Colorado District Court
Judge:Daniel D Domenico
Referred: Kathryn A Starnella
Case #: 1:24-cv-00434
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 11, 2024 3:23 AM MDT
Defendant
Michael Joachim
Represented By
William Casey Brown
Douglas County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Paul Rogers
Represented By
William Casey Brown
Douglas County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
David C. Walcher
Represented By
William Casey Brown
Douglas County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Darren Weekly
Represented By
William Casey Brown
Douglas County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Darren (I) Weekly
Represented By
William Casey Brown
Douglas County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrea Bradbury
Represented By
Jane Holse Fisher-Byrialsen
Fisher & Byrialsen PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, March 10, 2025
38 38 order Protective Order Mon 03/10 3:33 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 10 March 2025. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
37 37 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 03/10 3:32 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 10 March 2025. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the First Stipulated Motion for Entry of Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information33 is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Second Stipulated Motion for Entry of Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information35 is GRANTED. The Protective Order [#35-1] supplied by the parties is accepted, with the Court's modifications, and entered as an Order of the Court as of the date of this Minute Order.(cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
36 36 order Order Referring Motion Thu 03/06 3:29 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION:35 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information filed by Darren (I) Weekly, Darren Weekly, Paul Rogers, Michael Joachim, David C. Walcher. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 3/6/2025. Text Only Entry (dddlc10)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Protective Order Thu 03/06 3:17 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information by Defendants Darren Weekly, Darren (I) Weekly, David C. Walcher, Paul Rogers, Michael Joachim.(Laird, Zoe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
34 34 order Order Referring Motion Thu 03/06 2:54 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION:33 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information filed by Darren (I) Weekly, Darren Weekly, Paul Rogers, Michael Joachim, David C. Walcher. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 3/6/2025. Text Only Entry (dddlc10)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Protective Order Thu 03/06 2:39 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information by Defendants Darren Weekly, Darren (I) Weekly, David C. Walcher, Paul Rogers, Michael Joachim. (Laird, Zoe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
32 32 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Tue 01/21 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Zoe Alexandra Laird on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Zoe Alexandra Laird added to party Darren Weekly(pty:dft), Attorney Zoe Alexandra Laird added to party Darren (I) Weekly(pty:dft), Attorney Zoe Alexandra Laird added to party David C. Walcher(pty:dft), Attorney Zoe Alexandra Laird added to party Paul Rogers(pty:dft), Attorney Zoe Alexandra Laird added to party Michael Joachim(pty:dft) (Laird, Zoe)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
31 31 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 01/02 3:33 PM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 2 January 2025. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadlines for Joinder of Parties, Amendment of Pleadings, Fact Discovery, Dispositive Motions and Expert Disclosure Deadlines29 is GRANTED. The affirmative expert disclosures deadline is extended to May 30, 2025. The expert rebuttal disclosures deadline is extended to June 16, 2025. The discovery cutoff is extended to July 31, 2025. The dispositive motions deadline is extended to August 28, 2025.(cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 01, 2025
30 30 order Order Referring Motion Wed 01/01 9:39 AM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION:29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadlines for Joinder of Parties, Amendment of Pleadings, Fact Discovery, Dispositive Motions and Expert Disclosure Deadlines filed by Andrea Bradbury. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 1/1/2025. Text Only Entry (dddlc10)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
29 29 motion Extension of Time Tue 12/31 5:51 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadlines for Joinder of Parties, Amendment of Pleadings, Fact Discovery, Dispositive Motions and Expert Disclosure Deadlines by Plaintiff Andrea Bradbury. (Fisher-Byrialsen, Jane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
28 28 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 12/11 10:41 AM
ORDER GRANTING26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate attorney William C. Brown as counsel of record, and to remove this name from the electronic certificate of mailing. Defendants Darren Weekly, David Walcher, Paul Rogers, and Michael Joachim will continue to be represented by attorney S. Kelly Dunnaway. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 12/11/2024. Text Only Entry (dddlc10)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 12/11 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly Dunnaway on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Kelly Dunnaway added to party Darren Weekly(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Dunnaway added to party Darren (I) Weekly(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Dunnaway added to party David C. Walcher(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Dunnaway added to party Paul Rogers(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Dunnaway added to party Michael Joachim(pty:dft) (Dunnaway, Kelly)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 12/11 10:27 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel by Defendants Darren Weekly, Darren (I) Weekly, David C. Walcher, Paul Rogers, Michael Joachim. (Brown, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
25 25 order Minute Order Tue 12/10 2:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER STRIKING24 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Defendants Darren Weekly, David C. Walcher, Paul Rogers, and Michael Joachim. Withdrawal of appearance may only be effected by a court order entered after service of a motion to withdraw showing good cause. Mr. S. Kelly Dunnaway may file an Entry of Appearance that complies with Local Atty. R. 5(a), and Mr. W. Casey Brown may file a motion to withdraw that complies with Local Atty. R. 5(b). SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 12/10/2024. Text Only Entry (dddlc10)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Tue 12/10 12:07 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Defendants Darren Weekly, Darren (I) Weekly, David C. Walcher, Paul Rogers, Michael Joachim (Brown, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 09/13 8:28 AM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 12 September 2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Subpoena20 is GRANTED. The deadline for Non-Party Office of the District Attorney for the 18th Judicial District to respond to Plaintiff's Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action is extended to September 20, 2024. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
22 22 2 pgs order Order of Recusal Thu 09/12 3:41 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL: IT IS ORDERED that I recuse myself from further service in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall reassign this civil action to another Magistrate Judge. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-434-DDD-KAS . Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/12/2024. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order Referring Motion Thu 09/12 12:05 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION:20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Subpoena From Non-Party Office of The District Attorney for the 18th Judicial District filed by District Attorney for the 18th Judicial District. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/12/2024. Text Only Entry (dddlc10)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Extension of Time Thu 09/12 11:10 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Subpoena From Non-Party Office of The District Attorney for the 18th Judicial District by miscellaneous District Attorney for the 18th Judicial District. (Ringel, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
19 19 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 08/29 1:11 PM
ORDER granting17 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadlines for good cause shown. The Court modifies the Scheduling Order, ECF 16, as follows: Designation of Affirmative Experts due 11/29/2024 ; Designation of Rebuttal Experts due 12/16/2024 ; Discovery Cut-off 1/31/2025 ; and Dispositive Motions due 3/3/2025 . Entered by Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/29/2024. Text Only Entry (mehlc7)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order Referring Motion Thu 08/29 9:57 AM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION:17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Motion to Extend Deadlines filed by Andrea Bradbury. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 8/29/24. Text Only Entry (dddlc10)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
17 17 motion Extension of Time Wed 08/28 7:46 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Motion to Extend Deadlines by Plaintiff Andrea Bradbury. (Fisher-Byrialsen, Jane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
16 16 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/11 4:26 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/11/2024. (cpear)
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 04/11 3:46 PM
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 4/11/2024. Discovery due by 10/30/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 11/29/2024. Designation of Affirmative Experts due by 8/30/2024. Designation of Rebuttal Experts due by 9/16/2024. FTR: A-501. (cpear)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
14 14 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Thu 03/28 11:22 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Andrea Bradbury All parties do not consent.. (Fisher-Byrialsen, Jane)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 03/28 11:14 AM
Proposed Scheduling Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Andrea Bradbury. (Fisher-Byrialsen, Jane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/20 2:34 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to1 Complaint, Attorney William Casey Brown added to party Michael Joachim(pty:dft), Attorney William Casey Brown added to party Paul Rogers(pty:dft), Attorney William Casey Brown added to party David C. Walcher(pty:dft), Attorney William Casey Brown added to party Darren (I) Weekly(pty:dft), Attorney William Casey Brown added to party Darren Weekly(pty:dft) by Michael Joachim, Paul Rogers, David C. Walcher, Darren (I) Weekly(in his individual capacity), Darren Weekly(in his official capacity).(Brown, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
11 11 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Tue 03/05 10:04 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea Bradbury. Michael Joachim served on 2/27/2024, answer due 3/19/2024. (Fisher-Byrialsen, Jane)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Tue 03/05 10:03 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea Bradbury. Paul Rogers served on 2/27/2024, answer due 3/19/2024. (Fisher-Byrialsen, Jane)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Tue 03/05 10:02 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea Bradbury. David C. Walcher served on 2/27/2024, answer due 3/19/2024. (Fisher-Byrialsen, Jane)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Tue 03/05 10:00 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea Bradbury. Darren (I) Weekly(in his individual capacity) served on 2/27/2024, answer due 3/19/2024; Darren Weekly(in his official capacity) served on 2/27/2024, answer due 3/19/2024. (Fisher-Byrialsen, Jane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
7 7 order Minute Order Wed 02/14 4:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/14/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/4/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 4/11/2024 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (jtorr, )
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 02/14 10:35 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 2/14/2024. Text Only Entry. (rkeec)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Summons Issued Wed 02/14 8:34 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (efoga, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
4 4 misc Case Assigned to Judge Wed 02/14 8:29 AM
Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Summons Request Tue 02/13 4:51 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Darren Weekly, David C. Walcher, Paul Rogers, Michael Joachim re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Andrea D Bradbury.(Fisher-Byrialsen, Jane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Summons David Walcher,
Att: 2 Summons Summons Paul Rogers,
Att: 3 Summons Michael Joachim
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/13 4:48 PM
NOTICE re1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Andrea D Bradbury (Fisher-Byrialsen, Jane)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/13 4:34 PM
COMPLAINT Verified Civil Rights Complaint with Request for Trial by Jury against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9540088)Attorney Jane Holse Fisher-Byrialsen added to party Andrea D Bradbury(pty:pla), filed by Andrea D Bradbury.(Fisher-Byrialsen, Jane)
Related: [-]