Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-13499

Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Natalie M Cox
Case #: 2:24-ap-01011
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
CELESTE K. INTERRANTE
11862 PARTENIO COURT
LAS VEGAS, NV 89183
Represented By
CELESTE K. INTERRANTE
contact info
Plaintiff
TOUGH TURTLE TURF, LLC
ATTN: BLAKELEY E. GRIFFITH, ESQ. 3883 HOWARD HUGHES PKWY STE 1100
LAS VEGAS, NV 89169
Represented By
BLAKELEY E. GRIFFITH
Snell & Wilmer L.L.P.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Friday, March 21, 2025
56 56 court BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Fri 03/21 9:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/21/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 55 Document Forwarded to BNC for Noticing
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
55 55 court Document Forwarded to BNC for Noticing (BNC-Adv) Wed 03/19 8:47 AM
Clerk Forwarded Document to BNC for Noticing. Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 51 Order.
54 54 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Trial-Adv) Wed 03/19 8:45 AM
Trial Scheduled/Rescheduled. Day: 2. Trial date set for 10/2/2025 at 09:30 AM at NMC-Courtroom 3, Foley Federal Bldg. (mmm)
Related: [-]
53 53 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Trial-Adv) Wed 03/19 8:44 AM
Trial Scheduled/Rescheduled. Day: 1. Trial date set for 10/1/2025 at 09:30 AM at NMC-Courtroom 3, Foley Federal Bldg. (mmm)
Related: [-]
52 52 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv) Wed 03/19 8:40 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/11/2025 at 09:30 AM at NMC Zoom Teleconference Line. Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff TOUGH TURTLE TURF, LLC.
51 51 4 pgs orderad Order (generic) (Adv) Wed 03/19 8:34 AM
Order Regarding Pretrial and Trial Matters Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff TOUGH TURTLE TURF, LLC.