Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00012
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 15, 2024 2:29 AM EST
Defendant
William Joseph Timothy (1)
Represented By
Douglas Molloy
Molloy Law, LLC
contact info
James Lappan
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Simon R. Eth
Us Attorney'S Office - Flm
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/15/2024 3:11 AM EST
Monday, January 08, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to William Joseph Timothy (1). (WRW) [2:24-mj-01004-TRR]
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION to seal Criminal Complaint and Related Documents by USA as to William Joseph Timothy. (WRW) [2:24-mj-01004-TRR]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER granting 4 Motion to seal Criminal Complaint and Related Documents as to William Joseph Timothy (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy R. Rice on 1/8/2024. (WRW) [2:24-mj-01004-TRR]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
Arrest of William Joseph Timothy on 1/9/2024 (WRW) [2:24-mj-01004-TRR]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE OF HEARING as to William Joseph Timothy: Initial Appearance set for 1/9/2024 at 03:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. (WRW) [2:24-mj-01004-TRR]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE canceling Initial Appearance scheduled for 1/9/2024 as to William Joseph Timothy. Defendant is not present. (WRW) [2:24-mj-01004-TRR]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF HEARING as to William Joseph Timothy: Initial Appearance set for 1/9/2024 at 04:00 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. (WRW) [2:24-mj-01004-TRR]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING (AS TO TIME ONLY): The Initial Appearance previously scheduled for 1/9/2024 at 4:00 PM is rescheduled as to William Joseph Timothy. New hearing time: Initial Appearance set for 1/9/2024 at 03:00 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. (WRW) [2:24-mj-01004-TRR]
Related: [-]
17 17 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 01/09/2024 as to William Joseph Timothy. (JK) [2:24-mj-01004-TRR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
10 10 ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Initial Appearance, JOINT ORAL MOTION for Bond by William Joseph Timothy. (WRW) [2:24-mj-01004-TRR]
Related: [-]
11 11 Minute Entry for In Person proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell: granting 10 ORAL Motion to Appoint Counsel for Initial Appearance as to William Joseph Timothy (1); granting 10 JOINT ORAL Motion for Bond as to William Joseph Timothy (1); Initial Appearance as to William Joseph Timothy held on 1/9/2024. (digital) (WRW) [2:24-mj-01004-TRR]
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE of Standing Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act,[LINK:3:20-mc-20-TJC, Doc 1] as to William Joseph Timothy: Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' disclosure obligation under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny and orders the United States to comply with that obligation. Violating this order may result in consequences, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, and other sanctions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. (WRW) [2:24-mj-01004-TRR]
Related: [-]
13 13 ***CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by William Joseph Timothy. (WRW) [2:24-mj-01004-TRR]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to William Joseph Timothy (1) 50,000 Unsecured Bond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 1/9/2024. (WRW) [2:24-mj-01004-TRR]
Related: [-]
15 15 RECEIPT for surrender of Passport as to William Joseph Timothy. Passport Number: A02340267. Issuing Country: USA. (LMF) [2:24-mj-01004-TRR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
16 16 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to William Joseph Timothy Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 1/10/2024. (WRW) [2:24-mj-01004-TRR]
Related: [-]
18 18 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James Lappan appearing for William Joseph Timothy (Lappan, James) [2:24-mj-01004-TRR]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
19 19 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Douglas Molloy appearing for William Joseph Timothy (Molloy, Douglas) [2:24-mj-01004-TRR]
Related: [-]
20 20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Memorandum of Law by James Lappan. (Lappan, James) [2:24-mj-01004-TRR]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
21 21 ENDORSED ORDER granting 20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney James Lappan withdrawn from case as to William Joseph Timothy (1). Mr. Lappan to be terminated from receiving any further electronic notifications regarding this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 1/16/2024. (WRW) [2:24-mj-01004-TRR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
22 22 INDICTMENT returned in open court as to William Joseph Timothy (1) count(s) 1. (JK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Restricted Unredacted Indictment