Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-00644
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 14, 2024 1:25 AM CST
Defendant
Iris Crystal Zarate-Gonzalez (1)
Represented By
John L. Williams
Law Office Of John L. Williams
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Adam R. Hines
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/14/2024 2:07 AM CST
Sunday, February 11, 2024
Arrest of Iris Crystal Zarate-Gonzalez (bg2)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Iris Crystal Zarate-Gonzalez by Judge Leon Schydlower. (mv)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Adam R. Hines appearing for USA. . Attorney Adam R. Hines added to party USA(pty:pla) (Hines, Adam)
Related: [-]
2 2 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower as to Iris Crystal Zarate-Gonzalez. (bg2)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Iris Crystal Zarate-Gonzalez. (bg2)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (bot4)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SETTING HEARING as to Iris Crystal Zarate-Gonzalez. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (bot4)
Related: [-]
6 6 Proceedings held before Judge Leon Schydlower:Initial Appearance as to Iris Crystal Zarate-Gonzalez held on 2/12/2024 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 2/15/2024 09:30AM before Judge Leon Schydlower, SPANISH Language Interpreter (T. Saenz) required as to Iris Crystal Zarate-Gonzalez (Court Reporter ERO.) (bot4)
Related: [-]