New York Northern District Court
Judge:Elizabeth C Coombe
Referred: Miroslav Lovric
Case #: 3:24-cv-00220
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2024
Last checked: Monday Aug 12, 2024 4:21 AM EDT
Defendant
Aaron Hine
Defendant
Steven Hine
Defendant
Susan Sanchez
Defendant
Carol Scherer
Plaintiff
Blue Castle (Cayman) LTD
Represented By
Alan H. Weinreb
Margolin, Weinreb & Nierer, LLP
contact info

GPO Feb 26 2025
MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion, Dkt. No. 11, is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that if Plaintiff seeks to renew its motion for default judgment, it must file a renewed motion within 30 days of the date of this Memorandum-Decision and Order. If Plaintiff concludes that it is unable to proceed it must notify the Court within the same 30-day deadline; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall serve a copy of this Memorandum-Decision and Order on the parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Elizabeth C. Coombe on 2/26/2025. (kmc)

Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
18 18 motion Default Judgment Wed 04/30 12:16 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to all Defendants Renewed Motion for Default Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale filed by Blue Castle (Cayman) LTD. Motion returnable before Judge Elizabeth C. Coombe Response to Motion due by 5/21/2025. Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/28/2025 (Weinreb, Alan) Modified on 4/30/2025 to notate the motion is returnable before Judge Coombe. (kmc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support with Exhibits,
Att: 2 Memorandum of Law in Support,
Att: 3 Proposed Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale Order,
Att: 4 Affidavit of Service
Friday, March 28, 2025
17 17 order Order on Letter Request Fri 03/28 10:54 AM
TEXT ORDER: Granting16 Letter Request. Plaintiff's renewed motion for default judgment is to be filed on or before 4/30/2025. SO ORDERED by U.S. District Judge Elizabeth C. Coombe on 3/28/2025. (kmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
16 16 motion Letter Request/Motion Wed 03/26 5:34 PM
First Letter Motion from Plaintiff for Blue Castle (Cayman) LTD requesting extension of the deadline to file the renewal motion for default judgment submitted to Judge Elizabeth C. Coombe . (Weinreb, Alan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
15 15 14 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Wed 02/26 2:54 PM
MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion, Dkt. No.11 , is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that if Plaintiff seeks to renew its motion for default judgment, it must file a renewed motion within 30 days of the date of this Memorandum-Decision and Order. If Plaintiff concludes that it is unable to proceed it must notify the Court within the same 30-day deadline; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall serve a copy of this Memorandum-Decision and Order on the parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Elizabeth C. Coombe on 2/26/2025. (kmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
14 14 order Order on Letter Request Wed 01/29 1:40 PM
TEXT ORDER re13 Plaintiff's letter motion: This case has been recently reassigned from Judge Nardacci and the11 Motion for Default Judgment will be reviewed in due course. SO ORDERED by Elizabeth C. Coombe on 1/29/2025. (kmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
13 13 motion Letter Request/Motion Wed 01/22 4:17 PM
Letter Motion from Plaintiff's counsel for Blue Castle (Cayman) LTD requesting / respectfully inquiring about the status of Plaintiffs Motion for Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale, filed on July 19, 2024 [Docket No. 11] submitted to Judge Elizabeth C. Coombe . (Weinreb, Alan)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
12 12 order Order Reassigning Case Fri 01/17 2:40 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge Elizabeth C. Coombe for all further proceedings. U.S. District Judge Anne M. Nardacci no longer assigned to case. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 1/17/2025. (kmc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
misc Clerk Correction of Docket Entry Tue 07/23 10:47 AM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY RE:11 Motion for Default Judgment: A redacted copy of attachment #11 -4 - Exhibit 'A' has been uploaded and attached to DE #11 . The unredacted copy of the Exhibit is now permanently restricted pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 5.2 and NYND Local Rule 5.2. (kck)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
misc Text Notice of Filing Deficiency Mon 07/22 2:35 PM
TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY regarding the11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Carol Scherer, Susan Sanchez, Steven Hine and Aaron Hine filed by Blue Castle (Cayman) LTD. Motion returnable before Judge Anne M. Nardacci NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Counsel has submitted documents that are not in compliance with redaction requirements pursuant to Federal and NYND Local Rules 5.2 Personal Privacy Protection and General Order 22, Section 11.2. This document has been TEMPORARILY RESTRICTED. Counsel is directed to make the appropriate redactions to the above referenced document and electronically file the redacted document within 3 days of this notice using the event CORRECTED DOCUMENT(S) found under Other Filings and reference this case number. Do NOT use any other event to file your corrected document. Failure to file a redacted document by the deadline will result in the unredacted document referenced above being unrestricted. Counsel and the parties are cautioned that failure to redact these personal identifiers may subject them to the Courts full disciplinary power pursuant to NYND Local Rule 5.2. **Exhibit A (document no. 11-4), contains a date of birth on page 88 of the filing. Please redact that page and electronically file the full redacted version of Exhibit A (all 93 pages of the exhibit) to the corrected document case. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 7/25/2024 (see)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
11 11 2 pgs motion Default Judgment Fri 07/19 4:52 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Carol Scherer, Susan Sanchez, Steven Hine and Aaron Hine filed by Blue Castle (Cayman) LTD. Motion returnable before Judge Anne M. Nardacci Response to Motion due by 8/9/2024. Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/16/2024 (Weinreb, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Regularity in Support of Default Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale,
Att: 2 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale,
Att: 3 proposed Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale Order,
Att: 4 Exhibit 'A',
Att: 5 Exhibit 'B',
Att: 6 Exhibit 'C',
Att: 7 Affidavit of Service
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
10 10 order Clerks Entry of Default Wed 05/29 12:00 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Carol Scherer, Susan Sanchez, Aaron Hine and Steven Hine re9 Request for Entry of Default. (kck)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Request for Entry of Default Wed 05/29 10:35 AM
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Aaron Hine, Steven Hine, Susan Sanchez, Carol Scherer by Blue Castle (Cayman) LTD. (Weinreb, Alan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed (for non-Pro Se cases only) Wed 05/15 10:19 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blue Castle (Cayman) LTD. Susan Sanchez served on 5/6/2024, answer due 5/28/2024. (Weinreb, Alan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed (for non-Pro Se cases only) Tue 03/19 11:38 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blue Castle (Cayman) LTD. Steven Hine served on 2/29/2024, answer due 3/21/2024. (Weinreb, Alan)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed (for non-Pro Se cases only) Tue 03/19 11:37 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blue Castle (Cayman) LTD. Carol Scherer served on 2/29/2024, answer due 3/21/2024. (Weinreb, Alan)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed (for non-Pro Se cases only) Tue 03/19 11:37 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blue Castle (Cayman) LTD. Aaron Hine served on 2/26/2024, answer due 3/18/2024. (Weinreb, Alan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
4 4 misc Affidavit Wed 02/14 1:50 PM
AFFIDAVIT Certificate of Merit Affirmation Pursuant to CPLR 3012-b and Section Nine-X of the Banking Law by Blue Castle (Cayman) LTD. (Weinreb, Alan)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/14 1:39 PM
FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blue Castle (Cayman) LTD. (kck)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 02/14 1:38 PM
Summons Issued as to Carol Scherer, Susan Sanchez, Steven Hine and Aaron Hine.(kck)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Issued as to Susan Sanchez,
Att: 2 Summons Issued as to Steven Hine,
Att: 3 Summons Issued as to Aaron Hine
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/14 1:32 PM
COMPLAINT against Carol Scherer, Susan Sanchez, Steven Hine and Aaron Hine, (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6617847) filed by Blue Castle (Cayman) LTD. (kck)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Exhibit F,
Att: 2 Exhibit - N.Y. RPAPL 1320 Notice,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet