Oregon District Court
Judge:Stacie F Beckerman
Case #: 3:24-cv-00296
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2024
Terminated:Apr 10, 2025
Case in other court:Multnomah County Circuit Court, 24CV04764
Last checked: Monday Aug 12, 2024 1:34 AM PDT
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Safeway, Inc.
Represented By
James L. Hiller
Hitt Hiller Monfils Williams LLP
contact info
Alison Rachel Barber
Hitt Hiller Monfils Williams
contact info
Brian B. Williams
Hitt Hiller Monfils Williams LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Goddeua Calhoun
10923 N. Moore Ave.
Portland, OR 97217
Represented By
Mark Gillis McDougal
Kafoury & Mcdougal
contact info
Jason L. Kafoury
Kafoury & Mcdougal
contact info
Gregory Kafoury
Kafoury & Mcdougal
contact info
Adam A. Kiel
Kafoury & Mcdougal
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
22 22 order Dismissal -Terminate Case Thu 04/10 2:12 PM
Order of Dismissal. In accord with the parties' FRCP 41 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice and Without Costs (ECF No.21 ), this case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Deposited in outgoing mail to Plaintiff on 4/10/2025.) (gw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
21 21 oth_doc Stipulation Wed 04/09 5:13 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice and without cost by Safeway, Inc.. Filed by Safeway, Inc.. (Barber, Alison)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
20 20 order Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines Tue 12/31 4:40 PM
ORDER: Granting Defendant's Motion to Extend Deadlines (ECF No.19 ). Discovery is to be completed by 3/31/2025. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/31/2025. Dispositive Motions are due by 5/1/2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Deposited in outgoing mail to Plaintiff on 1/2/2025.) (gw)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines Tue 12/31 10:05 AM
Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by Safeway, Inc.. (Barber, Alison)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
18 18 service Clerks Notice of Mailing Fri 11/01 3:10 PM
Clerk's Notice via mail and e-mail to Goddeua Calhoun of Discovery Hearing minutes 17 . (gw)
Related: [-]
17 17 minute Discovery Hearing Fri 11/01 2:33 PM
MINUTES of Proceedings: Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman by telephone on 11/1/2024. Plaintiff agrees to respond to discovery requests by e-mail by the end of today, Friday, 11/1/2024. Pro se plaintiff Goddeua Calhoun present. Alison Rachel Barber present as counsel for defendant. Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway, (503) 326-8188. Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman presiding. (gw)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
16 16 order 1 - Scheduling Fri 10/25 3:54 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, RESETTING the Discovery Hearing from 10/28/2024 to Friday, 11/1/2024, at 9:30 AM in Portland by telephone before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. The conference call numbers remain the same. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Plaintiff notified by e-mail, telephone and mail on 10/25/2024.) (gw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
15 15 order 1 - Scheduling Thu 10/24 3:23 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. At the request of defense counsel (by e-mail dated 10/22/2024) and with agreement of Plaintiff, SETTING a Discovery Hearing for Monday, 10/28/2024, at 3:30 PM in Portland by telephone before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. Conference call information to follow by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Plaintiff notified by e-mail and telephone on 10/24/2024.) (gw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
14 14 limited Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Wed 07/31 4:08 PM
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
service Clerks Notice of Mailing Tue 07/30 12:31 PM
Clerk's Notice of Mailing on 7/29/2024 to Goddeua Calhoun regarding Minutes of Rule 16 Conference, ECF12 . (mja)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
12 12 minute Rule 16 Conference Mon 07/29 4:41 PM
MINUTES of Proceedings: Rule 16 Conference held before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman by telephone on 7/29/2024. ORDER SETTING the following case management schedule: Initial Discovery to be completed by 12/31/2024. Joint Alternative Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/31/2024. Dispositive Motions are due by 1/31/2025. ORDER: Striking Pretrial Order Deadline. The parties may file written consents to proceed before a magistrate judge at any time, but the Court recommends the parties file consent forms before any dispositive motions (i.e., motion to dismiss, motion for summary judgment) hearing. (The consent form is attached.) For more information regarding the role of magistrate judges and consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction, see ord.uscourts.gov/consent. The Court advises the parties that they must schedule a telephone conference with Judge Beckerman before filing any discovery motion. If a discovery dispute arises, the party requesting relief should e-mail a summary of the dispute to SBpropdoc@ord.uscourts.gov. Goddeua Calhoun present pro se for Plaintiff. Brian B. Williams present as counsel for Defendant. Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman presiding. (mja)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
order 1 - Scheduling Mon 07/15 4:13 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Setting a Rule 16 Conference for Monday, July 29, 2024, at 3:00 PM by telephone. (Conference call information to follow by separate sealed entry.) Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer before the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If the parties plan to present a proposed schedule, they should e-mail the schedule to giselle_williams@ord.uscourts.gov, by noon on Friday, July 26, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
Related: [-]
service Clerks Notice of Mailing Mon 07/15 4:22 PM
Clerk's Notice of Mailings to Plaintiff at 10923 N. Moore Ave., Portland, OR 97217; and 6024 NE Simpson St., Portland, OR 97218, of Scheduling Order 10 and Conference Call Access Information. (gw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal Tue 07/02 1:10 PM
Defendant's Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal Related [+] with Jury Demand . Filed by Safeway, Inc.. (Barber, Alison)
Related: [-] .1
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
7 7 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel Tue 06/11 12:17 PM
ORDER: For the reasons stated, the Court DENIES Plaintiff's motion for appointment of pro bono counsel (ECF No.6 ), with leave to renew at a later stage of this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 6/11/2024 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Copy of order mailed to Plaintiff on 6/11/2024.) (gw)
Related: [-]
order 1 - Scheduling Tue 06/11 12:24 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Defendant must respond to the complaint by July 2, 2024. The Court will schedule a Rule 16 conference after Defendant files an answer. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. ( Copy of order mailed to Plaintiff on 6/11/2024. ) (gw)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
6 6 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 05/31 11:56 AM
Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Goddeua Calhoun. (dino)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
4 4 motion Withdraw Fri 02/23 9:26 AM
Unopposed Motion to Withdraw . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kiel, Adam)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Withdraw Fri 02/23 9:57 AM
ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff (ECF No.4 ). The law firm of Kafoury & McDougal is relieved of its duties as attorney of record for the plaintiff. Case management deadlines are stayed to allow Plaintiff to associate new counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Copy of order mailed to Plaintiff on 2/23/2024) (gw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
3 3 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/14 2:17 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Safeway, Inc.. (Barber, Alison)
Related: [-]
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Wed 02/14 12:29 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 6/13/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/15/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 7/15/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gd)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 02/14 11:29 AM
Notice of Removal of Case Number 24CV04764 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9278040 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Safeway Inc.. (Barber, Alison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet