Alaska District Court
Judge:Sharon L Gleason
Case #: 4:24-cv-00005
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2024
Terminated:Oct 10, 2024
Last checked: Monday Aug 12, 2024 12:15 AM AKDT
Defendant
Kayli M. Eacrett
Plaintiff
Tiffany Jamil Flenaugh
2610 Mercier St.
Fairbanks, AK 99701

GPO Jul 03 2024
SCREENING ORDER: The Complaint at Docket 1 is DISMISSED. Plaintiff to file First Amended Complaint or a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal within 60 days. The application to waive payment of the filing fee at Docket 3 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 7/3/2024. (ANM, COURT STAFF)
GPO Oct 10 2024
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This action is DISMISSED without prejudice. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/10/2024. (ANM, COURT STAFF)

Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM AKDT
Thursday, October 10, 2024
13 13 order Judgment Thu 10/10 2:58 PM
JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/10/2024. (ANM, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
12 12 4 pgs order Order Thu 10/10 2:07 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL : This action is DISMISSED without prejudice. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/10/2024. (ANM, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
11 11 order Order Reassigning Case Tue 08/20 4:38 PM
SLG TEXT ORDER: In light of Judge Reardon's recusal, this case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable District Judge Sharon L. Gleason for all further proceedings. Please use case number 4:24-cv-00005-SLG on all future filings. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
10 10 order Order of Recusal Mon 08/19 4:17 PM
KFR TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL: Due to a judicial conflict, Judge Kyle F. Reardon hereby recuses himself from the above-referenced case. (ELH, CHAMBERS STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
9 9 notice Clerks Notice Fri 08/09 3:21 PM
CLERKS NOTICE: No Declination of Consent has been timely submitted. Therefore, this case is REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Kyle F. Reardon, who will exercise full civil jurisdiction over this entire case for all purposes. (LMH, COURT STAFF, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order Tue 07/23 9:06 AM
ORDER RE INTENT TO REASSIGN TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 7/23/2024(BJK, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
7 7 order Order Reassigning Case Wed 07/10 11:30 AM
SLG TEXT ORDER : In light of the resignation of Judge Kindred this case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Sharon L. Gleason for all future proceedings. Please use case number 4:24-cv-00005-SLG on all future filings. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
6 6 10 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 07/03 8:26 AM
SCREENING ORDER : The Complaint at Docket1 is DISMISSED. Plaintiff to file First Amended Complaint or a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal within 60 days . The application to waive payment of the filing fee at Docket3 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 7/3/2024. (ANM, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
notice Clerks Notice Tue 07/02 8:30 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: The Nature of the Suit is changed to 550 to reflect that this is a Prisoner Civil Rights Action. This change is administrative in nature only. (ANM, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
5 5 6 pgs order Order Mon 04/01 10:11 AM
STANDING ORDER FOR SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANTS Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 4/1/2024. (ANM, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
4 4 service Unissued Summons Wed 02/14 2:21 PM
Unissued summons re Defendant K. Eacrett, (LMH, COURT STAFF, )
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 02/14 2:20 PM
Application to Waive the Filing Fee by Tiffany Jamil Flenaugh.(LMH, COURT STAFF, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 02/14 2:18 PM
Civil Cover Sheet (LMH, COURT STAFF, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/14 2:17 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT for/under Torts against Kayli M. Eacrett, filed by Tiffany Jamil Flenaugh.(LMH, COURT STAFF, )
Related: [-]