Texas Western District Court
Judge:Fred Biery
Referred: Richard B Farrer
Case #: 5:24-cv-00152
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2024
Terminated:Mar 13, 2025
Last checked: Monday Aug 12, 2024 3:43 AM CDT
Counter Defendant
Arch Insurance Company
Represented By
Mary J. Ibarra-Myers
Chasnoff, Mungia, Valkenaar, Pepping & Stribling, LLP
contact info
Barry A. Chasnoff
Chasnoff Mungia Valkenaar Pepping & Stribling LLP
contact info
Jacob Litzenberger
Chasnoff, Mungia, Valkenaar, Pepping & Stribling, LLP
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
Rita Candelario
Represented By
Jorge A. Herrera
The Herrera Law Firm, Inc.
contact info
Kirk L. Pittard
Durham, Pittard & Spalding, LLP
contact info
Steve Alfonso Chiscano
Gonzalez, Chiscano, Angulo & Kasson, P.C.
contact info
Nadeen Abou-Hossa
Gonzalez Chiscano Angulo & Kasson, PC
contact info
Defendant
Rita Candelario
2669 Heritage Court
Las Vegas, NV 89121
Represented By
Jorge A. Herrera
The Herrera Law Firm, Inc.
contact info
Kirk L. Pittard
Durham, Pittard & Spalding, LLP
contact info
Steve Alfonso Chiscano
Gonzalez, Chiscano, Angulo & Kasson, P.C.
contact info
Nadeen Abou-Hossa
Gonzalez Chiscano Angulo & Kasson, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Arch Insurance Company
Represented By
Mary J. Ibarra-Myers
Chasnoff, Mungia, Valkenaar, Pepping & Stribling, LLP
contact info
Barry A. Chasnoff
Chasnoff Mungia Valkenaar Pepping & Stribling LLP
contact info
Jacob Litzenberger
Chasnoff, Mungia, Valkenaar, Pepping & Stribling, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Javier Herrera
Terminated: 04/05/2024
The Herrera Law Firm 1800 W Commerce St
San Antonio, TX 78207
Represented By
Steve Alfonso Chiscano
Gonzalez, Chiscano, Angulo & Kasson, P.C.
contact info

GPO Nov 21 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 6 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Javier Herrera, Rita Candelario. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
GPO Jan 13 2025
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 28 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, March 13, 2025
35 35 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 03/13 3:26 PM
ORDER GRANTING34 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Candelarios Motion toVoluntarilyDismiss her Counterclaim Against Arch Insurance Company (docket no. 34) is GRANTEDsuch that Defendants counterclaim against Plaintiff is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that remaining motions pendingwith the Court, if any, are Dismissed as Moot and this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
Related: [-]
utility Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Thu 03/13 3:27 PM
CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
34 34 motion Dismiss Mon 02/24 2:57 PM
MOTION to Dismiss her Counterclaim Against Arch Insurance Company by Rita Candelario.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Chiscano, Steve)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
33 33 2 pgs order Order Adopting/Rejecting Report and Recommendations Wed 01/15 9:24 AM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for28 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
32 32 misc Response Fri 12/20 3:00 PM
RESPONSE Candelario's Response to Arch's Objection to Magistrate Judge Farrer's Report & Recommendation to31 Miscellaneous Objection, by Rita Candelario. (Chiscano, Steve)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
31 31 respoth Miscellaneous Objection Fri 12/06 8:30 PM
Miscellaneous Objection to US Magistrate Judge's 11.21.2024 Recommendation and Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Petition by Arch Insurance Company.(Ibarra-Myers, Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit
Friday, November 22, 2024
30 30 respm Response to Motion Fri 11/22 4:43 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Rita Candelario, re26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Arch Insurance Company(Chiscano, Steve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
29 29 respm Response to Motion Fri 11/22 4:17 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Arch Insurance Company, re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Rita Candelario(Ibarra-Myers, Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Thursday, November 21, 2024
28 28 misc Report and Recommendations Fri 11/22 2:52 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re6 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Javier Herrera, Rita Candelario. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
27 27 notice Notice Tue 11/12 8:58 AM
NOTICE of Vacation for Attorney Steve Chiscano by Rita Candelario (Gonzalez, Henry)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
26 26 motion Dismiss Fri 11/08 10:36 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Arch Insurance Company.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Chasnoff, Barry)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Summary Judgment Fri 11/08 2:57 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Rita Candelario.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Gonzalez, Henry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Candelario's Proposed Final Judgment/Order Granting Defendant Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. A - Plaintiff's Petition,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. B - Email from Meyers,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. C - 12.20.2023 Email,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. D - 12.21.23 Email,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. E - Defs' JMTS,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. F - Email 12.20.23,
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex. G - Javier Herrera Affidavit
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 11/05 9:25 AM
Text Order GRANTING AS UNOPPOSED24 Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Hearing entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. The motion hearing scheduled to take place on November 8, 2024, will be re-scheduled by separate order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cslc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
24 24 motion Continue Mon 11/04 1:17 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Arch Insurance Company.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Ibarra-Myers, Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 31, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion Hearings Thu 10/31 9:37 AM
ORDER re6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Javier Herrera, Rita Candelario, Set Motion Hearing for6 MOTION to Dismiss ( Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2024 1:00 PM before Judge Richard B. Farrer,). Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
order Order on Motion to be Excused from ADR/Mediation Thu 10/24 3:10 PM
Text Order GRANTING as unopposed22 Motion to be Excused from ADR/Mediation entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (RBF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
22 22 motion Excused from ADR/Mediation Thu 10/03 2:55 PM
MOTION to be Excused from ADR/Mediation by Arch Insurance Company.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Ibarra-Myers, Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
21 21 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Wed 08/07 5:56 PM
Defendant Rita Candelario's ANSWER to12 Amended Complaint Subject to Her 12(B) Motion to Dismiss , COUNTERCLAIM against Arch Insurance Company by Rita Candelario.(Gonzalez, Henry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
20 20 order Scheduling Order Wed 06/12 12:27 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 12/2/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 8/7/2024, Discovery due by 10/17/2024, Motions due by 11/8/2024,. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Response Tue 06/11 6:57 PM
RESPONSE to Judge Farrer's to18 Order to Show Cause,, by Arch Insurance Company. (Ibarra-Myers, Mary)
Related: [-]
18 18 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 06/11 3:51 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-- Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause to explain and justify Plaintiffsabsence at the Initial Pretrial Conference and failure to comply with the Courts April 3, 2024 Order. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file with the Court a Response to this Show Cause Order within 30 days from the date of this Order. Once the Court has reviewed that Response, it will issue further appropriate Orders and may impose appropriate sanctions without further warning. as to Arch Insurance Company.. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
Related: [-]
17 17 minutes Pretrial Conference Tue 06/11 3:50 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard B. Farrer: Pretrial Conference held on 6/11/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(mgr)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
16 16 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Fri 06/07 9:23 AM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Joint Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 Report by Rita Candelario, Javier Herrera. (Chiscano, Steve)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order Mon 06/03 4:54 PM
SECOND ORDER REGARDING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE MATERIALS--The parties are once again ORDERED to confer and file their joint 26(f) report as already required by the prior Order, Dkt. No. 10, and the deadline for filing that report is extended to June 7, 2024, at 12:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
14 14 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 05/21 4:19 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Rita Candelario, Javier Herrera. (Chiscano, Steve)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
13 13 respm Response to Motion Fri 04/05 9:12 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Arch Insurance Company, re6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Javier Herrera, Defendant Rita Candelario (Ibarra-Myers, Mary)
Related: [-]
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 04/05 3:07 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rita Candelario amending, filed by Arch Insurance Company.(Ibarra-Myers, Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Rule 11 Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Signed acceptance
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 04/05 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Arch Insurance Company (Ibarra-Myers, Mary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
10 10 10 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/03 2:45 PM
ORDER REGARDING CERTAIN PRETRIAL MATTERS, ( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 5/31/2024,, Initial Pretrial Conference set Via Zoom for 6/11/2024 02:00 PM before Judge Richard B. Farrer,). Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 03/25 11:15 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. Signed by Judge Fred Biery.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/25 11:05 AM
COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY AND OTHER MATTERS. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
Related: [-]
7 7 7 pgs order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Notice of Right to Consent to Magistrate Trial Mon 03/25 11:02 AM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
6 6 motion Dismiss Fri 03/22 5:10 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Rita Candelario, Javier Herrera.(Chiscano, Steve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/12 5:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arch Insurance Company. Rita Candelario served on 3/4/2024, answer due 3/25/2024. (Ibarra-Myers, Mary)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/12 5:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arch Insurance Company. Javier Herrera served on 3/4/2024, answer due 3/25/2024. (Ibarra-Myers, Mary)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 02/23 1:32 PM
Summons Issued as to Rita Candelario, Javier Herrera. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 02/22 12:57 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Arch Insurance Company. Summons Herrera and Candelario (Ibarra-Myers, Mary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 02/14 3:36 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18418327). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Arch Insurance Company.(Chasnoff, Barry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 02/15 10:27 AM
Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rqr)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Thu 02/15 10:28 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (rqr)
Related: [-]