Hawaii District Court
Judge:Derrick K Watson
Referred: Rom Trader
Case #: 1:24-cv-00069
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2024
Terminated:Apr 10, 2024
Petitioner
Kaniu Huihui
Respondent
Shikha Dosanj

GPO Apr 10 2024
ORDER DISMISSING PETITION UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 2241 FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS re 1 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 4/10/2024. (eta)

Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM HST
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
7 7 order Judgment - Clerk Wed 04/10 10:07 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 4/10/2024 pursuant to ECF No.6 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 2241 FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. (eta)
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs order Order Wed 04/10 9:59 AM
ORDER DISMISSING PETITION UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 2241 FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS re1 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 4/10/2024. (eta)
Related: [-]
misc Court's Certificate of Service Wed 04/10 10:09 AM
COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of6 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 2241 FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS and7 Clerk's Judgment has been served by First Class Mail to Kanui Huihui at the address of record on April 10, 2024. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (eta)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
5 5 answer Response to Habeas Petition Mon 03/18 2:51 PM
Respondents Warden Shikha Dosanjs and Federal Detention Center Honolulus Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241 [ECF NO. 1]; Declaration of Jessica Schlesinger; Exhibits A B; COS RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Shikha Dosanj.(Weinstein, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jessica Schlesinger,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
4 4 minutes Link Wed 02/28 10:01 AM
EO: On February 14, 2024, the Court received pro se Petitioner Kaniu Huihui's "Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus U.S.C. § 2241 Seeking an Order [Directing] the Bureau of Prisons to Correct First Step Act Credits ('FSA') Earned Time Credits ('ETC')" [ECF No. 1]. The Court received the associated filing fee on February 27, 2024 [ECF No. 3]. The government is ORDERED to file an Answer to the Petition on or before March 21, 2024, pursuant to Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Petitioner may file an optional Reply on or before April 4, 2024. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this Entering Order and the Petition on the United States Attorney's Office for the District of Hawaii. IT IS SO ORDERED. (CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON) (tyk) COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
Related: [-]
misc Court's Certificate of Service Wed 02/28 11:05 AM
COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and 4 Entering Order has been served through interoffice delivery to the U.S. Attorney's Office for the District of Hawaii on February 28, 2024. A copy of 4 Entering Order shall be served by First Class Mail to Kaniu Huihui at the address of record on February 28, 2024. (tyk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
3 3 misc Filing Fee Received Tue 02/27 3:53 PM
Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 2719 re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (eta)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
2 2 2 pgs order Order Wed 02/14 1:02 PM
HABEAS DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 2/14/2024. (eta)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Wed 02/14 1:00 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus U.S.C. Section 2241 Seeking an Order Direction the Bureau of Prisons to Correct First Step Act Credits ("FSA") Earned Time Credits ("ETC") - filed by Kaniu Huihui.(eta)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Documentation
misc Court's Certificate of Service Wed 02/14 1:05 PM
COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of2 HABEAS DEFICIENCY ORDER has been served by First Class Mail to Kaniu Huihiu at the address of record on February 14, 2024. A file-stamped copy of1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and a blank Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner and its instructions were included in the mailing to Petitioner. (eta)
Related: [-]