California Central District Court
Judge:Dolly M Gee
Referred: Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 2:24-cv-01193
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2024
Terminated:Jun 18, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles, 23STCV27984
Last checked: Sunday Aug 11, 2024 2:23 AM PDT
Defendant
United States Air Force
Represented By
Jennifer R. Jacobs
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
United States Space Force
Represented By
Jennifer R. Jacobs
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Cathy J. Howard
Defendant
Shawn Kelley
Defendant
Aaron Munoz
Plaintiff
Victor Anthony Menjivar
955 E. Edgeware Rd
Los Angeles, CA 90026


Docket last updated: 24 minutes ago
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
13 13 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 06/18 5:10 PM
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: On 3/4/2024, the Court granted Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Plaintiff Victor Anthony Menjivar's failure to file an Opposition11 . In its Order, the Court cautioned Plaintiff that this action would be dismissed if he failed to file an amended complaint by 3/25/2024. Plaintiff has not filed amended pleadings, and the time to do so has long passed. Therefore, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
12 12 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 03/05 11:50 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court hereby VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for March 15, 2024. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
11 11 order Dismiss Case Tue 03/05 6:00 AM
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Pro se Plaintiff Victor Anthony Menjivar has not filed an opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss ("MTD")6 , and the deadline to do so has passed. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Defendants' MID for lack of opposition. By 3/25/2024, Plaintiff shall file a First Amended Complaint on the docket. Failure to timely file an amended complaint will result in dismissal of this action. Defendants shall file a response within 60 days of service of any amended complaint. The 3/15/2024 hearing is VACATED. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
10 10 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 03/01 2:15 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; Declaration of Jennifer R. Jacobs ; estimated length of trial 0 days, filed by Defendants United States Air Force, United States Space Force..(Jacobs, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/01 11:53 AM
Notice OF NON-OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION TO DISMISS ACTION filed by Defendants United States Air Force, United States Space Force. Declaration of Jennifer R Jacobs(Jacobs, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof Of Service
Friday, February 16, 2024
8 8 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 02/16 10:06 PM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/1/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 3/15/2024 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kd)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 02/16 11:31 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (gga)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Dismiss Case Fri 02/16 11:00 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JENNIFER R. JACOBS filed by Defendants United States Air Force, United States Space Force. Motion set for hearing on 3/15/2024 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Jacobs, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Proof of Service
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 02/14 12:01 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
4 4 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 02/14 12:01 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 02/14 12:00 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 02/13 12:07 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants United States Air Force, United States Space Force. (Jacobs, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 02/13 12:04 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 23STCV27984 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Defendants United States Space Force, United States Air Force. (Attorney Jennifer R. Jacobs added to party United States Air Force(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer R. Jacobs added to party United States Space Force (pty:dft))(Jacobs, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 02/14 12:57 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Cathy J. Howard, Shawn Kelley, Aaron Munoz, United States Air Force, United States Space Force., filed by plaintiff Victor Anthony Menjivar. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/15/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1-4) (ghap)
Related: [-]