New York Southern District Court
Judge:Edgardo Ramos
Case #: 1:24-cv-01092
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation (Monopolizing Trade)
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2024
Terminated:Jun 07, 2024
Last checked: Monday Aug 12, 2024 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Bridgestone Americas, Inc.
Defendant
Bridgestone Corporation
Defendant
Compagnie Generale Des Etablissements
Defendant
Continental Aktiengesellschaft
Defendant
Continental Tire The Americas, LLC
Defendant
Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Defendant
Michelin North America, Inc.
Defendant
Nokian Tyres Inc.
Defendant
Nokian Tyres PLC
Defendant
Nokian Tyres U.S. Operations LLC
Defendant
Pirelli & C. S.P.A.
Defendant
Pirelli Tire, LLC
Represented By
Robert A. Milne
White & Case Llp (ny)
contact info
J. Mark Gidley
White & Case Llp (dc)
contact info
Defendant
Does 1-100
Plaintiff
Michele Edwards
Represented By
Michelle C. Clerkin
Spiro Harrison & Nelson
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, June 20, 2024
misc Received Acknowledgment (Electronic Case Transfer) Thu 06/20 4:35 PM
Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Northern District of Ohio acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 5:24-rt-55016, filed on 06/20/2024..(bc)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
44 44 transfer MDL Transfer Out Tue 06/18 2:48 PM
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Northern District of Ohio.(vba)
Related: [-]
43 43 transfer MDL Conditional Transfer Out Order Tue 06/18 2:47 PM
CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of Ohio. (Signed by MDL Panel on 6/7/2024) (vba)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
42 42 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 04/26 11:47 AM
ORDER granting41 Letter Motion for Extension of TimeThe Court will so order the parties' stipulation, as set forth in paragraph 12 of this letter motion. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/26/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
41 41 motion Extension of Time Fri 04/26 9:42 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants Bridgestone Americas, Inc., Continental Tire the Americas, LLC, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Michelin North America, Inc., Nokian Tyres Inc., Nokian Tyres U.S. Operations LLC, and Pirelli Tire LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from J. Mark Gidley dated April 26, 2024. Document filed by Pirelli Tire, LLC..(Gidley, J. Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
40 40 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 03/12 1:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Michelin North America, Inc. served on 3/8/2024, answer due 5/7/2024. Service was accepted by Carlos Doe. Document filed by Michele Edwards..(Clerkin, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
39 39 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 03/08 5:13 PM
ORDER: granting38 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The requesting Defendant's time to respond to the complaint is extended to May 7, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/08/2024) (ama)
Related: [-]
38 38 motion Extension of Time Fri 03/08 1:35 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants The Goodyear Tires & Rubber Company, Bridgestone Americas, Inc., Michelin North America, Inc., Nokian Tyres U.S. Operations LLC, Nokian Tyres Inc., Pirelli Tire LLC, and Continental Tire the Americas, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to and including May 7, 2024 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Robert Milne dated March 8, 2024. Document filed by Pirelli Tire, LLC..(Milne, Robert)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/08 1:26 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Pirelli North America, Inc. for Pirelli Tire, LLC. Document filed by Pirelli Tire, LLC..(Gidley, John)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/08 1:20 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert A. Milne on behalf of Pirelli Tire, LLC..(Milne, Robert)
Related: [-]
35 35 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/08 1:16 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Mark Gidley on behalf of Pirelli Tire, LLC..(Gidley, John)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 03/08 5:15 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Bridgestone Americas, Inc. answer due 5/7/2024; Continental Tire The Americas, LLC answer due 5/7/2024; Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company answer due 5/7/2024; Michelin North America, Inc. answer due 5/7/2024; Nokian Tyres Inc. answer due 5/7/2024; Nokian Tyres U.S. Operations LLC answer due 5/7/2024; Pirelli & C. S.P.A. answer due 5/7/2024. (ama)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
34 34 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 03/06 2:06 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Nokian Tyres U.S. Operations LLC served on 2/20/2024, answer due 3/12/2024. Service was accepted by Samantha Sutton. Document filed by Michele Edwards..(Clerkin, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
33 33 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Mon 02/26 11:38 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Bridgestone Americas, Inc. served on 2/20/2024, answer due 3/12/2024. Service was accepted by Marcia Wyatt. Document filed by Michele Edwards..(Clerkin, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
32 32 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 02/22 4:21 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Continental Tire The Americas, LLC served on 2/20/2024, answer due 3/12/2024. Service was accepted by Daylen Platt. Document filed by Michele Edwards..(Clerkin, Michelle)
Related: [-]
31 31 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 02/22 12:51 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Nokian Tyres Inc. served on 2/19/2024, answer due 3/11/2024. Service was accepted by Robin Hutt-Banks. Document filed by Michele Edwards..(Clerkin, Michelle)
Related: [-]
30 30 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 02/22 12:48 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company served on 2/20/2024, answer due 3/12/2024. Service was accepted by Stephanie Gibson. Document filed by Michele Edwards..(Clerkin, Michelle)
Related: [-]
29 29 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 02/22 12:45 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Pirelli Tire, LLC served on 2/19/2024, answer due 3/11/2024. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares. Document filed by Michele Edwards..(Clerkin, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
utility Case Accepted as Related Fri 02/16 1:58 PM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:24-cv-00881-ER. Notice of Assignment to follow. (tro)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Fri 02/16 2:00 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(tro)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 02/16 2:00 PM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (tro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
28 28 service Summons Issued Thu 02/15 4:16 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Continental Tire The Americas, LLC..(pc)
Related: [-]
27 27 service Summons Issued Thu 02/15 4:15 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Compagnie Generale Des Etablissements..(pc)
Related: [-]
26 26 service Summons Issued Thu 02/15 4:15 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Continental Aktiengesellschaft..(pc)
Related: [-]
25 25 service Summons Issued Thu 02/15 4:14 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pirelli & C. S.P.A...(pc)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Summons Issued Thu 02/15 4:14 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michelin North America, Inc...(pc)
Related: [-]
23 23 service Summons Issued Thu 02/15 4:13 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nokian Tyres Inc...(pc)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Summons Issued Thu 02/15 4:13 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nokian Tyres U.S. Operations LLC..(pc)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Summons Issued Thu 02/15 4:12 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nokian Tyres PLC..(pc)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Summons Issued Thu 02/15 4:11 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company..(pc)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Summons Issued Thu 02/15 4:11 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pirelli Tire, LLC..(pc)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Issued Thu 02/15 4:10 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bridgestone Americas, Inc...(pc)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Issued Thu 02/15 4:03 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bridgestone Corporation..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 02/15 3:04 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 02/15 3:05 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar Thu 02/15 3:05 PM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Edgardo Ramos as possibly related to 24cv881 (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 02/15 3:05 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michelle C. Clerkin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Michele Edwards, DOES 1-100. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 02/15 3:05 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michelle C. Clerkin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
16 16 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 02/14 5:36 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pirelli Tire LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michele Edwards..(Clerkin, Michelle)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 02/14 5:35 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bridgestone Americas, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michele Edwards..(Clerkin, Michelle)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 02/14 5:34 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pirelli & C. S.P.A., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michele Edwards..(Clerkin, Michelle)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 02/14 5:33 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nokian Tyres U.S. Operations LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michele Edwards..(Clerkin, Michelle)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 02/14 5:32 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nokian Tyres PLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michele Edwards..(Clerkin, Michelle)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 02/14 5:30 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michelin North America, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michele Edwards..(Clerkin, Michelle)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 02/14 5:29 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nokian Tyres Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michele Edwards..(Clerkin, Michelle)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 02/14 5:27 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michele Edwards..(Clerkin, Michelle)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 02/14 5:26 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Continental Tire the Americas, LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michele Edwards..(Clerkin, Michelle)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 02/14 5:24 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Continental Akiengesellschaft, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michele Edwards..(Clerkin, Michelle)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 02/14 5:23 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bridgestone Corporation, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michele Edwards..(Clerkin, Michelle)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 02/14 5:21 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Compagnie Generale des Etablissements, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michele Edwards..(Clerkin, Michelle)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/14 5:17 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Michele Edwards..(Clerkin, Michelle)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs misc Statement of Relatedness Wed 02/14 5:15 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:24-cv-00881. Document filed by Michele Edwards..(Clerkin, Michelle)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 02/14 5:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Clerkin, Michelle)
Related: [-]
1 1 36 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 02/14 5:08 PM
COMPLAINT against DOES 1-100, Bridgestone Americas, Inc., Bridgestone Corporation, Compagnie Generale Des Etablissements, Continental Aktiengesellschaft, Continental Tire The Americas, LLC, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Michelin North America, Inc., Nokian Tyres Inc., Nokian Tyres PLC, Nokian Tyres U.S. Operations LLC, Pirelli & C. S.P.A., Pirelli Tire, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28948589)Document filed by Michele Edwards..(Clerkin, Michelle)
Related: [-]