New Mexico District Court
Judge:David H Urias
Referred: John F Robbenhaar
Case #: 1:24-cv-00148
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 3:31 AM MDT
Defendant
Danny Aldaz
Represented By
Roxie P Rawls-De Santiago
Walsh Gallegos Trevino Kyle & Robinson P.C.
contact info
Esperanza S. Lujan
Walsh Gallegos Kyle Robinson & Roalson PC
contact info
Defendant
Board of Education of Albuquerque Public Schools
Represented By
Jennifer G. Anderson
Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk PA
contact info
Tomas J Garcia
Modrall Sperling Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Felix Garcia
Represented By
Isaac James Lopez
Fadduol, Cluff, Hardy & Conaway, P.C
contact info
Matthew J Zamora
Valle, O'Cleireachain, Zamora & Harris, P.C.
contact info
Carlos E Sedillo
Fadduol, Cluff, Hardy & Conaway, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Shasta Inman
Represented By
Isaac James Lopez
Fadduol, Cluff, Hardy & Conaway, P.C
contact info
Matthew J Zamora
Valle, O'Cleireachain, Zamora & Harris, P.C.
contact info
Carlos E Sedillo
Fadduol, Cluff, Hardy & Conaway, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Thursday, April 03, 2025
62 62 FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF JURY SELECTION/JURY TRIAL: Call of the Calendar reset for 3/19/2026 at 01:30 PM and Jury Selection/Trial (trailing docket) reset for 4/13/2026 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 420 Mimbres Courtroom before District Judge David H. Urias. (arp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trial Preparation
Set Deadlines: Pretrial Order due by 3/27/2026. (arp)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
61 61 MOTION to Vacate and Reset Trial Setting by Feliz A. Rael, Felix Garcia. (Sedillo, Carlos)
Related: [-]