Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-00026
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 15, 2024 1:20 AM CST
Defendant
William Linares (1)
Represented By
Rachel Maureen Taft-FPD
Assistant Federal Public Defender
contact info
Michael A Lehmann-FPD
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Laura Montes-DOJ
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/15/2024 1:56 AM CST
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
*** SEE 1 FOR IMAGE ***SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until the defendant has been arrested/appeared.) as to Roque Amaya (5), William Linares (6). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00889-BP]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
Arrest of William Linares (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00889-BP]
Related: [-]
28 28 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton: Initial Appearance as to William Linares held on 12/4/2023. Date of Arrest: 12/4/2023; Deft executed financial affidavit; o/appointing FPD entered; Rule 5(f) admonishment given; Deft waives PC; Court finds PC; Gov't not moving for detention; Deft executed PR bond & advised of conditions of pretrial release; o/setting conditions of pretrial release entered; deft released on conditions. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Laura Montes; Defense - Michael Lehmann. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :06. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Munoz.) (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00889-BP]
Related: [-]
29 29 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by William Linares (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00889-BP]
Related: [-]
30 30 1 pgs ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to William Linares. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 12/4/2023) (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00889-BP]
Related: [-]
31 31 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to William Linares (6)Deft released on PR bond; Deft to next appear as directed by the Court or U.S. Probation Officer; see order for specific conditions. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 12/4/2023) (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00889-BP]
Related: [-]
33 33 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 12/4/2023 as to William Linares. (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00889-BP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
39 39 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rachel Maureen Taft-FPD (Clerk to Set Designation as: Federal Public Defender Appointment) appearing for William Linares (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (If sealed documents that you are authorized to see were previously filed by U.S. Pretrial Services or U.S. Probation, you will require assistance to gain access to them and any related filings. Please call the clerk at 214.753.2240 during business hours to request access.) (Taft-FPD, Rachel) [4:23-mj-00889-BP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
49 49 3 pgs Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to William Linares (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [4:23-mj-00889-BP]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
51 51 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting49 , 50 Joint Motion to Continue Time to Indict as to Belisario Martinez (1), William Linares (6) until February 15, 2024 for the reasons stated in the joint motion and because the ends of justice served by the granting of such continuance outweigh the best interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial. [see 18 USC 3161 (h)(7)(A) and (h)(7)(B)(iv) ] (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 12/15/2023) (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00889-BP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
52 52 2 pgs FELONY INFORMATION with Forfeiture Notice as to William Linares (1) count 1. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (bdb)
Related: [-]