California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Case #: 3:24-cv-00861
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2024
Terminated:Dec 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 11, 2024 2:24 AM PDT
Counter-claimant
Sean Tao
Represented By
M. Danton Richardson
Self
contact info
Michael Christian Whitticar
Nova Ip Law, PLLC
contact info
Counter-claimant
Tao Consulting LLC
Represented By
M. Danton Richardson
Self
contact info
Michael Christian Whitticar
Nova Ip Law, PLLC
contact info
Counter-defendant
Sean Tao
Represented By
M. Danton Richardson
Self
contact info
Michael Christian Whitticar
Nova Ip Law, PLLC
contact info
Counter-defendant
Tao Consulting LLC
Represented By
M. Danton Richardson
Self
contact info
Michael Christian Whitticar
Nova Ip Law, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Sean Tao
Represented By
M. Danton Richardson
Self
contact info
Michael Christian Whitticar
Nova Ip Law, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Tao Consulting LLC
Represented By
M. Danton Richardson
Self
contact info
Michael Christian Whitticar
Nova Ip Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SPH Digital Inc.
Represented By
Natalie Ann Rainforth
Doner Law, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, December 05, 2024
40 40 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 12/05 12:04 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/5/2024. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
39 39 2 pgs motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 12/05 8:16 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal with Prejudice filed by SPH Digital Inc.. (Rainforth, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
38 38 order Case Management Scheduling Order Mon 11/25 12:30 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2025. Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2025 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, - To be determined. Close of Fact Discovery due by 9/1/2025. Discovery due by 11/24/2025. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/25/2024. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
37 37 12 pgs misc Joint Case Management Statement Fri 11/22 6:10 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by SPH Digital Inc.. (Rainforth, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
36 36 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Thu 11/14 10:20 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE set for November 15, 2024 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. A Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/22/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
35 35 misc Case Management Statement Mon 11/11 2:55 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Defendants filed by Tao Consulting LLC, Sean Tao. (Tong, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
34 34 misc Case Management Statement Fri 11/08 2:38 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by SPH Digital Inc.. (Rainforth, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
33 33 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 09/18 11:28 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 32 Stipulation.A Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2024 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco - To be determined. (ls, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
32 32 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 09/17 10:19 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Sean Tao, Tao Consulting LLC. (Tong, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
utility Electronic Filing Error Wed 09/11 8:25 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . NOTICE TO COUNSEL: VINCENT TONG. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #:30 First MOTION to Substitute Attorney Vincent Tong, TONG LAW filed by Sean Tao, Tao Consulting LLC ). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Tue 09/10 9:43 AM
ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 30 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Vincent Tong terminated. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
30 30 motion Substitute Firm Mon 09/09 5:01 PM
First MOTION to Substitute Attorney Vincent Tong, TONG LAW filed by Sean Tao, Tao Consulting LLC. (Tong, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
29 29 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Thu 09/05 12:03 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2024 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco - To be determined. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
28 28 13 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 08/07 12:32 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 27 Stipulation. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
27 27 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 08/06 11:20 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by SPH Digital Inc.. (Rainforth, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 06/28 2:36 PM
ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 16 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim. (crblc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
25 25 oth_sup Statement of Non-Opposition Fri 06/28 12:34 PM
Statement of Non-Opposition re20 Opposition/Response to Motion,16 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim of Defendant Sean Tao a/k/a Chung S. Tao [including request for leave to file] filed bySean Tao. Related [+] (Richardson, M.)
Related: [-] 20 ,16
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/28 6:52 AM
ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Michael C. Whitticar. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
23 23 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/27 1:14 PM
First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19563810.) filed by Sean Tao, Tao Consulting LLC.(Whitticar, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Friday, June 21, 2024
22 22 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Fri 06/21 11:44 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed bySPH Digital Inc.. (Rainforth, Natalie)
Related: [-] 16 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim of Defendant Sean Tao a/k/a Chung S. Tao
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
21 21 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Tue 06/18 9:47 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION TO DISMISS Counterclaim of Defendant Sean Tao a/k/a Chung S. Tao hearing set July 26, 2024 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) . Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/crb] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at crbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than July 30, 2024 at 3:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
20 20 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Fri 06/14 4:04 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed bySean Tao. (Richardson, M.)
Related: [-] 16 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim of Defendant Sean Tao a/k/a Chung S. Tao
Thursday, April 25, 2024
19 19 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 04/25 1:27 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Rainforth, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
18 18 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Wed 04/17 10:36 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION TO DISMISS Counterclaim of Defendant Sean Tao a/k/a Chung S. Tao hearing set for May 31, 2024 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DEADLINE AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE set for May 24, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) . Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/crb] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at crbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than July 23, 2024 at 3:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
17 17 respoth Answer to CounterClaim Tue 04/16 9:02 PM
ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by SPH Digital Inc.. (Rainforth, Natalie)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Dismiss Tue 04/16 9:00 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim of Defendant Sean Tao a/k/a Chung S. Tao filed by SPH Digital Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 5/31/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Responses due by 6/14/2024. Replies due by 6/21/2024.(Rainforth, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 29, 2024
15 15 service Affidavit of Service Fri 03/29 12:50 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint & Other Required Documents (including Plaintiff's Certificate of Conflicts and Interested Entities or Persons, Consent or Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, Order Reassigning Case, Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, General Standing Order for Civil & Criminal Cases (Breyer), Standing Order for All Judges of N.D. Cal, and Plaintiff's Declination of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction) served on Sean Tao a.k.a. Chung S. Tao (via attorney M. Danton Richardson) on 3/11/2024, filed by SPH Digital Inc.. (Rainforth, Natalie)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Affidavit of Service Fri 03/29 12:47 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint & Other Required Documents (including Plaintiff's Certificate of Conflicts and Interested Entities or Persons, Consent or Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, Order Reassigning Case, Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, General Standing Order for Civil & Criminal Cases (Breyer), Standing Order for All Judges of N.D. Cal, and Plaintiff's Declination of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction) served on Tao Consulting LLC (via attorney M. Danton Richardson) on 3/11/2024, filed by SPH Digital Inc.. (Rainforth, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
13 13 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 03/26 6:46 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Sean Tao, Tao Consulting LLC (Richardson, M.)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Tue 03/26 6:25 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Defendants by Sean Tao, Tao Consulting LLC. (Richardson, M.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
11 11 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Thu 02/15 10:43 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2024 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco - To be determined. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued Thu 02/15 9:06 AM
Summons Issued as to Sean Tao, Tao Consulting LLC.(jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
9 9 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 02/15 8:22 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 02/15/2024.(mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Wed 02/14 4:00 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 02/14 3:10 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by SPH Digital Inc... (Rainforth, Natalie)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Proposed Summons Wed 02/14 2:56 PM
Proposed Summons. (Rainforth, Natalie)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Summons Wed 02/14 2:55 PM
Proposed Summons. (Rainforth, Natalie)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 02/14 2:39 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by SPH Digital Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ordissimo S.A. for SPH Digital Inc.. Submitted Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Local Civ. R. 3-15 (Rainforth, Natalie)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 02/14 8:37 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2024 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 02/13 3:42 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/27/2024. (wsm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/13 2:24 PM
COMPLAINT against Sean Tao, Tao Consulting LLC ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19121601.). Filed by SPH Digital Inc..(Rainforth, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet