California Southern District Court
Judge:James E Simmons, Jr
Referred: Steve B Chu
Case #: 3:24-cv-00284
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983bv Bivens Non-Prisoner
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2024
Terminated:Mar 12, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 2:18 AM PDT
Defendant
Anne Acebo-Houlihan
Defendant
Does 1-250
Defendant
Rodney Donohoo
Defendant
Gregory M. Garrison
Defendant
Jesse Houlihan
Defendant
Kevin T Rhine
Defendant
San Diego County Sheriff Department
Defendant
Superior Court
Plaintiff
Catherine E Albertini
Wife Post Office Box 159
Solana Beach, CA 92075
Plaintiff
Gregory E Albertini, Sr.
Husband Post Office Box 159
Solana Beach, CA 92075

GPO Mar 12 2024
ORDER: (1) Denying Motion for Emergency Injunction and Stay of Execution as Moot; (2) Denying Motion To Disqualify Judge; (3) Denying Motion for Judicial Notice as Moot; (4) Denying Motion to Correct Pleading Title Page as Moot; And (5) Dismissing Case For Lack Of Federal Subject Matter Jurisdiction (ECF Nos. 1, 8, 11, 13). Signed by District Judge James E. Simmons, Jr on 3/8/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(maq)

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, October 25, 2024
25 25 appeal USCA Mandate Mon 10/28 8:45 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to19 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Catherine E Albertini (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
24 24 appeal USCA Order Wed 08/28 8:10 AM
Dispositive Order of USCA as to19 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Catherine E Albertini. DISMISSED. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)(jrd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/26 11:52 AM
NOTICE (9th Circuit Court of Appeals Form 27) filed by Catherine E Albertini.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(USDC Notice electronically transmitted to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals.)(mjw)(jrd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope
Monday, April 08, 2024
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/10 11:48 AM
Proof of Service by Catherine E Albertini re19 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, (Document sent to Ninth Circuit. Ninth Circuit does not docket summons, service is not required for appeal) (dim)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
21 21 appeal USCA Time Schedule Order Fri 04/05 10:44 AM
USCA Time Schedule Order as to19 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Catherine E Albertini. (NOTICE TO PARTIES of deadlines regarding appellate transcripts: Appellant shall file transcript designation and ordering form with the US District Court, provide a copy of the form to the court reporter, and make payment arrangements with the court reporter on or by 4/22/2024 (see Ninth Circuit Rule 10-3.1); Due date for filing of transcripts in US District Court is 5/22/2024.) (cc: Court Reporter). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dim)
Related: [-]
20 20 appeal USCA Case Number Fri 04/05 10:42 AM
USCA Case Number 24-2101 for19 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Catherine E Albertini.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attorney Appeal Case Opening,
Att: 2 Pro- Se Appeals Case Opening,
Att: 3 Ninth Circuit Lawyer Mentoring Program,
Att: 4 Appellate Practice Guide
Thursday, March 21, 2024
19 19 appeal Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Tue 04/02 3:44 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit as to16 Order Dismissing Case,, Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, by Catherine E Albertini., IFP Status (Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals.)(dim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Second NOA Form,
Att: 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/14 12:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory E Albertini, Sr, Catherine E Albertini. San Diego County Sheriff Department served. (maq)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/14 12:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory E Albertini, Sr, Catherine E Albertini. Gregory M. Garrison served. (maq)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
16 16 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order Dismissing Case Tue 03/12 3:09 PM
ORDER: (1) Denying Motion for Emergency Injunction and Stay of Execution as Moot; (2) Denying Motion To Disqualify Judge; (3) Denying Motion for Judicial Notice as Moot; (4) Denying Motion to Correct Pleading Title Page as Moot; And (5) Dismissing Case For Lack Of Federal Subject Matter Jurisdiction (ECF Nos.1 ,8 ,11 ,13 ). Signed by District Judge James E. Simmons, Jr on 3/8/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(maq)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
15 15 service Certificate of Service Tue 03/12 8:44 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Catherine E Albertini, Gregory E Albertini, Sr re9 Order to Show Cause. (maq)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Tue 03/12 8:41 AM
Summons Returned UNEXECUTED by Gregory E Albertini, Sr, Catherine E Albertini as to Gregory M. Garrison. (maq)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
13 13 motion Amend/Correct Fri 03/08 12:01 PM
MOTION to Correct Pleading Title Page to Add Defendants due to a filing mistake by Catherine E Albertini, Gregory E Albertini, Sr. (maq)
Related: [-]
12 12 respm Response - Other Fri 03/08 11:56 AM
RESPONSE to Second Amended Order to Show Cause, re9 filed by Catherine E Albertini, Gregory E Albertini, Sr. (maq)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Miscellaneous (Other 1) Fri 03/08 10:20 AM
MOTION for Mandatory Judicial Notice by Catherine E Albertini, Gregory E Albertini, Sr. (maq)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/04 10:53 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory E Albertini, Sr, Catherine E Albertini. Superior Court served. (maq)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
9 9 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 02/26 8:23 AM
SECOND AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff's must file a Written Response to this Order to Show Cause by 3/8/2024. Signed by District Judge James E. Simmons, Jr on 2/23/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (attachment(s) added on 2/26/2024: #1 Stricken Amended OSC) (maq)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
8 8 motion Disqualify Judge Recusal Thu 02/22 3:45 PM
MOTION Request to Disqualify District Judge and Magistrate Judge, MOTION for Recusal of District Judge and Magistrate Judge under 29 U.S.C. § 2220.68, AND 28 U.S.C. § 455, and 28 U.S.C. § 144 by Catherine E Albertini, Gregory E Albertini, Sr. (maq)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/22 3:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory E Albertini, Sr, Catherine E Albertini. Anne Acebo-Houlihan served. (maq)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/22 3:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory E Albertini, Sr, Catherine E Albertini. Kevin T Rhine served. (maq)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/22 3:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory E Albertini, Sr, Catherine E Albertini. Jesse Houlihan served. (maq)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 02/22 8:00 AM
AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Response due by 3/6/2024. Signed by District Judge James E. Simmons, Jr on 2/21/2024.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (maq)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stricken OSC
3 3 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 02/21 1:17 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiffs must file a written response to this Order to Show Cause by March 6, 2024 at 12:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge James E. Simmons, Jr on 2/21/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(maq)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 02/13 9:27 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (stn) (jms)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/13 9:25 AM
Complaint - Request and Motion for an Emergency Injunction and Stay of Execution with Jury Demand against Anne Acebo-Houlihan, Rodney Donohoo, Gregory M. Garrison, Jesse Houlihan, Kevin T Rhine, San Diego County Sheriff Department, Superior Court ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 151369.), filed by Gregory E Albertini, Sr, Catherine E Albertini. The new case number is 3:24-cv-284-JES-SBC. Judge James E. Simmons, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu are assigned to the case.(stn) (jms)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Receipt