Washington Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-04035
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 13, 2024 11:29 PM PST
Defendant
Salvador Lopez-Guzman (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - YAK
Federal Defenders - Yak
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Todd Swensen
U S Attorney'S Office - Yak
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/14/2024 12:13 AM PST
Monday, February 12, 2024
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Salvador Lopez-Guzman (1). (MO, Courtroom Deputy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
3 3 Charges and Penalties as to Salvador Lopez-Guzman (1). (MO, Courtroom Deputy)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF HEARING - By Court as to Salvador Lopez-Guzman (1). Text entry; no PDF attached. Initial Appearance on Complaint set for 2/13/2024 at 2:00 PM in Yakima Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Alexander C Ekstrom. (MO, Courtroom Deputy)
Related: [-]