Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:David J Hale
Referred: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Case #: 4:24-cv-00018
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2024
Terminated:May 07, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 11, 2024 5:30 AM EDT
Plaintiff
John Michael Kehoe
Represented By
Lauren E. Freeman
Freeman Law PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey L. Freeman
Freeman Legal Group
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Ray Gillaspie
Terminated: 05/07/2024
Represented By
Melissa Norman Bork
Dentons Bingham Greenebaum Doll Llp - Louisville
contact info
Defendant
Ryan Hobby
Terminated: 05/07/2024
Represented By
Karey Lenee' Cain
Ziemer, Stayman, Weitzel & Shoulders, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kentucky Community and Technical College System
Terminated: 05/07/2024
Represented By
Melissa Norman Bork
Dentons Bingham Greenebaum Doll Llp - Louisville
contact info
Defendant
Madisonville Community and Technical College
Terminated: 05/07/2024
Defendant
Todd Smith
Terminated: 05/07/2024
Represented By
Melissa Norman Bork
Dentons Bingham Greenebaum Doll Llp - Louisville
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 05/07 4:50 PM
ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 5/7/2024: Kehoe's claims against the defendants are DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate Kentucky Community and Technical College System, Ray Gillaspie, Todd Smith, Madisonville Community and Technical College, and Ryan Hobby as defendants in the record of this matter. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. All claims having been resolved, this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice, CLOSED and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. cc: Counsel (DLW)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 05/06 12:14 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Michael Kehoe (Freeman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order Fri 05/03 12:07 PM
ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 5/2/2024: Kehoe SHALL FILE, within seven (7) days of entry of this Order, any notice of voluntary dismissal as to his claims against Madisonville Community and Technical College or otherwise clarify whether he intends to pursue his claims against MCTC. cc: Counsel (DLW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
13 13 2 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 05/01 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Michael Kehoe (Freeman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 05/01 10:38 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Michael Kehoe (Freeman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
11 11 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Tue 04/16 3:05 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Ryan Hobby (Cain, Karey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Memorandum in Support Brief,
Att: 2 17 pgs Exhibit 1 - DeMoisey v. Ostermiller,
Att: 3 1 pgs Proposed Order
Monday, April 15, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/15 5:15 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Ryan Hobby. (Cain, Karey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit 1 - Ltr to J. Poppe (1),
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit 2 - Ltr to J. Poppe (2),
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit 3 - Ltr to T. Smith (1),
Att: 4 4 pgs Exhibit 4 - Ltr to T. Smith (2)
9 9 motion Dismiss Mon 04/15 4:54 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Ray Gillaspie, Kentucky Community and Technical College System, Todd Smith (Bork, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 25 pgs Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 1 pgs Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
8 8 order Order - TEXT ONLY Tue 03/05 2:28 PM
TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 3/5/2024; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/05 10:53 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Michael Kehoe. All Defendants. (Freeman, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 02/28 10:20 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Michael Kehoe. Ryan Hobby waiver sent on 2/15/2024, answer due 4/15/2024. (Freeman, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/27 4:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Karey Lenee' Roy on behalf of Ryan Hobby (Roy, Karey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
4 4 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion) Thu 02/15 3:12 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by John Michael Kehoe. Amendment to1 Complaint, Correction of Division Assignment by John Michael Kehoe. (Freeman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 02/14 10:38 AM
Summons Issued as to Ray Gillaspie, Ryan Hobby, Kentucky Community and Technical College System, Madisonville Community and Technical College, and Todd Smith. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assignment Wed 02/14 10:37 AM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (MNM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/14 10:36 AM
COMPLAINT against Ray Gillaspie, Ryan Hobby, Kentucky Community and Technical College System, Madisonville Community and Technical College, and Todd Smith, filing fee $405, receipt number AKYWDC-3976076, filed by John Michael Kehoe. (MNM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Tendered