California Southern District Court
Judge:Dana M Sabraw
Referred: Michael S Berg
Case #: 3:24-cv-00283
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983bv Bivens Non-Prisoner
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2024
Re-opened:Feb 05, 2025
Terminated:Mar 04, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 1:21 AM PDT
Defendant
A-Z Metro Towing
Defendant
City of Escondido
Defendant
Escondido Officer Aronson
Defendant
Michael McGuinness
Defendant
Paul McNamara
Defendant
State of California
Defendant
Ed Varso
Defendant
Joseph Mata
Defendant
Road One San Diego Towing
Plaintiff
Larry Swadener
550 W. Washington Ave
Escondido, CA 92025

GPO Dec 03 2024
ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/3/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(bdc)

Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
49 49 appeal USCA Time Schedule Order Thu 04/10 2:49 PM
USCA Time Schedule Order as to47 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Larry Swadener. (NOTICE TO PARTIES of deadlines regarding appellate transcripts: Appellant shall file transcript designation and ordering form with the US District Court, provide a copy of the form to the court reporter, and make payment arrangements with the court reporter on or by 5/5/2025 (see Ninth Circuit Rule 10-3.1); Due date for filing of transcripts in US District Court is 6/4/2025.) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)
Related: [-]
48 48 appeal USCA Case Number Thu 04/10 2:48 PM
USCA Case Number 25-2322 for47 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Larry Swadener.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attorney Appeal Case Opening,
Att: 2 Pro Se Appeals Case Opening,
Att: 3 Ninth Circuit Appellate Mentoring Program
Friday, April 04, 2025
47 47 appeal Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Mon 04/07 12:20 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit as to45 Clerk's Judgment,, by Larry Swadener., Fee not paid (Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals.)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
45 45 order Judgment - Clerk Tue 03/04 8:41 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that The Court DISMISSES Plaintiff's FAC as moot and SAC without leave to amend. Plaintiff's Motions for Equitable Tolling and Violations of the Bane Act are DENIEDalthough, as noted, the Court considers these Motions as being part of the SAC. Plaintiff's Motions for Trial by Judge and Oral Argument, Judgment on the Pleadings, and for the Court to Consider His Filings Timely are DENIED. This case is hereby closed. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(bdc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
46 46 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 03/05 2:32 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re37 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Larry Swadener. (bdc)
Related: [-]
44 44 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 03/04 8:23 AM
ORDER Granting Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's First and Second Amended Complaint37 Motion to Dismiss; granting41 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/3/2025. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(bdc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
43 43 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 02/27 1:49 PM
ORDER Vacating Oral Argument. Signed by District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/27/2025.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(bdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
42 42 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 02/18 2:47 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by A-Z Enterprises.(Branscome, Jack)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Thursday, February 13, 2025
41 41 motion Dismiss Thu 02/13 4:54 PM
MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 12(b)(6) by City of Escondido, Joseph Mata, Michael McGuinness, Ed Varso.(Bookholder, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Proof of Service
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
40 40 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/06 4:21 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT titled as First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand against A-Z Enterprises, Escondido Officer Aronson, Joseph Mata, Michael McGuinness, Receptionist, Ed Varso, filed by Larry Swadener. (bdc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Addendum,
Att: 2 Declaration
Monday, February 03, 2025
39 39 respm Response to Motion Mon 02/03 2:15 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re32 MOTION Requesting Violations of Bane Act,33 MOTION in Demand of Trial by Judge and Oral Argument,34 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings,35 MOTION to Consider Timely,31 MOTION Equitable Tolling (Omnibus Response) filed by Road One San Diego Towing, A-Z Metro Towing, A-Z Enterprises.(Branscome, Jack)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
38 38 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 02/03 2:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Road One San Diego Towing, A-Z Metro Towing, A-Z Enterprises.(Branscome, Jack)Attorney Jack Branscome added to party A-Z Enterprises(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Thursday, January 30, 2025
37 37 motion Dismiss Thu 01/30 5:50 PM
MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 12(b)(6) by Joseph Mata, City of Escondido, Michael McGuinness, Ed Varso.(Bookholder, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Proof of Service
36 36 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/30 4:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance and Change of Lead Counsel by Mark Bookholder on behalf of Joseph Mata, City of Escondido, Michael McGuinness, Ed Varso(Bookholder, Mark)Attorney Mark Bookholder added to party Joseph Mata(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Bookholder added to party City of Escondido(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Bookholder added to party Michael McGuinness(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Bookholder added to party Ed Varso(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, January 17, 2025
35 35 motion Miscellaneous (Other 1) Tue 01/21 4:16 PM
MOTION to Consider Timely by Larry Swadener. (bdc)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Tue 01/21 4:14 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Larry Swadener. (bdc)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Miscellaneous (Other 1) Tue 01/21 4:12 PM
MOTION in Demand of Trial by Judge and Oral Argument by Larry Swadener. (bdc)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Miscellaneous (Other 1) Tue 01/21 4:09 PM
MOTION Requesting Violations of Bane Act by Larry Swadener. (bdc)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Miscellaneous (Other 1) Tue 01/21 4:06 PM
MOTION for Equitable Tolling by Larry Swadener. (bdc)
Related: [-]
30 30 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 01/21 3:44 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against A-Z Enterprises, Escondido Officer Aronson, Joseph Mata, Michael McGuinness, Receptionist, Ed Varso, filed by Larry Swadener.New Summons Requested. (bdc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
29 29 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 01/21 3:24 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re20 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Larry Swadener. (bdc)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 01/21 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Change of Contact Information by Larry Swadener (bdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
27 27 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 12/04 9:04 AM
ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/3/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(bdc)
Related: [-]
26 26 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order Tue 12/03 10:06 AM
ORDER re: Oral Argument20 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Ed Varso, Michael McGuinness, Joseph Mata, City of Escondido. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/3/2024.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(bdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 11/13 11:35 AM
NOTICE of Change of Contact Information by Larry Swadener (ddf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Joinder Thu 10/31 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Joinder by Road One San Diego Towing, A-Z Metro Towing re20 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) (Branscome, Jack)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
23 23 notice Pretrial Disclosures Wed 10/30 6:53 PM
Pretrial Disclosures by Road One San Diego Towing, A-Z Metro Towing Corporate Disclosure Statement(Branscome, Jack)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
22 22 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Wed 10/30 6:51 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Road One San Diego Towing, A-Z Metro Towing(Branscome, Jack)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/30 6:49 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Documents 18 and 19 by Road One San Diego Towing, A-Z Metro Towing re18 Notice of Party With Financial Interest,19 Pretrial Disclosures,(Branscome, Jack)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
20 20 motion Dismiss Wed 10/30 2:29 PM
MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) by Joseph Mata, City of Escondido, Michael McGuinness, Ed Varso.(McGuinness, Michael)Attorney Michael R McGuinness added to party Joseph Mata(pty:dft), Attorney Michael R McGuinness added to party City of Escondido(pty:dft), Attorney Michael R McGuinness added to party Michael McGuinness(pty:dft), Attorney Michael R McGuinness added to party Ed Varso(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Proof of Service
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
19 19 notice Pretrial Disclosures Tue 10/29 3:21 PM
Pretrial Disclosures by Road One San Diego Towing, A-Z Metro Towing Corporate Disclosure Statement(Branscome, Jack)Attorney Jack Branscome added to party Road One San Diego Towing(pty:dft), Attorney Jack Branscome added to party A-Z Metro Towing(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
18 18 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Tue 10/29 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Road One San Diego Towing, A-Z Metro Towing re17 Answer to Complaint(Branscome, Jack)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/29 3:01 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Road One San Diego Towing, A-Z Metro Towing.(Kinnear, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 10/24 12:31 PM
NOTICE of Change of Contact Information by Larry Swadener (ddf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
15 15 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Wed 10/16 1:13 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Larry Swadener as to Paul McNamara. (ddf)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/16 1:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Swadener. Michael McGuinness served. (ddf)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/16 1:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Swadener. Joseph Mata served. (ddf)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/16 1:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Swadener. Ed Varso served. (ddf)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/16 1:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Swadener. A-Z Metro Towing served. (ddf)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/16 1:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Swadener. Road One San Diego Towing served. (ddf)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/16 1:04 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Larry Swadener as to Escondido Officer. (ddf)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/16 1:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Swadener. State of California served. (ddf)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Fri 09/13 1:52 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically.(ddf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP Letter
6 6 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Fri 09/13 1:45 PM
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis And Dismissing Motion TO Appoint Counsel2 ,3 . Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/13/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (Certified Copy to USM) (ddf)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 05/13 10:56 AM
NOTICE of Change of Contact Information by Larry Swadener (ddf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 05/02 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Change of Contact Information by Larry Swadener (ddf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
3 3 motion Appoint Counsel Mon 02/12 3:54 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Larry Swadener. (stn)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 02/12 1:06 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Larry Swadener. (stn) (jms)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/12 1:03 PM
COMPLAINT against A-Z Metro Towing, City of Escondido, Escondido Officer Aronson, Michael McGuinness, Paul McNamara, State of California, Ed Varso, IFP Filed, filed by Larry Swadener. (stn) The new case number is 3:24-cv-283-DMS-MSB. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case.(stn) (jms) (stn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Declaration of Service
Att: 3 (2/12/2024) Supplement Postage Envelope