Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:S Thomas Anderson
Referred: Jon A York
Case #: 1:24-cv-02096
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2024
Terminated:Oct 15, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 11, 2024 4:36 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
MADD Assets, LLC
Represented By
Charles H. Barnett, III
Spragins Barnett & Cobb, PLC
contact info
Charles Hilliard Barnett, IV
Spragins, Barnett, And Cobb
contact info
Sara Barnett
Spragins Barnett & Cobb, PLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Mildred E. Duttko
Represented By
James Wesley Cobb
Cobb Law Group, LP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Robert E. Duttko
Represented By
James Wesley Cobb
Cobb Law Group, LP
contact info
Defendant
MADD Assets, LLC
1210 SW 2nd Avenue
Okeechobee, FL 34974
Represented By
Charles H. Barnett, III
Spragins Barnett & Cobb, PLC
contact info
Charles Hilliard Barnett, IV
Spragins, Barnett, And Cobb
contact info
Sara Barnett
Spragins Barnett & Cobb, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mildred E. Duttko
205 Charles Ward Way
Selmer, TN 38375
Represented By
James Wesley Cobb
Cobb Law Group, LP
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert E. Duttko
205 Charles Ward Way
Selmer, TN 38375
Represented By
James Wesley Cobb
Cobb Law Group, LP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
28 28 order Judgment Tue 10/15 9:25 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 10/15/2024. (mbb)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 10/15 9:07 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Robert E. Duttko, Mildred E. Duttko. (Cobb, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
26 26 adr Mediation Certification Mon 09/30 10:31 AM
MEDIATION CERTIFICATION (Collins, Fred)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/13 11:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John S. Little on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Little, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Deadline Tue 07/16 11:12 AM
ORDER EXTENDING MEDIATION DEADLINE23 . Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 7/16/24. (skc)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Extend Deadline Tue 07/16 10:13 AM
Joint MOTION to Extend Deadline for Mediation, proposed order submitted by MADD Assets, LLC. (Barnett, Sara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
22 22 notice Setting Letter Tue 06/11 3:21 PM
SETTING LETTER: Non-Jury Trial set for 10/20/2025 09:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Judge S. Thomas Anderson. Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2025 09:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Judge S. Thomas Anderson. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/3/2025. (mbb)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Scheduling Order Tue 06/11 1:47 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 6/11/2024. (mbb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
20 20 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 06/06 11:44 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge S. Thomas Anderson: Scheduling Conference held on 6/6/2024. ADR by 8/29/24. Discovery by 12/18/24. Dispositive motions by 1/17/25. Estimated 3-4 day non-jury trial. Parties do not consent to trial before Magistrate Judge. Parties to submit revised scheduling order to Chambers to reflect James Cobb's name. PRESENT: James Cobb (via phone for Plaintiff. Charles Barnett for Defendant. (Court Reporter Kristi Heasley.) (mbb)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 18, 2024
19 19 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Sat 05/18 9:48 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Barnett, Sara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
18 18 answer Answer to Counterclaim Wed 04/17 3:22 PM
Plaintiff's ANSWER to16 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Mildred E. Duttko, Robert E. Duttko.(Cobb, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
17 17 notice Setting Letter Thu 03/28 10:00 AM
SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2024 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (mbb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Wed 03/27 1:08 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by MADD Assets, LLC.(Barnett, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 03/14 9:36 AM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING13 . Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 3/14/24. (skc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Correction Wed 03/13 5:04 PM
Notice of Correction to13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, proposed order submitted filing memorandum in support .(Barnett, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Motion for Extension
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 03/13 3:56 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, proposed order submitted by All Defendants. (Barnett, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/12 1:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Barnett on behalf of MADD Assets, LLC (Barnett, Sara)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/12 12:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles H. Barnett, III on behalf of MADD Assets, LLC (Barnett, Charles)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Correction Tue 03/12 12:26 PM
Notice of Correction to9 Notice of Appearance of Charles H. Barnett, IV .(Barnett, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Corrected Notice of Appearance
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/12 11:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Hilliard Barnett, IV on behalf of MADD Assets, LLC (Barnett, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Thu 02/22 3:27 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action served on Devin D. Williamson on 02/22/2024, filed by Mildred E. Duttko, Robert E. Duttko. (Cobb, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
7 7 notice Courtesy Notice Tue 02/13 4:10 PM
COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document1 Complaint, filed by Robert E. Duttko, Mildred E. Duttko has been filed. For future reference, please note the civil cover sheet has a hand-written signature and not the required electronic signature. Please refer to the[LINK:ECF User Manual] and[LINK:ECF Policies and Procedures] . Filer is not required to resubmit document. (agj)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 02/13 4:08 PM
Summons Issued as to MADD Assets, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Tue 02/13 4:04 PM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice LR 16.2 Tue 02/13 4:04 PM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice ADR Compliance Tue 02/13 4:04 PM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 02/13 4:03 PM
Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (agj)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/13 1:00 PM
COMPLAINT Duttko against MADD Assets, LLC (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNWDC-4342636), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Cobb, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet