Texas Western District Court
Judge:Xavier Rodriguez
Case #: 5:24-cv-00153
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2024
Terminated:Apr 04, 2025
Last checked: Monday Aug 12, 2024 3:43 AM CDT
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC,
Represented By
Jibril Ahman Greene
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
QUINTON BARRY LOWE
Jones Day
contact info
Chance B. McCraw
Jones Day
contact info
Rogelio Reyes
Jones Day
contact info
Defendant
LoanCare, LLC
Represented By
Ethan G. Ostroff
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
William Van Hooser
Represented By
Shawn Jaffer
Jaffer & Associates PLLC
contact info
Stephen Thomas Jones
Jaffer & Associates PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 31 minutes ago
Monday, April 07, 2025
51 51 order Judgment Mon 04/07 3:08 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (vl)
Related: [-]
50 50 1 pgs order Order Mon 04/07 3:07 PM
ORDER-- The parties have stipulated to the dismissal of all claims WITH PREJUDICE. Having considered the Stipulations, the Court ACCEPTS and ACKNOWLEDGES that all claims asserted in the above-captioned matter are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party is to bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys fees. A final judgment will issue pursuant to Rule 58. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case.. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (vl)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
49 49 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 04/04 8:31 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by William Van Hooser.(Jones, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
48 48 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 04/02 5:52 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Loancare, LLC by William Van Hooser. (Hersh, Heather)
Related: [-]