1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT as to Alfred Lenoris Davis (1). (br) [1:24-mj-02132-JB]
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Alfred Lenoris Davis. (br) [1:24-mj-02132-JB]
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal as to Alfred Lenoris Davis (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 1/19/2024. See attached document for full details. (br) [1:24-mj-02132-JB]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
NOTICE OF TEMPORARY ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Khurrum B. Wahid appearing for Alfred Lenoris Davis (br) [1:24-mj-02132-JB]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian: Initial Appearance as to Alfred Lenoris Davis held on 1/24/2024. Bond recommendation/set: Alfred Lenoris Davis (1) STIP $50K PSB. Date of Location Custody (Arrest or Surrender): 1/23/24.. Arraignment set for 2/14/2024 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 2/14/2024 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 2/14/2024 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Attorney added: Khurrum B. Wahid for Alfred Lenoris Davis (Digital 13:43:58/13:54:38) It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence- that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. The government has a duty to disclose any evidence that goes to negating the defendants guilt, the credibility of a witness, or that would reduce a potential sentence. The defendant is entitled to this information without a request. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian on 1/24/2024. (dgj) Modified on 2/12/2024 (dgj). [1:24-mj-02132-JB]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
$50K PSB Bond Entered as to Alfred Lenoris Davis Approved by Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian. Please see bond image for conditions of release. (dgj) (dgj). (Main Document 7 replaced on 2/2/2024) (jbs). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/2/2024) (jbs). [1:24-mj-02132-JB]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
(1/25/2024) Restricted Bond with 7th Page
|
8
|
|
8
Order to Unseal as to Alfred Lenoris Davis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian on 1/24/2024. (jbs) [1:24-mj-02132-JB]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Attorney update in case as to Alfred Lenoris Davis. Attorney Khurrum B. Wahid terminated. (mdc) [1:24-mj-02132-JB]
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Zeljka Bozanic appearing for Alfred Lenoris Davis . Attorney Zeljka Bozanic added to party Alfred Lenoris Davis(pty:dft). (Bozanic, Zeljka) [1:24-mj-02132-JB]
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
RENOTICE OF HEARING **TIME CHANGE ONLY** as to Alfred Lenoris Davis. Report Re: Counsel Hearing, Preliminary Examination/Arraignment RESET for 2/14/2024 at 01:30 PM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. (mdc) [1:24-mj-02132-JB]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Terminate Report Re: Counsel Hearing as to Alfred Lenoris Davis. Attorney Neljka Bozanic has filed a PERMANENT Notice of Appearance on 1/26/249 . (mdc) [1:24-mj-02132-JB]
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
4
pgs
INDICTMENT as to Alfred Lenoris Davis (1) count(s) 1; FORFEITURE ALLEGATIONS. (tmn) (tmn).
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
(2/13/2024) Restricted Unredacted Indictment
|