Terminated: 07/26/2024
Represented By
Terence P. O'Connor
O'Connor, O'Connor Law Firm - Albany Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, September 12, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 09/12 8:13 PM
ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 9/12/2024. (ptm)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 09/12 11:54 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Pemco Group, Inc., Pemco Montgomery St LLC submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric. (Shannon, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
adr ADR Completed Fri 07/26 8:05 AM
ADR COMPLETED - CASE HAS SETTLED. Mediator Terence P. O'Connor terminated. The mediator and attorneys who attended the mediation session are asked to complete a survey with respect to the Mandatory Mediation Program. Attorneys for parties can access the survey at https://forms.office.com/g/AGz4E8EBVa. Mediators can access the survey at https://forms.office.com/g/pfQiD2e4jy. Any questions can be directed to the ADR Coordinator.(amt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
18 18 adr Report of Mandatory Mediation Tue 07/23 1:26 PM
REPORT OF MANDATORY MEDIATION - A Mandatory Mediation session was held on 7/23/2024. Total Hours Spent by Mediator: 4; The outcome of Mandatory Mediation is: CASE HAS SETTLED. The Settlement Agreement and Stipulation for Dismissal are being prepared and will be submitted for the courts consideration. (O'Connor, Terence)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
17 17 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 07/18 11:46 AM
TEXT ORDER: On or before 9/18/2024, the parties shall file next status reports regarding the progress of discovery and the litigation. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 7/18/2024.(jdc )
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 07/18 11:46 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric: a conference was held on 7/18/2024, via Teams Teleconference. The Court reminded the parties as to the schedules as set forth in Dkt. Nos. 11 & 15. The parties advised the Court as to progress of discovery and the litigation. The parties are directed to file next status reports by 9/18/2024. Appearances: K. Shannon, Esq., for the Plaintiffs; and J. Beer, Esq., for the Defendant. (jdc)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
16 16 misc Status Report Mon 07/08 10:29 AM
STATUS REPORT by Pemco Group, Inc., Pemco Montgomery St LLC. (Shannon, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
15 15 order Order on Letter Request Thu 05/09 4:04 PM
TEXT ORDER granting the14 Letter requesting extension of mediation deadline. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 8/1/2024. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 5/9/2024. (amt)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Letter Request/Motion Thu 05/09 10:00 AM
Letter Motion from Kelsey W. Shannon for Pemco Group, Inc., Pemco Montgomery St LLC requesting extension of mediation deadline submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric . (Shannon, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
13 13 adr Stipulation Selecting Mediator Thu 05/02 3:43 PM
STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATOR: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that Terrance O'Connor has been selected, contacted and has agreed to serve as Mediator for this action. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that counsel will participate in the mediation session in good faith and confer with the Mediator regarding the scheduling of additional conferences, bearing in mind the deadline for completion of Mediation set forth in the Court's Order Referring the Case to Mediation. Stipulation signed by: Kelsey W. Shannon and Jeffrey Beer, Jr.. Dated: 04/29/2024(Shannon, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mandatory Mediation Thu 04/04 3:29 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 5/2/2024. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 7/1/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 4/4/2024. (jdc )
Related: [-]
11 11 order Uniform Pretrial Scheduling Order Thu 04/04 3:28 PM
UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 5. Preferred Trial Location: Syracuse. Joinder of Parties due by 7/3/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 7/3/2024. Discovery due by 1/6/2025. Plaintiffs Expert Disclosure Deadline is 10/8/2024. Defendants Expert Disclosure Deadline is 11/22/2024. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline is 12/9/2024. Motions to be filed by 2/3/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 4/4/2024. (jdc )
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/04 3:18 PM
TEXT ORDER: On or before 7/8/2024, the parties shall file status reports regarding the progress of the litigation. A telephone conference is scheduled for 7/18/2024 at 11:00 a.m. The Courtroom Deputy will provide counsel with a Teams invite that contains the call-in information. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 4/4/2024.(jdc)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 04/04 3:17 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric: an initial conference was held on 4/4/2024. Pretrial deadlines were discussed and set. A telephone conference is scheduled for 7/18/2024 at 11:00 a.m. Appearances: K. Shannon, Esq., for the Plaintiffs; and J. Beer, Esq., for the Defendant. (jdc )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/03 8:54 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martin A. Lynn on behalf of Pemco Group, Inc., Pemco Montgomery St LLC (Lynn, Martin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
8 8 misc Civil Case Management Plan Wed 03/27 1:59 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Pemco Group, Inc., Pemco Montgomery St LLC. (Shannon, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
7 7 misc FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/16 1:45 PM
FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pemco Group, Inc., Pemco Montgomery St LLC.(Shannon, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
6 6 misc Jury Demand Fri 02/16 1:42 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Pemco Group, Inc., Pemco Montgomery St LLC. (Shannon, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/15 6:30 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company.(Beer, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing Thu 02/15 2:13 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 4/3/2024 at 1:30PM is RESCHEDULED for 4/4/2024 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric, via Microsoft Teams Teleconferencing. The Courtroom Deputy will send a teams link to the parties to participate. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/28/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jdc )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
4 4 misc FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/14 9:56 AM
FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Harleysville Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Allied Holdings (Delaware), Inc. for Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company.. (Beer, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
notice Notice - Other Tue 02/13 12:53 PM
TEXT NOTICE : The Initial Conference scheduled for 4/3/2024 at 1:30PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslv Lovric, will be held via Microsoft Teams Teleconferencing. The Courtroom Deputy will send a teams link to the parties to participate. (jdc )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 02/12 10:16 AM
***Answer due date updated for Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company answer due 2/15/2024. (mmg)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
3 3 misc G.O. 25 Filing Order Mon 02/12 10:05 AM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 4/3/2024 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/27/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mmg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
2 2 misc State Court Complaint Mon 02/12 10:03 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiffs in Supreme Court State of New York County of Onondaga. (mmg)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 02/12 9:59 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court State of New York County of Onondaga, case number 000041/2024 (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6612025) filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company.(mmg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: State Court Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Notice of Service of Process,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet