California Eastern District Court
Case #: 6:24-mj-00003
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 13, 2024 11:18 PM PST
Defendant
John James Jose (1)
Represented By
Kara Ottervanger
Federal Public Defender Eastern District Of California
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jeffrey A. Spivak, GOVT
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/13/2024 11:37 PM PST
Monday, February 12, 2024
1 1 3 pgs INFORMATION (Petty) as to John James Jose (1). (Xiong, J.)
Related: [-]
2 2 AO257 (Sealed) as to John James Jose (Xiong, J.)
Related: [-]
4 4 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta: INITIAL APPEARANCE on INFORMATION as to John James Jose held on 2/12/2024. Defendant states true name as John Tanoesoedibjo. Financial affidavit submitted on behalf of defendant. The court appoints the federal defender to represent defendant. The defendant is advised of the charges, maximum penalties and rights. NOT GUILTY PLEA ENTERED. Discovery ordered within 14 days; reciprocal within 21 days. The court instructed government counsel under Rule 5(f) to comply with its disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland. The government is seeking detention. The Court orders the defendant TEMPORARILY DETAINED. The defendant to appear in person for Detention Hearing set for 2/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (HBK) before Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta. Government Counsel: Jeffrey Spivak present. Defense Counsel: Kara Ottervanger present. Pretrial Services Officer: Lorena Gallagher present. Custody Status: Custody - present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO - Otilia Rosales. (Apodaca, P)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER (TEXT ONLY) as to Defendant John James Jose signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 2/12/2024: According to the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure Rule 5(f), the government is ordered to comply with its discovery obligations as required by federal law, including those duties imposed by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and all applicable decisions interpreting Brady. This order does not relieve any party of any other discovery obligation. The consequences for violating this order or the government's obligations under Brady may include sanctions, referral to a disciplinary authority, adverse jury instruction, exclusion of evidence, and dismissal of charges, among other consequences. (Apodaca, P)
Related: [-]